EP3302629 - DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE WITH MULTIFUNCTIONAL BIAS STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2018 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RØRVIG, Simon Bechgaardgade 3 3tv 2100 København Ø / DK | 02 /
ANDERSEN, Carsten, Schau Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2018/15] | Application number, filing date | 16725522.3 | 26.05.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016EP61907 | Priority number, date | EP20150169635 | 28.05.2015 Original published format: EP 15169635 | [2018/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016189089 | Date: | 01.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3302629 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/20, A61M5/315 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
A61M5/20 (EP,US);
A61M5/31581 (US);
A61M5/2033 (US);
A61M5/31528 (EP,US);
A61M5/3155 (EP,US);
A61M5/31551 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Title | German: | ARZNEIMITTELABGABEVORRICHTUNG MIT MULTIFUNKTIONELLER VORSPANNUNGSSTRUKTUR | [2018/15] | English: | DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE WITH MULTIFUNCTIONAL BIAS STRUCTURE | [2018/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENT À STRUCTURE DE SOLLICITATION MULTIFONCTIONNELLE | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 12.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2004078241 (DCA DESIGN INT LTD [GB]) [Y] 1,7 * page 10, line 10 - line 15; figures 7,8; claims 7,9 *; | [Y]WO2008031235 (TECPHARMA LICENSING AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-8* figure 3 *; | [Y]WO2012049139 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE], et al) [Y] 1-8 * page 15, line 11 - page 20, line 3 *; | [Y]WO2015071289 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [Y] 1-8 * page 15, line 12 - page 19, line 31 * |