EP3311456 - METHOD FOR MOUNTING ELECTRIC SWITCHING SYSTEMS, AND ASSEMBLY SUPPORT DEVICE FOR SIMPLIFYING THE ASSEMBLY OF SUCH SWITCHING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.12.2019 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liebherr-Components Biberach GmbH Hans-Liebherr-Strasse 45 88400 Biberach an der Riß / DE | [2019/06] |
Former [2018/17] | For all designated states Liebherr-Components Biberach GmbH Hans-Liebherr-Strasse 45 88400 Biberach an der Riß / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FENKER, Oliver An der Schlosshalde 3 88447 Warthausen / DE | [2018/17] | Representative(s) | Thoma, Michael Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2018/17] | Application number, filing date | 16730253.8 | 15.06.2016 | [2018/17] | WO2016EP00998 | Priority number, date | DE20151007624 | 16.06.2015 Original published format: DE102015007624 | [2018/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016202454 | Date: | 22.12.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3311456 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3311456 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02B3/00, G05B19/418, G06F17/50, H05K7/14 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
H02B3/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G05B19/4183 (KR);
G06F30/39 (US);
G06F30/398 (KR);
G06T11/60 (US);
H02B1/04 (US);
H05K7/1498 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G05B15/02 (US);
G05B2219/32014 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM MONTIEREN VON ELEKTRISCHEN SCHALTANLAGEN SOWIE MONTAGEHILFSVORRICHTUNG ZUM ERLEICHTERN DER MONTAGE SOLCHER SCHALTANLAGEN | [2018/17] | English: | METHOD FOR MOUNTING ELECTRIC SWITCHING SYSTEMS, AND ASSEMBLY SUPPORT DEVICE FOR SIMPLIFYING THE ASSEMBLY OF SUCH SWITCHING SYSTEMS | [2018/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MONTAGE D'INSTALLATIONS DE DISTRIBUTION ÉLECTRIQUES ET DISPOSITIF DE MONTAGE AUXILIAIRE POUR FACILITER LE MONTAGE DE TELLES INSTALLATIONS DE DISTRIBUTION | [2018/17] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/17] | 29.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18212687.0 / EP3477804 | Opposition(s) | 07.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 06.02.2019 | CY | 06.02.2019 | CZ | 06.02.2019 | DK | 06.02.2019 | EE | 06.02.2019 | HR | 06.02.2019 | LV | 06.02.2019 | MC | 06.02.2019 | MK | 06.02.2019 | MT | 06.02.2019 | RS | 06.02.2019 | SI | 06.02.2019 | SK | 06.02.2019 | SM | 06.02.2019 | GR | 07.05.2019 | IS | 06.06.2019 | PT | 06.06.2019 | LU | 15.06.2019 | BE | 30.06.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/48] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
MT | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
LU | 15.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
MT | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
LU | 15.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
LU | 15.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
LU | 15.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 06.02.2019 | |
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HR | 06.02.2019 | |
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | GR | 07.05.2019 | |
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | PT | 06.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE19810115 (MOELLER GMBH [DE]); | [AD]DE102008012122 (RITTAL GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [AD]DE202012003317U (GOOGLE INC [US]); | [A]WO2015028978 (UMPI ELETTRONICA SOCIETA A RESPONSABILITA LIMITATA [IT]) |