EP3439647 - COMPOSITION FOR USE IN REDUCING OR PREVENTING GLOBAL DEVELOPMENTAL DELAY IN CHILDREN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/07] | METHOD FOR REDUCING OR PREVENTING GLOBAL DEVELOPMENTAL DELAY IN CHILDREN | ||
[2022/41] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL | [2019/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN ELBURG, Ruurd Uppsalalaan 12 3584 CT Utrecht / NL | 02 /
VOS, Arjen Paul Uppsalalaan 12 3584 CT Utrecht / NL | 03 /
COUNOTTE, Danielle Stefanie Uppsalalaan 12 3584 CT Utrecht / NL | 04 /
SMORENBURG, Ana Renée Pascale Uppsalalaan 12 3584 CT Utrecht / NL | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2019/07] | Application number, filing date | 16730030.0 | 04.04.2016 | [2019/07] | WO2016NL50232 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017176109 | Date: | 12.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3439647 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3439647 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/14, A61K31/7068, A61K31/7072, A61K31/714, A61K33/18, A61K33/30, A61P25/00, A61K31/202 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
A61K31/202 (EP,US);
A61K31/14 (EP,US);
A61K31/7068 (EP,US);
A61K31/7072 (EP,US);
A61K31/714 (EP,US);
A61K33/18 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/14, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/202, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/7068, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/7072, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2019/07] | A61K31/14, A61K31/202, A61K31/7068, A61K31/7072, A61P25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUBEREITUNG ZUR VERMINDERUNG ODER VERHINDERUNG VON GLOBALER ENTWICKLUNGSVERZÖGERUNG BEI KINDERN | [2022/41] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR USE IN REDUCING OR PREVENTING GLOBAL DEVELOPMENTAL DELAY IN CHILDREN | [2022/41] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR LA RÉDUCTION OU LA PRÉVENTION D'UN RETARD DE DÉVELOPPEMENT GLOBAL CHEZ DES ENFANTS | [2022/41] |
Former [2019/07] | VERFAHREN ZUR VERMINDERUNG ODER VERHINDERUNG VON GLOBALER ENTWICKLUNGSVERZÖGERUNG BEI KINDERN | ||
Former [2019/07] | METHOD FOR REDUCING OR PREVENTING GLOBAL DEVELOPMENTAL DELAY IN CHILDREN | ||
Former [2019/07] | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉDUCTION OU DE PRÉVENTION D'UN RETARD DE DÉVELOPPEMENT GLOBAL CHEZ DES ENFANTS | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 04.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.09.2021 | 11.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2023
02.01.2024
ADMISSIBLE Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Entre-deux-Villes 1800 Vevey / CH Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2023
02.01.2024
ADMISSIBLE Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Entre-deux-Villes 1800 Vevey / CH Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2024/05] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2023
Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Entre-deux-Villes 1800 Vevey / CH Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | 12.01.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.04.2024 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.02.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.03.2023 | CZ | 22.03.2023 | DK | 22.03.2023 | EE | 22.03.2023 | FI | 22.03.2023 | HR | 22.03.2023 | LT | 22.03.2023 | LV | 22.03.2023 | MC | 22.03.2023 | RO | 22.03.2023 | RS | 22.03.2023 | SE | 22.03.2023 | SI | 22.03.2023 | SK | 22.03.2023 | SM | 22.03.2023 | LU | 04.04.2023 | BE | 30.04.2023 | NO | 22.06.2023 | GR | 23.06.2023 | IS | 22.07.2023 | PT | 24.07.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/08] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
LU | 04.04.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
LU | 04.04.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 22.03.2023 | |
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 22.03.2023 | |
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 22.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0178530 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [X] 1-25 * Neurological development; page 9 * * Experimental Design; page 26 - page 27 * * page 47, paragraph 1 * * page 48; table 8 * * claims 1-22 *; | [X]WO2012125020 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-25 * page 21 - page 23; examples 2,3 *; | [T] - Anonymous, "Product Information: Similac NeoSure Similac NeoSure Infant Formula with Iron", (20160719), pages 1 - 6, URL: http://static.abbottnutrition.com/cms-prod/abbottnutrition.com/img/Similac-NeoSure.pdf, (20161025), XP055313841 [T] 1-25 * page 2 * * page 4 * | by applicant | WO2012125034 | - BOS, A, DEVELOPMENTAL MEDICINE & CHILD NEUROLOGY, (2013), vol. 55, pages 973 - 979 | Opposition | WO0178530 | US2002028787 | US2005176676 | US2005203053 | WO2007073177 | WO2012125020 | WO2014109862 | - Morag J Andrew;Jeremy R Parr;Chris Montague-Johnson;Oliver Braddick;Karen Laler;Nicola Williams;Bonny Baker;Peter B Sullivan, "Optimising nutrition to improve growth and reduce neurodisabilities in neonates at risk of neurological impairment, and children with suspected or confirmed cerebral palsy", BMC PEDIATRICS, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, GB , (20150317), vol. 15, no. 1, doi:10.1186/s12887-015-0339-2, ISSN 1471-2431, page 22, XP021217171 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s12887-015-0339-2 | - Gil A; Ramirez M; Gil M, "Role of long-chain polyunsaturated fatty acids in infant nutrition", European Journal of Clinical Nutrition, Nature Publishing Group, GB, GB , (20030828), vol. 57, no. Suppl 1, doi:10.1038/sj.ejcn.1601810, ISSN 0954-3007, pages S31 - S34, XP037762848 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.ejcn.1601810 | - COSGROVE M, "Perinatal and infant nutrition. Nucleotides.", Nutrition, Elsevier, AMSTERDAM, NL, AMSTERDAM, NL , (19981001), vol. 14, no. 10, ISSN 0899-9007, pages 748 - 751, XP002561642 | - Anonymous, "Similac® NeoSure®", Product Data Sheet, (20230422), pages 1 - 4, XP093150296 | - Clandinin, M.T. Van Aerde, J.E. Merkel, K.L. Harris, C.L. Springer, M.A. Hansen, J.W. Diersen-Schade, D.A., "Growth and development of preterm infants fed infant formulas containing docosahexaenoic acid and arachidonic acid", JOURNAL OF PEDIATRICS., MOSBY-YEAR BOOK, ST. LOUIS, MO, US, US , (20050401), vol. 146, no. 4, doi:10.1016/j.jpeds.2004.11.030, ISSN 0022-3476, pages 461 - 468, XP004841103 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpeds.2004.11.030 | - Eileen E Birch; Sharon Garfield; Dennis R Hoffman; Ricardo Uauy; David G Birch, "A randomized controlled trial of early dietary supply of long‐chain polyunsaturated fatty acids and mental development in term infants", Developmental Medicine & Child Neurology, HEINEMANN WILLIAM MEDICAL BOOKS, LONDON, GB, GB , (20070213), vol. 42, no. 3, doi:10.1111/j.1469-8749.2000.tb00066.x, ISSN 0012-1622, pages 174 - 181, XP071194698 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1469-8749.2000.tb00066.x | - Makrides Maria, Gibson Robert A, Mcphee Andrew J, Collins Carmel T, Davis Peter G, Doyle Lex W, Simmer Karen, Colditz Paul B, Morris Scott, Smithers Lisa G, Willson Kristyn, Ryan Philip, "Neurodevelopmental Outcomes of Preterm Infants Fed High-Dose Docosahexaenoic Acid: A Randomized Controlled Trial", JAMA, American Medical Association, (20090114), vol. 301, no. 2, doi:10.1001/jama.2008.945, ISSN 0098-7484, pages 175 - 182, XP093150298 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/jama.2008.945 | - Wurtman, R.J. Ulus, I.H. Cansev, M. Watkins, C.J. Wang, L. Marzloff, G., "Synaptic proteins and phospholipids are increased in gerbil brain by administering uridine plus docosahexaenoic acid orally", Brain Research, ELSEVIER, Amsterdam, NL, NL , (20060509), vol. 1088, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.brainres.2006.03.019, ISSN 0006-8993, pages 83 - 92, XP005446770 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.brainres.2006.03.019 | - Cansev Mehmet, Marzloff George, Sakamoto Toshimasa, Ulus Ismail H., Wurtman Richard J., "Giving Uridine and/or Docosahexaenoic Acid Orally to Rat Dams during Gestation and Nursing Increases Synaptic Elements in Brains of Weanling Pups", Developmental Neuroscience, (20090115), vol. 31, doi:10.1159/000193394, pages 181 - 192, XP093150302 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000193394 | - Sakamoto, T. Cansev, M. Wurtman, R.J., "Oral supplementation with docosahexaenoic acid and uridine-5'-monophosphate increases dendritic spine density in adult gerbil hippocampus", Brain Research, ELSEVIER, Amsterdam, NL, NL , (20071113), vol. 1182, doi:10.1016/j.brainres.2007.08.089, ISSN 0006-8993, pages 50 - 59, XP022343045 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.brainres.2007.08.089 | - S. Holguin, J. Martinez, C. Chow, R. Wurtman, "Dietary uridine enhances the improvement in learning and memory produced by administering DHA to gerbils", The FASEB Journal, The Federation, (20081101), vol. 22, no. 11, doi:10.1096/fj.08-112425, ISSN 08926638, pages 3938 - 3946, XP055006757 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1096/fj.08-112425 | - Albers Craig A., Grieve Adam J., "Test reviews", Journal of Psychoeducational Assessment, (20070601), vol. 25, no. 2, pages 180 - 198, XP093150304 | - Bélanger Stacey A, Caron Joannie, "Evaluation of the child with global developmental delay and intellectual disability", Paediatrics & child health : the journal of the Canadian Paediatric Society ; journal de la Société Canadienne de Pédiatrie, Pulsus Group, Oakville, Ont., Canada, Oakville, Ont., Canada , (20180816), vol. 23, no. 6, doi:10.1093/pch/pxy093, ISSN 1205-7088, pages 403 - 410, XP093150309 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/pch/pxy093 |