EP3390000 - WASTE ROUTING OF NON-FUSED BUILD MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring TX 77389 / US | [2019/20] |
Former [2018/43] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, Texas 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANCLON, Ismael Cami de Can Graells 1-21 08174 Sant Cugat del Valles / ES | 02 /
ALONSO, Xavier Cami de Can Graells 1-21 08174 Sant Cugat del Valles / ES | 03 /
FONT, Davinia Cami de Can Graells 1-21 08174 Sant Cugat del Valles / ES | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [2023/39] |
Former [2018/43] | Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 16726289.8 | 12.05.2016 | [2018/43] | WO2016EP60690 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017194119 | Date: | 16.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3390000 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3390000 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B29C67/00 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
B29C64/35 (EP,US);
B29C64/393 (EP);
B33Y40/00 (EP,US);
B33Y50/02 (EP);
B29C64/153 (EP,US);
B29C64/165 (EP,US);
B33Y10/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABFALLUMLEITUNG VON NICHT-FUSIONIERTEMBAUMATERIAL | [2018/43] | English: | WASTE ROUTING OF NON-FUSED BUILD MATERIAL | [2018/43] | French: | ACHEMINEMENT DE DÉCHETS D'UN MATÉRIAU DE CONSTRUCTION NON FONDU | [2018/43] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 19.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/36] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.10.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 17.10.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.10.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.09.2023 | CZ | 27.09.2023 | DK | 27.09.2023 | EE | 27.09.2023 | ES | 27.09.2023 | FI | 27.09.2023 | HR | 27.09.2023 | IT | 27.09.2023 | LT | 27.09.2023 | LV | 27.09.2023 | NL | 27.09.2023 | PL | 27.09.2023 | RO | 27.09.2023 | RS | 27.09.2023 | SE | 27.09.2023 | SK | 27.09.2023 | SM | 27.09.2023 | NO | 27.12.2023 | GR | 28.12.2023 | IS | 27.01.2024 | PT | 29.01.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
IT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 27.09.2023 | |
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1700686 (3D SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-8,14 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0058] *[I] 9-13,15 |