EP3292338 - AXIAL METAL SEAL RETAINER AND SEALING MEMBER FOR IMPROVED FATIGUE RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/11] | AXIAL METAL SEAL RETAINER FOR IMPROVED FATIGUE RESISTANCE | ||
[2018/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parker-Hannifin Corporation 6035 Parkland Boulevard Cleveland, Ohio 44124-4141 / US | [2018/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOLLER, Jason Richard 16056 Sheldon Avenue Eden Prairie, Minnesota 55344 / US | [2018/18] |
Former [2018/11] | 01 /
KOLLER, Jason Richard 1890 Park Ridge Drive Chaska, Minnesota 55318 / US | Representative(s) | Orr, Robert Murgitroyd & Company Leeds Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/11] | Orr, Robert Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 16721046.7 | 29.04.2016 | [2018/11] | WO2016US29964 | Priority number, date | US201562156397P | 04.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562156397 P | [2018/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016178950 | Date: | 10.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3292338 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3292338 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16L17/035, F16L37/32, F16L37/56, F16L1/26, // F16L37/40 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
F16L17/035 (EP,US);
F16L37/32 (EP,US);
F16L37/40 (US);
F16L37/56 (EP,US);
F16L1/26 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/11] | F16L17/035, F16L37/32, F16L37/56, F16L1/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AXIALER METALLDICHTUNGSHALTER UND DICHTKÖRPER FÜR EINE VERBESSERTE ERMÜDUNGSBESTÄNDIGKEIT | [2019/19] | English: | AXIAL METAL SEAL RETAINER AND SEALING MEMBER FOR IMPROVED FATIGUE RESISTANCE | [2018/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF AXIAL DE RETENUE DE JOINT MÉTALLIQUE ET ÉLÉMENT D'ÉTAINCHÉITÉ POUR UNE MEILLEURE RÉSISTANCE À LA FATIGUE | [2018/51] |
Former [2018/11] | AXIALDICHTUNGSHALTER AUS METALL FÜR VERBESSERTE ERMÜDUNGSBESTÄNDIGKEIT | ||
Former [2018/11] | AXIAL METAL SEAL RETAINER FOR IMPROVED FATIGUE RESISTANCE | ||
Former [2018/11] | DISPOSITIF DE RETENUE DE JOINT D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ MÉTALLIQUE AXIAL POUR UNE MEILLEURE RÉSISTANCE À LA FATIGUE | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/11] | 13.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.04.2016 | AL | 04.09.2019 | AT | 04.09.2019 | CY | 04.09.2019 | CZ | 04.09.2019 | DK | 04.09.2019 | EE | 04.09.2019 | ES | 04.09.2019 | FI | 04.09.2019 | HR | 04.09.2019 | IT | 04.09.2019 | LT | 04.09.2019 | LV | 04.09.2019 | MC | 04.09.2019 | MK | 04.09.2019 | MT | 04.09.2019 | NL | 04.09.2019 | PL | 04.09.2019 | RO | 04.09.2019 | RS | 04.09.2019 | SE | 04.09.2019 | SI | 04.09.2019 | SK | 04.09.2019 | SM | 04.09.2019 | TR | 04.09.2019 | BG | 04.12.2019 | GR | 05.12.2019 | IS | 05.01.2020 | PT | 06.01.2020 | IE | 29.04.2020 | LU | 29.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | FR | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 29.04.2016 | |
AL | 04.09.2019 | ||
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CY | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
MT | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
TR | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IE | 29.04.2020 | ||
LU | 29.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IE | 29.04.2020 | ||
LU | 29.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
LU | 29.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
LU | 29.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 04.09.2019 | |
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 04.09.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB264524 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE) [X] 1-7,10,11 * the whole document *; | [X]US4298206 (KOJIMA NORIATSU) [X] 1-13,16-23 * column 17, line 51 - column 20, line 6; figures 21a-26b *; | [X]US6663144 (SMITH III ROBERT E [US]) [X] 1-7,10-19,22-25* column 3, line 1 - column 5, line 5; figure - *; | [X]US2004084902 (SMITH ROBERT E [US]) [X] 1-7,10-19,22-25 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0048]; figure - *; | [X]US2005082832 (SMITH ROBERT E III [US]) [X] 1-7,10-19,22-25 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0023]; figure - * |