EP3400185 - TRANSPORT CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/46] | A TRANSPORT CONTAINER AND A SYSTEM FOR MONITORING THE CONTENTS OF A TRANSPORT CONTAINER | ||
[2020/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Twalib Mbarak Hatayan Limited Les Cascades Building Edith Cavell Street Port Louis / MU | [2018/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATAYAN, Twalib Ali Mbarak Xlyali Mombasa County / KE | [2018/46] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2018/46] | Application number, filing date | 16721484.0 | 22.03.2016 | [2018/46] | WO2016IB51600 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017163105 | Date: | 28.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3400185 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3400185 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B65D90/22, B65D90/48, G01G19/52, G01G19/12, // B60P1/00 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
B65D90/22 (EP,EA,US);
B65D90/48 (EP,EA,US);
G01G19/12 (EP,EA,US);
G01G19/52 (EP,EA,US);
G01S17/42 (EA,US);
G01S7/4802 (EA,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/46] | B65D90/22, B65D90/48, G01G19/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | 20.08.2018 | MD | 20.08.2018 | Title | German: | TRANSPORTBEHÄLTER | [2020/15] | English: | TRANSPORT CONTAINER | [2020/15] | French: | CONTENEUR DE TRANSPORT | [2020/15] |
Former [2018/46] | TRANSPORTBEHÄLTER UND SYSTEM ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DES INHALTS EINES TRANSPORTBEHÄLTERS | ||
Former [2018/46] | A TRANSPORT CONTAINER AND A SYSTEM FOR MONITORING THE CONTENTS OF A TRANSPORT CONTAINER | ||
Former [2018/46] | CONTENEUR DE TRANSPORT ET SYSTÈME POUR SURVEILLER LES CONTENUS D'UN CONTENEUR DE TRANSPORT | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/46] | 09.08.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.03.2016 | AL | 02.09.2020 | AT | 02.09.2020 | CY | 02.09.2020 | CZ | 02.09.2020 | EE | 02.09.2020 | FI | 02.09.2020 | HR | 02.09.2020 | LT | 02.09.2020 | LV | 02.09.2020 | MC | 02.09.2020 | MK | 02.09.2020 | MT | 02.09.2020 | PL | 02.09.2020 | RO | 02.09.2020 | RS | 02.09.2020 | SE | 02.09.2020 | SI | 02.09.2020 | SK | 02.09.2020 | SM | 02.09.2020 | BG | 02.12.2020 | NO | 02.12.2020 | IS | 02.01.2021 | IE | 22.03.2021 | LU | 22.03.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 22.03.2016 | |
AL | 02.09.2020 | ||
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CY | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
MK | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
IE | 22.03.2021 | ||
LU | 22.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 22.03.2016 | |
AL | 02.09.2020 | ||
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CY | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
IE | 22.03.2021 | ||
LU | 22.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CY | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
IE | 22.03.2021 | ||
LU | 22.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
IE | 22.03.2021 | ||
LU | 22.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
IE | 22.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 02.09.2020 | |
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]JPH10332465 (SASAKIAKIO JIMUSHO KK) [X] 1,4-7 * abstract * [I] 2,3,8; | [XI]EP2261613 (QUASARD INVESTISSEMENTS [FR]) [X] 1,4-7 * column 2, paragraph 18 - column 6, paragraph 71 * * figures 1-4 * [I] 2,3,8; | [A]GB2491848 (DUNNE JOHN PAUL [GB]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [XI]EP2821761 (BAE SYSTEMS PLC [GB]) [X] 1,4 * column 16, paragraph 146 * * figures 1, 2 * [I] 2,3,5-8 |