EP3307357 - DATA COLLECTION APPARATUS FOR ATTACHMENT TO AN INJECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2023 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstraße 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2023/23] |
Former [2018/16] | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstraße 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOPOREK, Maurice c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
DITTRICH, Marcus-Meinolf c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 03 /
NESSEL, Christian c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 04 /
RIEDEL, Stephan c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 05 /
KOLLER, Armin Helbling Technik AG Hubstrasse 24 9500 Will / CH | 06 /
HEINRICH, Alexander Helbling Technik AG Hubstrasse 24 9500 Will / CH | 07 /
EBERLI, Florian Helbling Technik AG Hubstrasse 24 9500 Will / CH | 08 /
MÜLLER, Philipp Helbling Technik AG Hubstrasse 24 9500 Will / CH | 09 /
ZWICKER, Sven Helbling Technik AG Hubstrasse 24 9500 Will / CH | 10 /
FELBER, Matthias Helbling Technik AG Hubstrasse 24 9500 Will / CH | 11 /
GUGL, Christoph, Matthias Helbling Technik AG Hubstrasse 24 9500 Will / CH | [2018/16] | Representative(s) | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/23] | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Friedrichstraße 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2018/16] | Derry, Paul Stefan, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 16729241.6 | 09.06.2016 | [2018/16] | WO2016EP63139 | Priority number, date | EP20150171252 | 09.06.2015 Original published format: EP 15171252 | EP20150199308 | 10.12.2015 Original published format: EP 15199308 | [2018/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016198516 | Date: | 15.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3307357 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3307357 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP3307357 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/315 | [2018/16] | CPC: |
A61M5/31551 (EP,CN,US);
A61M5/31528 (CN,US);
A61M5/31585 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2005/3125 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2005/3126 (EP);
A61M2205/33 (EP);
A61M2205/3306 (CN,US);
A61M2205/502 (CN,US);
A61M2205/52 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2205/581 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2205/584 (EP);
A61M2205/587 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/16] | Title | German: | DATENSAMMLUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG AN EINER INJEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/16] | English: | DATA COLLECTION APPARATUS FOR ATTACHMENT TO AN INJECTION DEVICE | [2018/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COLLECTE DE DONNEES DESTINE A ETRE FIXE A UN DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION | [2020/01] |
Former [2018/16] | DISPOSITIF DE COLLECTE DE DONNÉES POUR FIXATION SUR UN DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/16] | 02.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19209180.9 / EP3656423 | EP23208919.3 / EP4316552 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.02.2021
11.02.2021
ADMISSIBLE Di-Care Zrt. Kórház utca 14 2673 Csitár / HU Opponent's representative Kacsuk, Zsófia Kacsukpatent Kft. Üteg u. 11/a 1139 Budapest / HU | [2021/11] | 19.02.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.07.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.06.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.09.2022 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.09.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.01.2023 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 02.05.2023 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 11.11.2022 | Appeal received No. T2439/22 | 11.11.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 18.01.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 06.05.2020 | CY | 06.05.2020 | EE | 06.05.2020 | FI | 06.05.2020 | HR | 06.05.2020 | LT | 06.05.2020 | LV | 06.05.2020 | MC | 06.05.2020 | MK | 06.05.2020 | MT | 06.05.2020 | RO | 06.05.2020 | RS | 06.05.2020 | SI | 06.05.2020 | SK | 06.05.2020 | SM | 06.05.2020 | LU | 09.06.2020 | BG | 06.08.2020 | IS | 06.09.2020 | PT | 07.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
MT | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
LU | 09.06.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
LU | 09.06.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
LU | 09.06.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 06.05.2020 | |
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 06.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE29904864U (BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 1-31 * figures 6,7 *; | [XY]WO2010098927 (LIFESCAN INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0060]; figures 6A-8A * [Y] 2-31; | [XY]WO2013120774 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 4,10 *[Y] 2-31; | [XY]EP2692378 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [X] 1 * figure - * [Y] 2-31; | [XY]WO2014037331 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 11 * [Y] 2-31; | [XY]WO2014064691 (INSULINE MEDICAL LTD [IL]) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2-31; | [Y]EP2762184 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [Y] 1-31 * figures 3,4 * | Examination | WO2014037331 | Opposition | US7008399 | EP2182456 | WO2012127046 | EP2692378 | WO2014128156 | EP2401012 | US2014194826 |