EP3294486 - METHOD FOR ENGRAVING, MARKING AND/OR INSCRIBING A WORKPIECE USING A LASER PLOTTER, AND LASER PLOTTER HEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trotec Laser GmbH Linzerstraße 156 4600 Wels / AT | [2018/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEWICKI, Gerhard Unterheuberg 8 4730 Waizenkirchen / AT | [2018/12] | Application number, filing date | 16728590.7 | 09.05.2016 | [2018/12] | WO2016AT50132 | Priority number, date | AT20150050402 | 13.05.2015 Original published format: AT 504022015 | [2018/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016179621 | Date: | 17.11.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3294486 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3294486 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/00, B23K26/06, B23K26/04, B23K26/08, B23K26/354, B23K26/362, B41M5/26 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
B23K26/361 (EP,CN,US);
B23K26/048 (EP,AT,CN,US);
B23K26/0643 (EP,CN,US);
B23K26/0648 (EP,CN,US);
B23K26/083 (EP,AT,CN,US);
B23K26/0869 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM GRAVIEREN, MARKIEREN UND/ODER BESCHRIFTEN EINES WERKSTÜCKES MIT EINEM LASERPLOTTER UND LASERPLOTTER HIERFÜR | [2019/49] | English: | METHOD FOR ENGRAVING, MARKING AND/OR INSCRIBING A WORKPIECE USING A LASER PLOTTER, AND LASER PLOTTER HEREFOR | [2018/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR RÉALISER UNE GRAVURE, UNE MARQUE ET/OU UNE INSCRIPTION SUR UNE PIÈCE AU MOYEN D'UN TRACEUR À LASER ET TRACEUR À LASER PRÉVU À CET EFFET | [2018/12] |
Former [2018/12] | VERFAHREN ZUM GRAVIEREN, MARKIEREN UND/ODER BESCHRIFTEN EINES WERKSTÜCKES () MIT EINEM LASERPLOTTER UND LASERPLOTTER HIERFÜR | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/12] | 11.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.05.2016 | AL | 08.04.2020 | CY | 08.04.2020 | CZ | 08.04.2020 | DK | 08.04.2020 | EE | 08.04.2020 | FI | 08.04.2020 | HR | 08.04.2020 | LT | 08.04.2020 | LV | 08.04.2020 | MC | 08.04.2020 | MK | 08.04.2020 | MT | 08.04.2020 | RO | 08.04.2020 | RS | 08.04.2020 | SE | 08.04.2020 | SI | 08.04.2020 | SK | 08.04.2020 | SM | 08.04.2020 | IE | 09.05.2020 | LU | 09.05.2020 | BG | 08.07.2020 | NO | 08.07.2020 | GR | 09.07.2020 | IS | 08.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 09.05.2016 | |
AL | 08.04.2020 | ||
CY | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
MT | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
IE | 09.05.2020 | ||
LU | 09.05.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
IE | 09.05.2020 | ||
LU | 09.05.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
IE | 09.05.2020 | ||
LU | 09.05.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
LU | 09.05.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 08.04.2020 | |
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 08.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1577048 (TROTEC PRODUKTIONS UND VERTRIE [AT]) [A] 1,9* figures 1-3; claims 1, 19 *; | [XI]CN201456866U (WUHAN ZHONGTAI DIGITAL OPTOELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,5,9,10 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1-3; claims 1, 2 * [I] 3,6-8,11,12; | [A]DE102008063037 (EUROLASER GMBH [DE]) [A] 9-12 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0017] *; | [A]AT512092 (TROTEC PRODUKTIONS U VERTRIEBS GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-12 * page 7, paragraph 2 - page 15, paragraph 4; figure 1; claims 1-10 * |