EP3292402 - MIXTURE IDENTIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elementar UK Limited Isoprime House Earl Road Cheadle Hulme, Cheadle SK8 6PT / GB | [2018/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUDNIK, Michael Andrew 35 Wellington Grove Stockport Cheshire SK2 6SL / GB | [2018/11] | Representative(s) | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/11] | EIP EIP Europe LLP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 16728070.0 | 09.05.2016 | [2018/11] | WO2016GB51315 | Priority number, date | GB20150007841 | 07.05.2015 Original published format: GB 201507841 | [2018/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016178033 | Date: | 10.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3292402 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/86, H01J49/00, G01N30/84, G01N30/88 | [2018/11] | CPC: |
G01N30/8679 (EP);
G01N30/86 (GB);
G01N30/8686 (EP);
G01N30/8696 (GB);
G16C20/20 (EP);
H01J49/0036 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/11] | Title | German: | IDENTIFIZIERUNG EINER MISCHUNG | [2018/11] | English: | MIXTURE IDENTIFICATION | [2018/11] | French: | IDENTIFICATION DE MÉLANGE | [2018/11] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/11] | 03.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/52] | 07.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2018/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]EP1067488 (JASPER JOHN P [US]) [X] 10,11 * the whole document * [Y] 1 [I] 2-9 | [Y] - YING ZHANG ET AL, "Calibration and data processing in gas chromatography combustion isotope ratio mass spectrometry", DRUG TESTING AND ANALYSIS, GB, (20120224), vol. 4, no. 12, doi:10.1002/dta.394, ISSN 1942-7603, pages 912 - 922, XP055299967 [Y] 1 * page 915, column 1, lines 13-36 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/dta.394 | [Y] - DEBAJYOTI PAUL ET AL, "Normalization of measured stable isotopic compositions to isotope reference scales - a review", RAPID COMMUNICATIONS IN MASS SPECTROMETRY., GB, (20070817), vol. 21, no. 18, doi:10.1002/rcm.3185, ISSN 0951-4198, pages 3006 - 3014, XP055299968 [Y] 1 * abstract * * page 3008, column 2, line 6 - page 3009, column 1, line 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/rcm.3185 | [X] - MAROULA K KIOUSSI ET AL, "External calibration in Gas ChromatographyCombustionIsotope Ratio Mass Spectrometry measurements of endogenous androgenic anabolic steroids in sports doping control", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, NL, vol. 1218, no. 33, doi:10.1016/J.CHROMA.2011.06.014, ISSN 0021-9673, (20110605), pages 5675 - 5682, (20110617), XP028247422 [X] 11 * abstract * * page 5677, column 2, paragraph 2.4 * * page 5678, column 2, paragraph 3.1 - page 5679, column 2, line 3 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chroma.2011.06.014 |