EP3301186 - METHOD, SEQUENCES, COMPOSITIONS AND KIT FOR DETECTION OF MUTATIONEN IN THE PROMOTER OF THE GENE HTERT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/14] | METHOD, SEQUENCES, COMPOSITIONS AND KIT FOR DETECTION OF MUTATIONS IN THE HTERT | ||
[2020/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IPATIMUP ( Instituto de Patologia e Imunologia Molecular da Universidade do Porto Rua Dr. Roberto Frias s/n 4200-465 Porto / PT | [2018/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOARES DIAS FERREIRA, Ana Paula Rua João das Regras 67 1º 4000-292 Porto / PT | 02 /
MARQUES PRAZERES, Hugo João Qta S. Francisco Lote 54 2º Esq. 3200-343 Serpins / PT | 03 /
ALVES SALGADO, Catarina Miguel Rua Eça De Queirós 140 2º Esq Gondomar 4510-555 Fânzeres / PT | 04 /
MONTEIRO BATISTA, Rui Pedro Rua Fonte da Pereira B 5000-105 Vila Real / PT | 05 /
RICO DE OLIVEIRA VINAGRE, João Pedro Rua Visconde de Ovar 152 3880-272 Ovar / PT | [2018/14] | Representative(s) | Ferreira Pinto, Francisca Garrigues IP, Unipessoal Lda. Av. da República, 25-1° 1050-186 Lisboa / PT | [2018/14] | Application number, filing date | 16732356.7 | 02.05.2016 | [2018/14] | WO2016PT50007 | Priority number, date | PT20150108419 | 30.04.2015 Original published format: PT 2015108419 | [2018/14] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016175672 | Date: | 03.11.2016 | Language: | PT | [2016/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3301186 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3301186 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6886 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,RU,US);
C12N15/65 (PT);
C12N15/52 (PT);
C12Q1/68 (PT);
C12Q1/6806 (RU);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/14] | C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METHODEN, SEQUENZEN, ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND KIT ZUM NACHWEIS VON MUTATIONEN IM PROMOTER DES HTERT GENS | [2020/49] | English: | METHOD, SEQUENCES, COMPOSITIONS AND KIT FOR DETECTION OF MUTATIONEN IN THE PROMOTER OF THE GENE HTERT | [2020/49] | French: | MÉTHODE, SÉQUENCES, COMPOSITIONS ET TROUSSE POUR LA DÉTECTION DE MUTATIONS DANS LE PROMOTEUR DU GÈNE HTERT | [2018/14] |
Former [2018/14] | VERFAHREN, SEQUENZEN, ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND KIT ZUR DETEKTION VON MUTATIONEN IN DER HTERT | ||
Former [2018/14] | METHOD, SEQUENCES, COMPOSITIONS AND KIT FOR DETECTION OF MUTATIONS IN THE HTERT | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2017 | Translation filed | 29.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/14] | 29.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.05.2016 | AL | 27.01.2021 | AT | 27.01.2021 | CY | 27.01.2021 | CZ | 27.01.2021 | EE | 27.01.2021 | FI | 27.01.2021 | HR | 27.01.2021 | LT | 27.01.2021 | LV | 27.01.2021 | MK | 27.01.2021 | MT | 27.01.2021 | PL | 27.01.2021 | RO | 27.01.2021 | RS | 27.01.2021 | SI | 27.01.2021 | SK | 27.01.2021 | SM | 27.01.2021 | BG | 27.04.2021 | GR | 28.04.2021 | IE | 02.05.2021 | PT | 27.05.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 02.05.2016 | |
AL | 27.01.2021 | ||
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CY | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MK | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 02.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 02.05.2016 | |
AL | 27.01.2021 | ||
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CY | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 02.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 02.05.2016 | |
AL | 27.01.2021 | ||
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 02.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 02.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2015049063 (DEUTSCHES KREBSFORSCH [DE]) [X] 15* pages 5,14,70; claims 28,30 *; | [I] - YVES ALLORY ET AL, "Telomerase Reverse Transcriptase Promoter Mutations in Bladder Cancer: High Frequency Across Stages, Detection in Urine, and Lack of Association with Outcome", EUROPEAN UROLOGY, NL, (20140201), vol. 65, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.eururo.2013.08.052, ISSN 0302-2838, pages 360 - 366, XP055305481 [I] 1-14 * page 363 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.eururo.2013.08.052 | [A] - CHRISTIAN KOELSCHE ET AL, "TERT promoter hotspot mutations are recurrent in myxoid liposarcomas but rare in other soft tissue sarcoma entities", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL & CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, LONDON UK, (20140411), vol. 33, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1756-9966-33-33, ISSN 1756-9966, page 33, XP021182412 [A] 1-15 * page 35 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1756-9966-33-33 | [I] - KUN WANG ET AL, "TERT promoter mutations are associated with distant metastases in upper tract urothelial carcinomas and serve as urinary biomarkers detected by a sensitive castPCR", ONCOTARGET, (20141209), vol. 5, no. 23, doi:10.18632/oncotarget.2660, pages 12428 - 12439, XP055305432 [I] 1-14 * page 12429 - page 12431; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.18632/oncotarget.2660 | by applicant | WO2014160834 | WO2015153808 | - BEAUCAGE, SL; IYER, RP, "Advances in the Synthesis of Oligonucleotides by the Phosphoramidite Approach", TETRAHEDRON, (1992), vol. 48, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1016/S0040-4020(01)88752-4, page 2223, XP000915225 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(01)88752-4 | - HAYFLICK, L; P.S. MOORHEAD, "The serial cultivation of human diploid cell strains", EXP CELL RES, (1961), vol. 25, doi:doi:10.1016/0014-4827(61)90192-6, pages 585 - 621, XP024789652 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-4827(61)90192-6 | - BLACKBURN, E.H., "Structure and function of telomeres", NATURE, (1991), vol. 350, no. 6319, doi:doi:10.1038/350569a0, pages 569 - 73, XP002004674 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/350569a0 | - GREIDER, C.W., "Telomerase is processive", MOL CELL BIOL, (1991), vol. 11, no. 9, pages 4572 - 80 | - SZOSTAK, J.W.; E.H. BLACKBURN, "Cloning yeast telomeres on linear plasmid vectors", CELL, (1982), vol. 29, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/0092-8674(82)90109-X, pages 245 - 55, XP023911263 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(82)90109-X | - GUNES, C.; K.L. RUDOLPH, "The role of telomeres in stem cells and cancer", CELL, (2013), vol. 152, no. 3, pages 390 - 3 | - MURNANE, J.P., "Telomere dysfunction and chromosome instability", MUTAT RES, (2012), vol. 730, no. 1-2, pages 28 - 36 | - CESARE, A.J.; R.R. REDDEL, "Alternative lengthening of telomeres: models, mechanisms and implications", NAT REV GENET, (2010), vol. 11, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1038/nrg2763, pages 319 - 30, XP055166193 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrg2763 | - KIM, 'N.W. ET AL., "Specific association of human telomerase activity with immortal cells and cancer", SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 266, no. 5193, doi:doi:10.1126/science.7605428, pages 2011 - 5, XP002138759 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.7605428 | - KYO, S. ET AL., "Understanding and exploiting hTERT promoter regulation for diagnosis and treatment of human cancers", CANCER SCI, (2008), vol. 99, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1349-7006.2008.00878.x, pages 1528 - 38, XP055236338 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1349-7006.2008.00878.x | - AUBERT, G.; P.M. LANSDORP, "Telomeres and aging", PHYSIOL REV, (2008), vol. 88, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1152/PHYSREV.00026.2007, pages 557 - 79, XP008103401 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/PHYSREV.00026.2007 | - KILLELA, P.J. ET AL., "TERT promoter mutations occur frequently in gliomas and a subset of tumors derived from cells with low rates of self-renewal", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2013), vol. 110, no. 15, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.1303607110, pages 6021 - 6, XP055110090 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1303607110 | - LIU, X. ET AL., "Highly prevalent TERT promoter mutations in aggressive thyroid cancers", ENDOCR RELAT CANCER, (2013), vol. 20, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1530/ERC-13-0210, pages 603 - 10, XP055110005 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1530/ERC-13-0210 | - NAULT, J.C. ET AL., "High frequency of telomerase reverse-transcriptase promoter somatic mutations in hepatocellular carcinoma and preneoplastic lesions", NAT COMMUN, (2013), vol. 4, page 2218 | - VINAGRE, J. ET AL., "Frequency of TERT promoter mutations in human cancers", NAT COMMUN, (2013), vol. 4, doi:doi:10.1038/ncomms3185, page 2185, XP008168446 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms3185 |