EP3294547 - LOCALIZED PANEL STIFFENER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zephyros Inc. 160 McLean Drive Romeo, MI 48065 / US | [2018/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MADAUS, Keith 37508 Robert Drive Richmond, MI 48062 / US | 02 /
KOSAL, David 67903 Lake Angela Drive Richmond, MI 48062 / US | 03 /
QUADERER, Dean 30323 W. Chicago Livonia, MI 48150 / US | 04 /
COLDREN, Mark 7426 Hardisty Drive West Bloomfield, MI 48324 / US | [2018/12] | Representative(s) | Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/12] | Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 16727029.7 | 16.05.2016 | [2018/12] | WO2016US32710 | Priority number, date | US201562161523P | 14.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562161523 P | US201562164224P | 20.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562164224 P | [2018/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016183580 | Date: | 17.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3294547 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B32B15/14, B32B5/02, B32B7/02, B32B7/12, B32B7/14, B32B15/02, B32B15/04, B32B15/18, B32B15/20 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
B32B5/022 (EP,CN,US);
B29C65/02 (EP,US);
B29C65/1406 (EP,US);
B29C65/46 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/72326 (US);
B29C66/73111 (US);
B29C66/7315 (US);
B29C66/73751 (EP,US);
B29C66/7394 (EP,US);
B29C66/74283 (US);
B29C70/003 (EP,CN,US);
B29C70/747 (EP,US);
B32B15/02 (EP,CN,US);
B32B15/043 (EP,CN,US);
B32B15/085 (US);
B32B15/14 (EP,CN,US);
B32B15/18 (EP,CN,US);
B32B15/20 (EP,CN,US);
B32B3/16 (EP,US);
B32B3/18 (US);
B32B5/02 (US);
B32B5/024 (EP,CN,US);
B32B5/028 (EP,CN,US);
B32B7/12 (EP,CN,US);
B32B7/14 (EP,CN,US);
B60R13/00 (EP,CN,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/3034 (EP,US);
B29C66/5326 (EP,US);
B29C66/61 (EP,US);
B29C66/7212 (EP,US);
B29C66/72141 (EP,US);
B29C66/7352 (EP,US);
B29C66/742 (EP,US);
B29K2623/08 (US);
B29K2995/0082 (US);
B29K2995/0091 (US);
B29L2031/3005 (US);
B29L2031/3014 (EP,US);
B32B2262/02 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2262/0223 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2262/023 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2262/0253 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2262/0261 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2262/0269 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2262/0276 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2262/0284 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2262/0292 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2262/062 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2262/101 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2262/106 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2264/02 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2264/101 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2307/30 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2307/50 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2307/546 (US);
B32B2307/56 (US);
B32B2605/08 (EP,CN,US);
B62D29/001 (US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2063/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/7212, B29K2309/08 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/12] | Title | German: | LOKALISIERTE PLATTENVERSTEIFUNG | [2018/12] | English: | LOCALIZED PANEL STIFFENER | [2018/12] | French: | RAIDISSEUR DE PANNEAU LOCALISÉ | [2018/12] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/12] | 09.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 26.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN103509506 ; | [XAI]WO0109404 (HANKUK FIBER GLASS CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 15-18,20 * figure 1 * * page 8, line 9 - page 11, line 7 * [A] 1-14[I] 19; | [XAI]US2001036559 (HAACK ULRICH [DE], et al) [X] 15-18,20 * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [0009] , [0011] , [0012] , [0014] , [0016] * * claim - * [A] 1-14 [I] 19; | [A]USH2047H (HARRISON BRUCE LEE [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * claims 40-42 * * column 2, line 3 - line 24 *; | [A]WO2004039577 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * figure 1; claim - *; | [A]WO2008014053 (ZEPHYROS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0054] , [ 0056] , [ 0057] , [ 0062] - [0065]; figures 3,4; claim - *; | [XI]DE102008018538 (LYDALL GERHARDI GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,3-7,10,13,14 * figure 1 * * claim - * * paragraphs [0005] , [ 0008] * [I] 2,8,9,11,12; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2014, no. 30, Database accession no. 2014-E81321, XP002760683 & CN103509506 A 20140115 (BYD CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * abstract * |