EP3334606 - PRINTING MACHINE FOR CONTAINERS, AND METHOD FOR PRINTING CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krones AG Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2018/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERTLOWSKI, Georg Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 02 /
WAHL, Matthias Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 03 /
HEIMER, Peggy Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2018/25] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/25] | Application number, filing date | 16727732.6 | 09.06.2016 | [2018/25] | WO2016EP63126 | Priority number, date | DE201510215295 | 11.08.2015 Original published format: DE102015215295 | [2018/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017025217 | Date: | 16.02.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3334606 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3334606 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/407 | [2018/25] | CPC: |
B41J3/4073 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRUCKMASCHINE FÜR BEHÄLTER UND VERFAHREN ZUM BEDRUCKEN VON BEHÄLTERN | [2018/25] | English: | PRINTING MACHINE FOR CONTAINERS, AND METHOD FOR PRINTING CONTAINERS | [2018/25] | French: | MACHINE D'IMPRESSION POUR DES RÉCIPIENTS ET PROCÉDÉ D'IMPRESSION DE RÉCIPIENTS | [2018/25] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/25] | 13.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.06.2016 | AL | 17.06.2020 | CY | 17.06.2020 | CZ | 17.06.2020 | DK | 17.06.2020 | EE | 17.06.2020 | ES | 17.06.2020 | FI | 17.06.2020 | HR | 17.06.2020 | LT | 17.06.2020 | LV | 17.06.2020 | MC | 17.06.2020 | MK | 17.06.2020 | MT | 17.06.2020 | NL | 17.06.2020 | PL | 17.06.2020 | RO | 17.06.2020 | RS | 17.06.2020 | SE | 17.06.2020 | SI | 17.06.2020 | SK | 17.06.2020 | SM | 17.06.2020 | BG | 17.09.2020 | NO | 17.09.2020 | GR | 18.09.2020 | IS | 17.10.2020 | PT | 19.10.2020 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 09.06.2016 | |
AL | 17.06.2020 | ||
CY | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
MK | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 09.06.2016 | |
AL | 17.06.2020 | ||
CY | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CY | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 17.06.2020 | |
NO | 17.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102007050490 (KHS AG [DE]) [A] 1,11 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2011232514 (PUTZER FRANK [DE], et al) [A] 1,11* figures 1-3 *; | [ID]DE102011009391 (KRONES AG [DE]) [ID] 1-4,6-15 * paragraphs [0013] , [ 0049] - [0054]; figures 1-4, 7; claims 1-15 *; | [A]DE102013208065 (KRONES AG [DE]) [A] 1,4,11,12 * paragraphs [0014] , [ 0016] , [ 0053] , [ 0062]; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | DE102008012502 | DE102011009391 |