EP3294633 - TENSION HEAD WITH TENSION WHEEL CAM BIASING ELEMENT FOR MODULAR STEEL STRAPPING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Signode Industrial Group LLC 3650 West Lake Ave Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [2018/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELLIOTT, Dustin, D. 33061 North Sears Boulevard Grayslake, IL 60030 / US | [2018/12] | Representative(s) | Roche, von Westernhagen & Ehresmann Patentanwaltskanzlei Mäuerchen 16 42103 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/12] | Roche, von Westernhagen & Ehresmann Patentanwaltskanzlei Friedrich-Engels-Allee 430-432 42283 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 16725010.9 | 11.05.2016 | [2018/12] | WO2016US31695 | Priority number, date | US201562160358P | 12.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562160358 P | US201615076009 | 21.03.2016 Original published format: US201615076009 | [2018/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016183112 | Date: | 17.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3294633 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3294633 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B65B13/22, B65B13/04, B65B13/32 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
B65B13/22 (EP,KR,US);
B65B13/04 (EP,KR,US);
B65B13/32 (EP,KR,US);
B65H20/02 (KR,US);
B65H51/10 (KR,US);
B65H2301/51432 (KR,US);
B65H2404/143 (KR,US);
B65H2404/1451 (KR,US);
B65H2404/531 (KR,US);
B65H2701/1944 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPANNKOPF MIT EINEM SPANNRADNOCKENVORSPANNELEMENT FÜR MODULARE STAHLUMREIFUNGSMASCHINE | [2018/12] | English: | TENSION HEAD WITH TENSION WHEEL CAM BIASING ELEMENT FOR MODULAR STEEL STRAPPING MACHINE | [2018/12] | French: | TÊTE DE TENSION AVEC ÉLÉMENT DE PRÉCONTRAINTE DE CAME DE ROUE DE TENSION POUR MACHINE DE CERCLAGE D'ACIER MODULAIRE | [2018/12] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/12] | 14.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.05.2016 | AL | 13.03.2019 | AT | 13.03.2019 | CY | 13.03.2019 | CZ | 13.03.2019 | DK | 13.03.2019 | EE | 13.03.2019 | ES | 13.03.2019 | FI | 13.03.2019 | HR | 13.03.2019 | LT | 13.03.2019 | LV | 13.03.2019 | MC | 13.03.2019 | MK | 13.03.2019 | MT | 13.03.2019 | NL | 13.03.2019 | PL | 13.03.2019 | RO | 13.03.2019 | RS | 13.03.2019 | SE | 13.03.2019 | SI | 13.03.2019 | SK | 13.03.2019 | SM | 13.03.2019 | IE | 11.05.2019 | LU | 11.05.2019 | FR | 13.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | CH | 31.05.2019 | LI | 31.05.2019 | BG | 13.06.2019 | NO | 13.06.2019 | GR | 14.06.2019 | IS | 13.07.2019 | PT | 13.07.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 11.05.2016 | |
AL | 13.03.2019 | ||
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CY | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
MT | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
IE | 11.05.2019 | ||
LU | 11.05.2019 | ||
FR | 13.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 11.05.2016 | |
AL | 13.03.2019 | ||
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CY | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
IE | 11.05.2019 | ||
LU | 11.05.2019 | ||
FR | 13.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CY | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
IE | 11.05.2019 | ||
LU | 11.05.2019 | ||
FR | 13.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
IE | 11.05.2019 | ||
LU | 11.05.2019 | ||
FR | 13.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
IE | 11.05.2019 | ||
LU | 11.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
IE | 11.05.2019 | ||
LU | 11.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
LU | 11.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 13.03.2019 | |
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 13.03.2019 | |
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [YA]GB2072128 (CYKLOP STRAPPING CORP) [Y] 4-8 * column 3, line 25 - line 36; figure 2 * [A] 1-3,9,10; | [A]US5459977 (HABERSTROH JAMES A [US]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1, 2 *; | [A]EP1151921 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) [A] 1-10* figures 2-4 *; | [A]US2003221566 (APEL STEFAN [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0028]; figure 6 *; | [YA]US2007131496 (NIX ROBERT J [US], et al) [Y] 9,10 * paragraphs [0042] - [0045] * [A] 1-8; | [A]GB2481724 (LAI CHIEN-FA [TW]) [A] 1-10 * figure 7 *; | [A]US2012167532 (HABERSTROH JAMES A [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0030]; figures 2, 3 *; | [IY]US2013284033 (BELL JR LEMUEL J [US]) [I] 1-3 * paragraph [0079]; figures 1-12a * [Y] 4-10 |