EP3280879 - ARRANGEMENT FOR A TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2021/04] |
Former [2018/07] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURBAUM, Bernd Jenaer Str. 23 14612 Falkensee / DE | [2018/07] | Application number, filing date | 16726577.6 | 02.06.2016 | [2018/07] | WO2016EP62508 | Priority number, date | DE201510212419 | 02.07.2015 Original published format: DE102015212419 | [2018/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017001139 | Date: | 05.01.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3280879 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3280879 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/14, F01D5/28, F01D5/18 | [2018/07] | CPC: |
F01D5/147 (EP,KR,US);
B22F5/04 (US);
F01D5/18 (EP,KR,US);
F01D5/282 (EP,KR,US);
F01D5/284 (US);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2230/31 (EP,KR,US);
F05D2230/311 (US);
F05D2230/51 (EP,KR,US);
F05D2230/64 (EP,KR,US);
F05D2260/30 (EP,KR,US);
F05D2300/603 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG FÜR EINE TURBINE | [2018/07] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR A TURBINE | [2018/07] | French: | SYSTÈME POUR UNE TURBINE | [2018/07] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/07] | 01.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 26.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.06.2016 | AL | 28.07.2021 | CY | 28.07.2021 | CZ | 28.07.2021 | DK | 28.07.2021 | EE | 28.07.2021 | ES | 28.07.2021 | FI | 28.07.2021 | HR | 28.07.2021 | LT | 28.07.2021 | LV | 28.07.2021 | MC | 28.07.2021 | MK | 28.07.2021 | MT | 28.07.2021 | NL | 28.07.2021 | RO | 28.07.2021 | RS | 28.07.2021 | SI | 28.07.2021 | SK | 28.07.2021 | SM | 28.07.2021 | BG | 28.10.2021 | NO | 28.10.2021 | GR | 29.10.2021 | IS | 28.11.2021 | PT | 29.11.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 02.06.2016 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
MK | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 02.06.2016 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 02.06.2016 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | CZ | 28.07.2021 | |
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 28.07.2021 | |
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | DK | 28.07.2021 | |
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | ES | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 28.07.2021 | |
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | Cited in | International search | [IDA]US2006120874 (BURKE MICHAEL A [US], et al) [ID] 1-9,11-13,15 * page 3, paragraph 20; figures 1, 4 * [A] 10,14; | [A]US2006121265 (THOMPSON DANIEL G [US], et al) [A] 1-15* figure 8A * | Examination | WO2016085654 | by applicant | US2006120871 | US2006120874 |