EP3277324 - A PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF BIO-ORGANIC COATED GOLD AND SILVER NANOPARTICLES USING BLUE LIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Council Of Scientific & Industrial Research Anusandhan Bhawan 2, Rafi Marg New Delhi 110 001 / IN | [2018/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ashish Institute of Microbial Technology Post Box No.1304 Sector 39A Chandigarh 160036 / IN | 02 /
RATHORE, Yogendra Singh Institute of Microbial Technology Post Box No.1304 Sector 39A Chandigarh 160036 / IN | 03 /
PEDDADA, Nagesh Institute of Microbial Technology Post Box No.1304 Sector 39A Chandigarh 160036 / IN | 04 /
DOLMA, Kunzes Institute of Microbial Technology Post Box No.1304 Sector 39A Chandigarh 160036 / IN | 05 /
GARG, Renu Institute of Microbial Technology Post Box No.1304 Sector 39A Chandigarh 160036 / IN | [2018/06] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2018/06] | Application number, filing date | 16729072.5 | 30.03.2016 | [2018/06] | WO2016IN50097 | Priority number, date | IN2015DEL870 | 30.03.2015 Original published format: IN 870DE2015 | [2018/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016157220 | Date: | 06.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3277324 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3277324 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/50, B22F1/00, B22F9/24, G01N21/25, G01N21/78, A61K47/62, A61K47/69 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
B22F9/24 (EP,CN,US);
A61K47/62 (EP,US);
A61K47/6923 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/48 (EP);
B22F1/054 (EP,CN,US);
B22F1/102 (EP,CN,US);
B22F1/148 (EP,CN,US);
G01N21/255 (US);
G01N21/31 (CN);
G01N21/78 (US);
B22F2301/255 (US);
B22F2999/00 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F9/24, B22F2201/11 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00, B22F9/24, B22F2202/11 (CN) |
Former IPC [2018/52] | A61K47/50, B22F1/00 | ||
Former IPC [2018/06] | A61K47/48, B22F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BIOORGANISCH BESCHICHTETEN GOLD- UND SILBERNANOPARTIKELN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON BLAUEM LICHT | [2018/06] | English: | A PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF BIO-ORGANIC COATED GOLD AND SILVER NANOPARTICLES USING BLUE LIGHT | [2018/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT LA PRÉPARATION DE NANOPARTICULES D'OR ET D'ARGENT REVÊTUES BIO-ORGANIQUES UTILISANT UNE LUMIÈRE BLEUE | [2018/06] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/06] | 09.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.03.2016 | AL | 01.05.2019 | CY | 01.05.2019 | CZ | 01.05.2019 | DK | 01.05.2019 | EE | 01.05.2019 | ES | 01.05.2019 | FI | 01.05.2019 | HR | 01.05.2019 | IT | 01.05.2019 | LT | 01.05.2019 | LV | 01.05.2019 | MC | 01.05.2019 | MK | 01.05.2019 | MT | 01.05.2019 | NL | 01.05.2019 | PL | 01.05.2019 | RO | 01.05.2019 | RS | 01.05.2019 | SE | 01.05.2019 | SI | 01.05.2019 | SK | 01.05.2019 | SM | 01.05.2019 | TR | 01.05.2019 | BG | 01.08.2019 | NO | 01.08.2019 | GR | 02.08.2019 | IS | 01.09.2019 | PT | 01.09.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 30.03.2016 | |
AL | 01.05.2019 | ||
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
MT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 01.05.2019 | |
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 01.05.2019 | |
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | Cited in | International search | [IY] - WANG JING ET AL, "Preparation of optically active Ag nanoparticles by UV light irradiation", CHINESE JOURNAL OF INORGANIC CHEMISTRY / WU JI HUA XUE XUE BAO, CHINESE ELECTRONIC PERIODICAL SERVICES, CN, (20140101), vol. 30, no. 8, ISSN 1001-4861, pages 1889 - 1894, XP008180950 [I] 1-4,7-9 * Abstract; page 2, paragraphs 1.1 and 1.2; page 3, paragraph 2.3 * [Y] 5,6 | [Y] - MORALES JAVIER O ET AL, "Films loaded with insulin-coated nanoparticles (ICNP) as potential platforms for peptide buccal delivery", COLLOIDS AND SURFACES. B, BIOINTERFACES, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20140623), vol. 122, doi:10.1016/J.COLSURFB.2014.05.025, ISSN 0927-7765, pages 38 - 45, XP029063457 [Y] 6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.colsurfb.2014.05.025 | [Y] - YANYAN YU ET AL, "Gelsolin bound [beta]-amyloid peptides(1-40/1-42): Electrochemical evaluation of levels of soluble peptide associated with Alzheimer's disease", BIOSENSORS AND BIOELECTRONICS, NL, (20141218), vol. 68, doi:10.1016/j.bios.2014.12.041, ISSN 0956-5663, pages 115 - 121, XP055292709 [Y] 5 * Abstract page 117, scheme 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bios.2014.12.041 | [A] - SANGEETHA KRISHNAMURTHY ET AL, "Lipid-coated polymeric nanoparticles for cancer drug delivery", BIOMATERIALS SCIENCE, GB, (20150101), vol. 3, no. 7, doi:10.1039/C4BM00427B, ISSN 2047-4830, pages 923 - 936, XP055291381 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C4BM00427B | [A] - YAZHUO SHANG ET AL, "Synthesis of gold nanoparticles by reduction of HAuCl4 under UV irradiation", SOLID STATE SCIENCES, (20130101), vol. 15, doi:10.1016/j.solidstatesciences.2012.09.002, ISSN 1293-2558, pages 17 - 23, XP055124303 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.solidstatesciences.2012.09.002 | [A] - ABOU EL-NOUR K M M ET AL, "Synthesis and applications of silver nanoparticles", ARABIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, SAUDI CHEMICAL SOCIETY, SA, vol. 3, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.ARABJC.2010.04.008, ISSN 1878-5352, (20100701), pages 135 - 140, (20100414), XP027079708 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.arabjc.2010.04.008 | by applicant | - BERTI, L.; A. ALESSANDRINI ET AL., "DNA-templated photoinduced silver deposition", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2005), vol. 127, no. 32, doi:doi:10.1021/ja052461w, pages 11216 - 11217, XP055378892 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja052461w | - CARDOSO, V. S.; P. V. QUELEMES ET AL., "Collagen-based silver nanoparticles for biological applications: synthesis and characterization", JOURNAL OF NANOBIOTECHNOLOGY, (2014), vol. 12, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1186/s12951-014-0036-6, page 36, XP021200333 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s12951-014-0036-6 | - EBY, D. M.; N. M. SCHAEUBLIN ET AL., "Lysozyme catalyzes the formation of antimicrobial silver nanoparticles", ACS NANO, (2009), vol. 3, no. 4, pages 984 - 994 | - FILIPPO, E.; A. SERRA ET AL., "Green synthesis of silver nanoparticles with sucrose and maltose: Morphological and structural characterization", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS, (2010), vol. 356, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jnoncrysol.2009.11.021, pages 344 - 350, XP026886660 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jnoncrysol.2009.11.021 | - KRISHNAMURTHY, S.; R. VAIYAPURI ET AL., "Lipid-coated polymeric nanoparticles for .-/ cancer drug delivery", BIOMATERIALS SCIENCE, (2015), vol. 3, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1039/C4BM00427B, pages 923 - 936, XP055291381 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C4BM00427B | - LE GUEVEL, X.; N. DAUIN ET AL., "Synthesis and characterization of human transferrin-stabilized gold nanoclusters", NANOTECHNOLOGY, (2011), vol. 22, no. 27, doi:doi:10.1088/0957-4484/22/27/275103, page 275103, XP020206882 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-4484/22/27/275103 | - MALLIK, L.; E. ARIF ET AL., "Solution structure analysis of cytoplasmic domain of podocyte protein Nephl using small/wide angle x-ray scattering (SWAXS", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2012), vol. 287, no. 12, pages 9441 - 9453 | - TAN, Y. N.; J. Y. LEE ET AL., "Uncovering the design rules for peptide synthesis of metal nanoparticles.", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2010), vol. 132, no. 16, doi:doi:10.1021/ja907454f, pages 5677 - 5686, XP055510917 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja907454f | - XIE, J.; Y. ZHENG ET AL., "Protein-directed synthesis of highly fluorescent gold nanoclusters", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2009), vol. 131, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1021/ja806804u, pages 888 - 889, XP055080345 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja806804u |