EP3303155 - A SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING AUTOMATIC PACKAGING OF PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/15] | A SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING AUTOMATIC PACKAGING OF PRODUCT | ||
[2019/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ulusoy, Gökhan Ostim Osb Mahallesi 1182 Sokak No:10 Yenimahalle/Ankara / TR | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Martin Santos, Victoria Sofia Esquivel & Martin Santos Calle de Velázquez, 3-piso 3 28001 Madrid / ES | [2019/40] |
Former [2018/15] | Martin Santos, Victoria Sofia Esquivel Martin Pinto & Sessano Calle de Velázquez, 3-piso 3 28001 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 16725253.5 | 04.04.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016TR50097 | Priority number, date | TR20150006281 | 25.05.2015 Original published format: TR 201506281 | [2018/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016190831 | Date: | 01.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3303155 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3303155 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B65B43/12, A47F9/04, B65B43/26 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
B65B43/123 (EP,US);
A47F9/048 (US);
A47F9/043 (US);
B65B35/22 (US);
B65B43/26 (EP,US);
B65B43/267 (US);
B65B5/10 (US);
B65B57/12 (US);
B65B61/06 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN VERPACKEN VON PRODUKTEN | [2019/21] | English: | A SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING AUTOMATIC PACKAGING OF PRODUCTS | [2019/21] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CONDITIONNEMENT AUTOMATIQUE DE PRODUITS | [2019/18] |
Former [2018/15] | SYSTEM ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINER AUTOMATISCHEN PRODUKTVERPACKUNG | ||
Former [2018/15] | A SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING AUTOMATIC PACKAGING OF PRODUCT | ||
Former [2018/15] | SYSTÈME PERMETTANT DE FOURNIR UN EMBALLAGE AUTOMATIQUE D'UN PRODUIT | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 11.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 26.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.04.2016 | AL | 02.10.2019 | AT | 02.10.2019 | CY | 02.10.2019 | CZ | 02.10.2019 | DK | 02.10.2019 | EE | 02.10.2019 | ES | 02.10.2019 | FI | 02.10.2019 | HR | 02.10.2019 | IT | 02.10.2019 | LT | 02.10.2019 | LV | 02.10.2019 | MC | 02.10.2019 | MK | 02.10.2019 | MT | 02.10.2019 | NL | 02.10.2019 | PL | 02.10.2019 | RO | 02.10.2019 | RS | 02.10.2019 | SE | 02.10.2019 | SI | 02.10.2019 | SK | 02.10.2019 | SM | 02.10.2019 | TR | 02.10.2019 | BG | 02.01.2020 | NO | 02.01.2020 | GR | 03.01.2020 | IS | 02.02.2020 | PT | 03.02.2020 | GB | 04.04.2020 | IE | 04.04.2020 | LU | 04.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | FR | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 04.04.2016 | |
AL | 02.10.2019 | ||
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CY | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
MT | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
TR | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
GB | 04.04.2020 | ||
IE | 04.04.2020 | ||
LU | 04.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
GB | 04.04.2020 | ||
IE | 04.04.2020 | ||
LU | 04.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IE | 04.04.2020 | ||
LU | 04.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
LU | 04.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
LU | 04.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 02.10.2019 | |
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 02.10.2019 | |
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 02.10.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0429416 (AWAX PROGETTAZIONE [IT]) [A] 1-13; | [A]EP0531265 (AWAX PROGETTAZIONE [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5642791 (ZERLIN ELIZABETH [US], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]US2008054071 (KANGAS PAUL DANIEL [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * the whole document * |