EP3307725 - EFFLUX-PUMP INHIBITORS AND THERAPEUTIC USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basilea Pharmaceutica International AG Grenzacherstrasse 487 4005 Basel / CH | [2020/32] |
Former [2018/16] | For all designated states Basilea Pharmaceutica International AG Grenzacherstrasse 487 4058 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DREIER, Jürg Basilea Pharmaceutica International AG Grenzacherstrasse 487 4058 Basel / CH | 02 /
GAUCHER, Bérangère Basilea Pharmaceutica International AG Grenzacherstrasse 487 4058 Basel / CH | 03 /
DESARBRE, Eric Basilea Pharmaceutica International AG 4058 Basel / CH | 04 /
* * * | [2018/16] | Representative(s) | Thwaite, Jonathan Simon Basilea Pharmaceutica International Ltd. Allschwil Hegenheimermattweg 167b 4123 Allschwil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2018/16] | Thwaite, Jonathan Simon Basilea Pharmaceutica International Ltd. Grenzacherstrasse 487 4058 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 16728346.4 | 13.06.2016 | [2018/16] | WO2016EP63487 | Priority number, date | EP20150001729 | 11.06.2015 Original published format: EP 15001729 | [2018/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016198691 | Date: | 15.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3307725 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, C07D405/12, C07D409/12, C07D413/12, C07D417/12, C07D417/14, C07D205/04, C07D265/30, C07C237/26, C07D207/09, C07D211/26, C07D403/12, A61K31/65, A61K31/4409, A61P31/04, A61K31/341, A61K31/381, A61K31/397, A61K31/40, A61K31/4427 | [2018/16] | CPC: |
C07D211/26 (EP,CN,US);
C07D205/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/397 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/4025 (EP,US);
A61K31/4155 (EP,US);
A61K31/4178 (EP,US);
A61K31/4245 (EP,US);
A61K31/427 (EP,US);
A61K31/4409 (KR);
A61K31/4427 (KR);
A61K31/4439 (EP,US);
A61K31/444 (EP,US);
A61K31/4465 (EP,US);
A61K31/4468 (EP,US);
A61K31/5375 (EP,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61K31/65 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (KR);
A61P31/04 (EP,KR,US);
C07D207/09 (EP,CN,US);
C07D207/14 (EP,US);
C07D207/16 (EP,US);
C07D211/58 (EP,US);
C07D265/30 (EP,CN,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,CN,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,CN,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,US);
C07D417/12 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/16] | Title | German: | EFFLUX-PUMPINHIBITOREN UND THERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2020/29] | English: | EFFLUX-PUMP INHIBITORS AND THERAPEUTIC USES THEREOF | [2018/16] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE POMPE D'EFFLUX ET LEURS UTILISATIONS THÉRAPEUTIQUES | [2020/29] |
Former [2018/16] | EFFLUXPUMPENHEMMER UND THERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | ||
Former [2018/16] | INHIBITEURS DE LA POMPE À EFFLUX ET UTILISATIONS THÉRAPEUTIQUES CORRESPONDANTES | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/16] | 26.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/47] | 15.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/47] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.01.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 21.01.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.02.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0117995 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1-46 * pages 100,116; examples 8-26, 10-26 *; | [A]US6399629 (CHAMBERLAND SUZANNE [US], et al)[A] 1-51; | [X]WO03024928 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-46 * example 15 *; | [X]US2003186963 (DORWALD FLORENCIO ZARAGOZA [DK]) [X] 1-46 * examples 11,17,33 *; | [X]US2003225076 (BIWERSI CATHLIN [US], et al) [X] 1-46 * example 66 *; | [X]WO2004081005 (NEUROCRINE BIOSCIENCES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-46 * examples 5,8,9,15,19,26; compounds 5b,8c,9a,15b,19b,26b *; | [X]WO2005003118 (BAYER HEALTHCARE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-46 * example 51A *; | [X]WO2009002495 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1-46 * examples 58,110,115 *; | [X]EP2277861 (DAINIPPON SUMITOMO PHARMA CO [JP]) [X] 1-46 * Starting material in example 26 *; | [X]WO2012022487 (GRUENENTHAL GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-46 * page 101; example 30 *; | [X]WO2012028676 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [X] 1-46 * pages 186,189; examples 4.34, 4.74 *; | [X]WO2013064543 (ASTEX THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-46 * page 243 - page 244; compounds 294,295 *; | [X]US2015133465 (LAVOIE EDMOND J [US], et al) [X] 1-46 * example 48 *; | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20100404), Database accession no. 1216651-00-1, XP002744631 [X] 1-46 * abstract * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20100405), Database accession no. 1216785-78-2, XP002744632 [X] 1-46 * abstract * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20120613), Database accession no. 1377769-70-4, XP002744633 [X] 1-46 * abstract * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20110417), Database accession no. 1280889-95-3, XP002744634 [X] 1-46 * abstract * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20130409), Database accession no. 1427551-24-3, XP002744635 [X] 1-46 * abstract * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20140314), Database accession no. 1568462-40-7, XP002744636 [X] 1-46 * abstract * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20140321), Database accession no. 1572002-48-2, XP002744637 [X] 1-46 * abstract * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20140324), Database accession no. 1572341-88-8, XP002744638 [X] 1-46 * abstract * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20140327), Database accession no. 1574781-10-4, XP002744639 [X] 1-46 * abstract * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20140407), Database accession no. 1581213-53-7, XP002744640 [X] 1-46 * abstract * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20140513), Database accession no. 1603803-68-4, XP002744641 [X] 1-46 * abstract * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20140422), Database accession no. 1588390-29-7, XP002744642 [X] 1-46 * abstract * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20140427), Database accession no. 1591119-57-1, XP002744643 [X] 1-46 * abstract * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20140430), Database accession no. 1593686-48-6, XP002744644 [X] 1-46 * abstract * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20140505), Database accession no. 1597507-21-5, XP002744645 [X] 1-46 * abstract * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20140509), Database accession no. 1601311-25-4, XP002744646 [X] 1-46 * abstract * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20140516), Database accession no. 1606103-17-6, XP002744647 [X] 1-46 * abstract * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20140519), Database accession no. 1606582-40-4, XP002744648 [X] 1-46 * abstract * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (19210519), Database accession no. 1606950-21-3, XP002744649 [X] 1-46 * abstract * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20150216), Database accession no. 1648046-67-6, XP002744650 [X] 1-46 * abstract * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20100402), Database accession no. 1215818-94-2, XP002744651 [X] 1-46 * CAS Registry numbers 1215818-94-2, 1215795-73-5, 1215759-26-4, 1215597-65-1 * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20140515), Database accession no. 1605157-65-0, XP002744652 [X] 1-46 * CAS Registry Numbers 1605157-65-0, 1605174-45-5, 1605250-93-8 * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20140514), Database accession no. 1604590-29-5, XP002744653 [X] 1-46 * CAS Registry Numbers 1604590-29-5, 1604617-74-4 * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20140425), Database accession no. 1590291-81-8, XP002744654 [X] 1-46 * CAS Registry Numbers 1590291-81-8, 1590301-99-7 * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20140417), Database accession no. 1585964-69-7, XP002744655 [X] 1-46 * CAS Registry Numbers 1585964-69-7, 1585856-27-4 * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20140416), Database accession no. 1585140-32-4, XP002744656 [X] 1-46 * CAS Registry Numbers 1585140-32-4, 1585096-65-6 * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20070305), Database accession no. 924855-69-6, XP002744657 [X] 1-46 * abstract * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20140413), Database accession no. 1583636-04-7, XP002744658 [X] 1-46 * abstract * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20140411), Database accession no. 1583255-90-6, XP002744659 [X] 1-46 * abstract * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20110519), Database accession no. 1297503-65-1, XP002744660 [X] 1-46 * abstract * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20101109), Database accession no. 1252112-09-6, XP002744661 [X] 1-46 * abstract * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20100405), Database accession no. 1216980-58-3, XP002744662 [X] 1-46 * abstract * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20100404), Database accession no. 1216483-68-9, XP002744663 [X] 1-46 * abstract * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20100402), Database accession no. 1215759-26-4, XP002744664 [X] 1-46 * abstract * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20091216), Database accession no. 1197605-94-9, XP002744665 [X] 1-46 * abstract * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20080919), Database accession no. 1050502-78-7, XP002744666 [X] 1-46 * CAS Registry Numbers 1050502-78-7, 1050502-41-4, 1050502-40-3, 1050484-89-3 * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20080627), Database accession no. 1031184-55-0, XP002744667 [X] 1-46 * abstract * | by applicant | US6399629 | EP1652839 | - GOOTZ T.D., CRITICAL REV. IMMUNOL., (2010), vol. 30, no. 1, pages 79 - 93 | - SILVER L.L., CLIN. MICROBIOL. REV., (2011), vol. 24, no. 1, pages 71 - 109 | - DENIS G.A.; RELICH R.F., CLIN LAB MED, (2014), vol. 34, pages 257 - 270 | - MARTINEZ; BAQUERO, UPSALA J. MED. SCI., (2014), vol. 119, pages 68 - 77 | - PIDDOCK L.J.V., CLIN. MICROBIOL. REV., (2006), vol. 19, no. 2, pages 382 - 402 | - OLIVARES ET AL., FRONT. MICROBIOL., (2013), vol. 4, page 103 | - LI ET AL., CLIN. MICROBIOL. REV., (2015), vol. 28, no. 2, pages 337 - 418 | - NIKAIDO, ADV. ENZYMOL. RELAT. AREAS MOL. BIOL., (2011), vol. 77, pages 1 - 60 | - POOLE, J. ANTIMICROB. CHEMOTHER., (2005), vol. 56, pages 20 - 51 | - SUN ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (2014), vol. 453, no. 2, pages 254 - 267 | - NIKAIDO H., ADV. ENZYMOL. RELAT AREAS MOL. BIOL., (2011), vol. 77, pages 1 - 60 | - MURAKAMI S., CURR. OPIN. STRUCT. BIOL., (2008), vol. 18, pages 459 - 465 | - RUGGERONE ET AL., CURR. TOP MED. CHEM., (2013), vol. 13, no. 24, pages 3079 - 100 | - KIM ET AL., MOL. CELLS., (2015), vol. 38, no. 2, pages 180 - 186 | - DU ET AL., TRENDS MICROBIOL., (2015), vol. 23, pages 311 - 319 | - DU ET AL., NATURE, (2014), vol. 509, pages 512 - 515 | - TREPOUT ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (2010), vol. 1798, pages 1953 - 1960 | - SYMMONS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (2009), vol. 106, pages 7173 - 7178 | - YAMAGUCHI ET AL., FRONT MICROBIOL., (2015), vol. 6, page 327 | - RUGGERONE ET AL., CURR. TOPICS MED. CHEM., (2013), vol. 13, no. 24, pages 3079 - 3100 | - MORITA ET AL., FRONT. MICROBIOL., (2014), vol. 4, page 422 | - POOLE, CAN. J. MICROBIOL., (2014), vol. 60, pages 783 - 791 | - SOTO S. M., VIRULENCE, (2013), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 223 - 229 | - HIRAKATA ET AL., INT. J. ANTIMICROB. AGENTS., (2009), vol. 34, pages 343 - 346 | - PIDDOCK L. ET AL., J. ANTIMICROB. CHEMOTHER., (2010), vol. 65, pages 1215 - 1223 | - STARVI ET AL., J. ANTIMICROB. CHEMOTHER., (2007), vol. 59, no. 6, pages 1247 - 60 | - VAN BAMBEKE ET AL., FRONTIERS IN ANTI-INFECTIVE DRUG DISCOVERY, (2010), vol. 1, pages 138 - 175 | - ZECHINI B., VERSACE 1., (2009), vol. 4, pages 37 - 50 | - OPPERMAN; NGUYEN, FRONT. MICROBIOL., (2015), vol. 6, page 421 | - HUBAND ET AL., AAC, (2015), vol. 59, no. 1, page 467 | - LOCHER ET AL., AAC, (2015), vol. 59, no. 3, page 1455 | - GRILLOT ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2014), vol. 57, page 8792 | - R.O.; M.K. HUTCHINS, Comprehensive Organic Synthesis, PERGAMON PRESS, (1991), vol. 8, pages 25 - 78 | - TETRAHEDRON, (2004), vol. 60, page 7899 | - ORG. PROCESS RES. & DEV., (2002), page 863 | - J. ANTIBIOTICS, (2000), page 1071 | - O. MITSUNOBU, SYNTHESIS, (1981), page 1 | - CHEM. EUR. J., (1999), vol. 5, page 1055 | - F. VIDAL-AROCA ET AL., J. MICROBIOL. METHODS, (2009), vol. 79, pages 232 - 237 |