EP3459292 - POWER EFFICIENCY IN MULTIPLE RADIO ACCESS TECHNOLOGIES SCENARIOS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2019/13] | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LASELVA, Daniela Septembervej 1A 9270 Klarup / DK | 02 /
WIGARD, Jeroen Septembervej 1 A 9270 Klarup / DK | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2019/13] | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 16724881.4 | 20.05.2016 | [2019/13] | WO2016EP61408 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017198308 | Date: | 23.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3459292 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
H04W52/0225 (EP);
H04W28/0221 (US);
H04W52/0238 (US);
H04W52/246 (US);
H04W72/02 (US);
H04W72/0473 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] | Title | German: | ENERGIEEFFIZIENZ IN SZENARIEN MIT MEHREREN FUNKZUGANGSTECHNOLOGIEN | [2019/13] | English: | POWER EFFICIENCY IN MULTIPLE RADIO ACCESS TECHNOLOGIES SCENARIOS | [2019/13] | French: | RENDEMENT DE PUISSANCE DANS DES SCÉNARIOS À TECHNOLOGIES D'ACCÈS RADIO MULTIPLES | [2019/13] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 20.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/52] | 11.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2013005333 (CHUEH HSIN-TI [TW], et al) [X] 1-50 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0077] * * figures 1-7 *; | [X]US2013045744 (DIMPFLMAIER RONALD W [US], et al) [X] 1-50 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0046] * * figures 1-4 *; | [XA]WO2014184347 (NOKIA SOLUTIONS & NETWORKS OY [FI]) [X] 16-23,39-46,48-50 * abstract * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0067] * * figures 1-4 *[A] 1-15,24-38,47; | [XA] - CMCC, "Network Selection for WLAN/3GPP Radio Interworking", vol. RAN WG2, no. Chicago, USA; 20130415 - 20130419, (20130404), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-130973 NETWORK SELECTION FOR WLAN 3GPP RADIO INTERWORKING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_81bis/Docs/, (20130404), XP050699128 [X] 16-23,39-46,48-50 * the whole document * [A] 1-15,24-38,47 |