EP3302041 - CYLINDRICAL SYSTEM FOR ANIMAL EXCREMENT REMOVAL WITH REMOVABLE LITTER TRAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Couto, Dúnio Ladeira Branca nº6 - 1ºDt Santa Luzia 9700 - 241 Angra do Heroísmo Angra do Heroísmo / PT | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Monteiro Alves, Inês Alameda Dos Oceanos, Nº 41K-21 Parque das Nações 1990-207 Lisboa / PT | [2018/15] | Application number, filing date | 16732007.6 | 14.05.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016PT50009 | Priority number, date | PT20150108503 | 27.05.2015 Original published format: PT 2015108503 | [2018/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016190765 | Date: | 01.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3302041 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3302041 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A01K1/01 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
A01K1/0114 (EP,US);
A01K1/0107 (RU);
A01K1/011 (RU);
A01K23/005 (RU)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Extension states | BA | 22.12.2017 | ME | 22.12.2017 | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZYLINDRISCHES SYSTEM ZUR TIEREXKREMENTBESEITIGUNG MIT ABNEHMBARER STREUSCHALE | [2018/15] | English: | CYLINDRICAL SYSTEM FOR ANIMAL EXCREMENT REMOVAL WITH REMOVABLE LITTER TRAY | [2018/15] | French: | SYSTÈME CYLINDRIQUE POUR ÉLIMINATION D'EXCRÉMENTS D'ANIMAUX AVEC UNE CAISSE À LITIÈRE AMOVIBLE | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 06.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 20.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.05.2016 | AL | 31.07.2019 | CZ | 31.07.2019 | EE | 31.07.2019 | HR | 31.07.2019 | LT | 31.07.2019 | LV | 31.07.2019 | MK | 31.07.2019 | MT | 31.07.2019 | NL | 31.07.2019 | SI | 31.07.2019 | SK | 31.07.2019 | SM | 31.07.2019 | IS | 30.10.2019 | BE | 31.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/29] | HU | 14.05.2016 | |
AL | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MT | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | HR | 31.07.2019 | |
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | LT | 31.07.2019 | |
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 31.07.2019 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US5107797 (LAROCHE JEAN-LUC [FR]) [Y] 1-3,6-13 * column 2, lines 53-64; figure 10 * [A] 4,5; | [A]US6126015 (HAYMAKER ROGER L [US]) [A] 1-13* column 22, lines 13-25; figures 1, 2, 5, 31 *; | [YA]US2005224006 (COLSKY ANDREW E [US]) [Y] 1-3,6-13 * paragraphs [0039] , [0041] , [0 42] , [0 51] , [0 52]; figures 1-5 * [A] 4,5 | by applicant | US4120264 | US5662066 | US6463881 | WO2013160899 | US2014245960 |