EP3310610 - DRIVE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DRIVING A MEANS OF PROPULSION OF A VEHICLE BY USING CRYOGENIC COOLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce Deutschland Ltd & Co KG Eschenweg 11 15827 Blankenfelde-Mahlow / DE | [2020/12] |
Former [2018/17] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARNDT, Tabea Ina Seidelstrasse 4 91056 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
FILIPENKO, Mykhaylo Ginsterweg 23 91058 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
MAKOWSKA, Agnieszka Zaunkönigweg 20 90768 Fürth / DE | 04 /
ANTON, Frank Badstrasse 40 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2018/17] | Application number, filing date | 16731551.4 | 15.06.2016 | [2018/17] | WO2016EP63731 | Priority number, date | DE201510215130 | 07.08.2015 Original published format: DE102015215130 | [2018/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017025224 | Date: | 16.02.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3310610 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60L11/12 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
B60L50/15 (EP,US);
B60L50/70 (EP,US);
B64D27/24 (US);
H02K55/04 (US);
B60L2200/10 (EP,US);
B64D33/08 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/17] | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ANTREIBEN EINES VORTRIEBSMITTELS EINES FAHRZEUGS, UNTER VERWENDUNG KRYOGENER KÜHLUNG | [2018/17] | English: | DRIVE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DRIVING A MEANS OF PROPULSION OF A VEHICLE BY USING CRYOGENIC COOLING | [2018/17] | French: | SYSTEME DE PROPULSION ET PROCÉDÉ D'ENTRAÎNEMENT D'UN MOYEN DE PROPULSION D'UN VÉHICULE, EN UTILISANT UN REFROIDISSEMENT CRYOGÉNIQUE | [2018/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/17] | 02.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/30] | 23.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2006254255 (OKAI KEIICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0076] * * figures 1, 2, 5 *; | [Y]US2013082518 (EDWARDS HUW LLEWELYN [GB]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0035] ** figure 1 * |