EP3329147 - PNEUMATICALLY ADJUSTABLE CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERUNDT, Oliver Schafhof 5 71292 Friolzheim / DE | 02 /
KRASTEV, Ianislav Stuttgarter Str. 92 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | 03 /
SCHWARTZ, Daniel Zaisersweiherstr. 5 75447 Diefenbach / DE | 04 /
DREWE, Ingo Beethovenstr. 4 77815 Buehl / DE | 05 /
EYDAM, Rudolf In Der Reuth 9 96129 Geisfeld / DE | 06 /
DIEKMANN, Ralf Lise-Meitner-Str. 6 71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | 07 /
BREITINGER, Carolin Goethestr. 38 71672 Marbach Am Neckar / DE | 08 /
KLYMENKO, Mykhaylo Max-Eyth Str. 6/4 70839 Gerlingen / DE | [2018/23] | Application number, filing date | 16729529.4 | 08.06.2016 | [2018/23] | WO2016EP63033 | Priority number, date | DE201510214153 | 27.07.2015 Original published format: DE102015214153 | [2018/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017016732 | Date: | 02.02.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3329147 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16H9/18, F16H63/06, F16H55/56 | [2018/23] | CPC: |
F16H55/563 (EP);
F16H61/30 (EP);
F16H63/065 (EP);
F16H9/18 (EP);
B60Y2400/408 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/23] | Title | German: | PNEUMATISCH VERSTELLBARES CVT-GETRIEBE | [2018/23] | English: | PNEUMATICALLY ADJUSTABLE CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE TRANSMISSION | [2018/23] | French: | TRANSMISSION À VARIATION CONTINUE À RÉGLAGE PNEUMATIQUE | [2018/23] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/23] | 27.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/26] | 12.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the invitation to file a copy of earlier search results or a statement of non-availability not received in time [2019/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0147739 (SPEED SELECTOR INC [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-14 * page 10, lines 24-25; figure 1 *; | [X]WO2014052725 (BRP POWERTRAIN GMBH & CO KG [AT], et al) [X] 1,8,9,12,14 * figures 3A, 3B *; | [A]US2005197221 (NOZAWA HIROFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |