EP3291976 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING CONTACT LENSES WITH DURABLE LUBRICIOUS COATINGS THEREON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcon Inc. Rue Louis-d'Affry 6 1701 Fribourg / CH | [2020/09] |
Former [2018/11] | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUINTER, Bradley c/o Alcon Research Ltd. 11460 Johns Creek Parkway Johns Creek, Georgia 30097 / US | 02 /
HOLLAND, Troy Vernon c/o Alcon Research Ltd. 11460 Johns Creek Parkway Johns Creek, Georgia 30097 / US | 03 /
KAPOOR, Yash 37 Meadowbrook Road North Wales, Pennsylvania 19454 / US | [2020/03] |
Former [2018/11] | 01 /
QUINTER, Bradley c/o Alcon Research Ltd. 11460 Johns Creek Parkway Johns Creek, Georgia 30097 / US | ||
02 /
HOLLAND, Troy Vernon c/o Alcon Research Ltd. 11460 Johns Creek Parkway Johns Creek, Georgia 30097 / US | |||
03 /
KAPOOR, Yash 1907 Cherrie Circle Blue Bell, Pennsylvania 19422 / US | Representative(s) | Bohest AG Holbeinstrasse 36-38 4051 Basel / CH | [2018/11] | Application number, filing date | 16723533.2 | 04.05.2016 | [2018/11] | WO2016IB52546 | Priority number, date | US201562158045P | 07.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562158045 P | [2018/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016178160 | Date: | 10.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3291976 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3291976 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B29D11/00, G02B1/04 | [2018/11] | CPC: |
G02B1/043 (EP,US);
C03C17/001 (US);
B29D11/00038 (EP);
B29D11/00048 (US);
B29D11/00865 (EP);
C08L83/04 (US);
| C-Set: |
G02B1/043, C08L101/14 (US,EP);
G02B1/043, C08L83/04 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KONTAKTLINSEN MIT DAUERHAFTEN GLEITFÄHIGEN BESCHICHTUNGEN DARAUF | [2018/11] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING CONTACT LENSES WITH DURABLE LUBRICIOUS COATINGS THEREON | [2018/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR FABRIQUER DES LENTILLES DE CONTACT RECOUVERTES DE REVÊTEMENTS LUBRIFIÉS DURABLES | [2018/11] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/11] | 27.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 15.01.2020 | AT | 15.01.2020 | CY | 15.01.2020 | CZ | 15.01.2020 | DK | 15.01.2020 | EE | 15.01.2020 | ES | 15.01.2020 | FI | 15.01.2020 | HR | 15.01.2020 | IT | 15.01.2020 | LT | 15.01.2020 | LV | 15.01.2020 | MC | 15.01.2020 | MK | 15.01.2020 | MT | 15.01.2020 | NL | 15.01.2020 | PL | 15.01.2020 | RO | 15.01.2020 | RS | 15.01.2020 | SE | 15.01.2020 | SI | 15.01.2020 | SK | 15.01.2020 | SM | 15.01.2020 | TR | 15.01.2020 | BG | 15.04.2020 | NO | 15.04.2020 | GR | 16.04.2020 | LU | 04.05.2020 | IS | 15.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | FR | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | PT | 07.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/27] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CY | 15.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
MT | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
TR | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
LU | 04.05.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
LU | 04.05.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
LU | 04.05.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
IT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 15.01.2020 | |
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 15.01.2020 | |
ES | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 15.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2013308093 (QIU YONGXING [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0141] , [0166] , [0171]; examples 3,11,12 * | by applicant | US3408429 | US4136250 | US4153641 | US4182822 | US4189546 | US4254248 | US4259467 | US4260725 | US4261875 | US4276402 | US4327203 | US4341889 | US4343927 | US4347198 | US4355147 | US4444711 | US4460534 | US4486577 | US4543398 | US4605712 | US4661575 | US4684538 | US4703097 | US4833218 | US4837289 | US4954586 | US4954587 | US5010141 | US5034461 | US5039761 | US5070170 | US5079319 | US5346946 | US5358995 | EP0632329 | US5387632 | US5416132 | US5451617 | US5486579 | US5508317 | US5583463 | US5760100 | US5789464 | US5843346 | US5849810 | US5849811 | US5894002 | US5962548 | US5981675 | US6039913 | US6218508 | US6627124 | US6762264 | US6800225 | US7384590 | US7387759 | US7605190 | US2010008843 | US2012026457 | US2012088844 | US2014356965 | - H. DONG, J. PHYS. CHEM. A, (2008), vol. 112, no. 49, pages 12687 - 12694 | - F. MITSUKO; R. GRUBBS; J.D. BALDESCHWIELER, J. COLLOID INTERFACE SCI., (1997), vol. 185, pages 210 - 216 | - S.J. GRAINGER AND E.H. EI-SAYED,, "Chapter 7,", S.J. GRAINGER AND E.H. EI-SAYED,, E. JABBARI ET A. KHADEMHOSSEINI,, EI-Sayed, in Biologically-Responsive Hybrid Biomaterials: A Reference for Material Scientists and Bioengineers, ARTECH PUBLISHING, (2010), pages 171 - 190 | US20030721913 | US19940274942 | US20030732566 |