EP3298057 - POLYMER COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING POLYURETHANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Str. 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2018/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBER, Martin Diedesfelder Str. 26 67487 Maikammer / DE | 02 /
ELING, Berend Vandsburger Weg 45 49448 Lemfoerde / DE | 03 /
HEIJNEN, Martin Lechanger 2 86899 Landsberg am Lech / DE | 04 /
GRONWALD, Oliver Lessingstr. 5a 63150 Heusenstamm / DE | 05 /
VOSS, Hartwig Weinbietring 19 67227 Frankenthal / DE | 06 /
MALISZ, Jacek Ruppertsbergerstr. 1c 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 07 /
ARIFIN, Davis Yohanes Clementi Avenue 4 Singapore 120376 / SG | [2018/13] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/13] | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 16724390.6 | 19.05.2016 | [2018/13] | WO2016EP61213 | Priority number, date | EP20150168057 | 19.05.2015 Original published format: EP 15168057 | [2018/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016184945 | Date: | 24.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3298057 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/76, C08G18/73, C08G18/61, C08G18/50, C08G18/40, B01D69/02, B01D71/54, B01D71/68, B01D71/70, C08G77/458, C08L81/06 | [2018/13] | CPC: |
B01D71/54 (EP,US);
B01D67/00793 (EP,US);
B01D69/02 (EP,US);
B01D69/148 (EP,US);
B01D71/68 (EP,US);
B01D71/701 (EP,US);
B01D71/80 (EP,US);
C08G18/4009 (EP,US);
C08G18/4072 (US);
C08G18/4879 (US);
C08G18/5072 (EP,US);
C08G18/5096 (EP,US);
C08G18/61 (EP,US);
C08G18/632 (US);
C08G18/73 (EP,US);
C08G18/7671 (EP,US);
C08G77/458 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (US);
C08L75/08 (US);
C08L81/06 (EP,US);
C09D183/08 (EP,US);
B01D2325/48 (EP,US);
C08G2340/00 (EP,US);
C08G77/28 (EP,US);
C08J2375/08 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L75/04, C08L81/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/13] | Title | German: | POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT POLYURETHAN | [2018/13] | English: | POLYMER COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING POLYURETHANE | [2018/13] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POLYMÈRES CONTENANT DU POLYURÉTHANNE | [2018/13] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/13] | 11.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 15.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [ID]WO2011110441 (POLYMERS CRC LTD [AU], et al); | [ID]WO2014170391 (BASF SE [DE]); | by applicant | US5102547 | EP0937492 | US6652751 | EP1743690 | WO2007053163 | EP2008704 | WO2009098161 | EP2158958 | WO2010121628 | WO2011110441 | WO2014170391 |