EP3303058 - VEHICLE MIRROR APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boyle, John Cameron Intellectual Property Ltd 69 St. Vincent Street Glasgow, Central Scotland G2 5TF / GB | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | McIlroy, Steven David Cameron Intellectual Property Ltd Moncrieff House Floor 4 69 West Nile Street Glasgow G1 2QB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/15] | McIlroy, Steven David Cameron Intellectual Property Ltd 69 St. Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5TF / GB | Application number, filing date | 16727806.8 | 02.06.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016GB51622 | Priority number, date | GB20150009697 | 04.06.2015 Original published format: GB 201509697 | [2018/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016193730 | Date: | 08.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3303058 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60R1/10, B60R1/00, B60R1/078 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
B60R1/10 (EP,GB);
B60R1/007 (GB);
B60R1/0605 (GB);
B60R1/078 (EP);
G02B7/00 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGSPIEGELVORRICHTUNG | [2018/15] | English: | VEHICLE MIRROR APPARATUS | [2018/15] | French: | APPAREIL À MIROIR POUR VÉHICULE | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 04.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/41] | 22.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6104552 (THAU WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [X] 17-20 * figures 3,9-11 *; | [XA]DE10260533 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 17-20 * paragraphs [0010] - [0014] * * figure - * [A] 1-16; | [A]US2004218294 (CHEN MING-EN [TW]) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [X]US2007014040 (IINUMA YUSUKE [JP], et al) [X] 17-20 * figure - *; | [X]JP2013035438 (ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES LTD) [X] 17-20 * figure - * |