EP3292657 - MULTI-LAYER NETWORK TOPOLOGY OPTIMIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aria Networks Limited St James House The Square Lower Bristol Road Bath BA2 3BH / GB | [2018/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRICKETT, Jonathan c/o Aria Networks Limited St James House The Square Lower Bristol Road Bath Somerset BA2 3BH / GB | 02 /
CELLETTI, Andrea c/o Aria Networks Limited St James House The Square Lower Bristol Road Bath Somerset BA2 3BH / GB | [2018/11] | Representative(s) | Dentons UK and Middle East LLP One Fleet Place London EC4M 7WS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/11] | Dentons UKMEA LLP One Fleet Place London EC4M 7WS / GB | Application number, filing date | 16721889.0 | 04.05.2016 | [2018/11] | WO2016GB51276 | Priority number, date | GB20150007844 | 07.05.2015 Original published format: GB 201507844 | [2018/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016178018 | Date: | 10.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3292657 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, H04L12/715, H04L12/703 | [2018/11] | CPC: |
H04L45/64 (EP,GB,US);
H04L41/145 (EP,GB,US);
H04L41/5041 (EP,US);
H04L45/28 (EP,GB,US);
H04L41/5077 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/11] | Title | German: | OPTIMIERUNG EINER MEHRSCHICHTIGEN NETZWERKTOPOLOGIE | [2018/11] | English: | MULTI-LAYER NETWORK TOPOLOGY OPTIMIZATION | [2018/11] | French: | OPTIMISATION DE TOPOLOGIE MULTICOUCHE DE RÉSEAU | [2018/11] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/11] | 06.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/12] | 06.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   01.11.2018 | 31.05.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2012116760 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [Y] 8,20,32 * abstract * * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 33 * * page 6, line 1 - page 14, line 10 * * figures 1-5 *; | [XAYI] - CONTE G ET AL, "A multilayer solution for path provisioning in new-generation optical/MPLS networks", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20030501), vol. 21, no. 5, doi:10.1109/JLT.2003.811424, ISSN 0733-8724, pages 1141 - 1155, XP011098688 [X] 1,13,25 * abstract * * sections II, III * [A] 11,12,23,24 [Y] 8,20,32 [I] 2-7,9,10,14-19,21,22,26-31 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JLT.2003.811424 | [A] - NAAS N ET AL, "A novel MILP formulation for planning GMPLS transport networks with conversion and regeneration capabilities", ELECTRICAL AND COMPUTER ENGINEERING, 2008. CCECE 2008. CANADIAN CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080504), ISBN 978-1-4244-1642-4, pages 569 - 574, XP031286028 [A] 11,12,23,24 * abstract * * sections 2, 5 * |