EP3313442 - ANTIBODIES AGAINST HUMAN CSF-1R FOR USE IN INDUCING LYMPHOCYTOSIS IN LYMPHOMAS OR LEUKEMIAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2018/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERTILACCIO, Maria Teresa Sabrina Via Washington 74 20146 Milano / IT | 02 /
CALIGARIS-CAPPIO, Federico Nona Strada 6 San Felice 20090 Segrate / IT | 03 /
GALLETTI, Giovanni Piazza Italia 3 20092 Cinisello Balsamo (MI) / IT | 04 /
KLEIN, Christian Chapfstrasse 26B 8906 Bonstetten / CH | 05 /
RIES, Carola St.-Klara-Strasse 9 82377 Penzberg / DE | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/18] | 01 /
BERTILACCIO, Maria Teresa Sabrina Via Washington 74 20146 Milano / IT | ||
02 /
CALIGARIS-CAPPIO, Federico Nona Strada 6 San Felice 20090 Segrate / IT | |||
03 /
GALLETTI, Giovanni Via Cassanese 200/c 20090 Segrate / IT | |||
04 /
KLEIN, Christian Chapfstrasse 26B 8906 Bonstetten / CH | |||
05 /
RIES, Carola St.-Klara-Strasse 9 82377 Penzberg / DE | Representative(s) | Burger, Alexander, et al Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patentabteilung Nonnenwald 2 82377 Penzberg / DE | [2019/42] |
Former [2018/18] | Burger, Alexander, et al Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patent Department (LPP.....6164) P.O.Box 11 52 82372 Penzberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 16732589.3 | 23.06.2016 | [2018/18] | WO2016EP64611 | Priority number, date | EP20150173638 | 24.06.2015 Original published format: EP 15173638 | EP20160151129 | 13.01.2016 Original published format: EP 16151129 | [2018/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016207312 | Date: | 29.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3313442 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3313442 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395 | [2018/18] | CPC: |
C07K16/2866 (EP,KR,US);
A61P35/02 (EP,US);
C07K16/2887 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/507 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | 24.01.2018 | Title | German: | ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN MENSCHLICHES CSF-1R FÜR DIE INDUZIERUNG VON LYMPHOZYTOSE IN LYMPHOMEN ODER LEUKÄMIEN | [2019/19] | English: | ANTIBODIES AGAINST HUMAN CSF-1R FOR USE IN INDUCING LYMPHOCYTOSIS IN LYMPHOMAS OR LEUKEMIAS | [2018/18] | French: | ANTICORPS CONTRE LE CSF-1R HUMAIN PERMETTANT D'INDUIRE UNE LYMPHOCYTOSE DANS LES LYMPHOMES OU LES LEUCÉMIES | [2019/19] |
Former [2018/18] | ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN MENSCHLICHES CSF-1R FÜR DIE INDUZIERUNG VON LYMPHOZYTOSE BEI LYMPHOMEN ODER LEUKÄMIEN | ||
Former [2018/18] | ANTICORPS CONTRE LE CSF-1R HUMAIN UTILISÉ POUR INDUIRE UNE LYMPHOCYTOSE DANS DES LYMPHOMES OU DES LEUCÉMIES | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/18] | 19.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 11.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.06.2016 | AL | 16.10.2019 | AT | 16.10.2019 | CY | 16.10.2019 | CZ | 16.10.2019 | DK | 16.10.2019 | EE | 16.10.2019 | ES | 16.10.2019 | FI | 16.10.2019 | HR | 16.10.2019 | IT | 16.10.2019 | LT | 16.10.2019 | LV | 16.10.2019 | MC | 16.10.2019 | MK | 16.10.2019 | MT | 16.10.2019 | NL | 16.10.2019 | PL | 16.10.2019 | RO | 16.10.2019 | RS | 16.10.2019 | SE | 16.10.2019 | SI | 16.10.2019 | SK | 16.10.2019 | SM | 16.10.2019 | TR | 16.10.2019 | BG | 16.01.2020 | NO | 16.01.2020 | GR | 17.01.2020 | IS | 16.02.2020 | PT | 17.02.2020 | IE | 23.06.2020 | LU | 23.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 23.06.2016 | |
AL | 16.10.2019 | ||
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CY | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
MT | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
TR | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IE | 23.06.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IE | 23.06.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IE | 23.06.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 16.10.2019 | |
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 16.10.2019 | |
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 16.10.2019 | |
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 16.10.2019 | |
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 16.10.2019 | |
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 16.10.2019 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2005044859 (GLYCART BIOTECHNOLOGY AG [CH], et al) [AD] 1-36 * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0033] ** paragraph [0241] *; | [X]US2011243947 (DOODY JACQUELINE FRANCOISE [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0102] * * paragraph [0116] - paragraph [0119] *; | [A]WO2013004806 (MORPHOSYS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-36 * page 18, paragraph 2 *; | [A]US2015073129 (HERTING FRANK [DE], et al) [A] 1-36 * paragraph [0013] * * examples 8,9 * * paragraph [0142] * * page 0234 * * paragraph [0238] * * claim 3 * |