EP3422962 - SINGLE-USE ORTHOPEDIC SURGICAL INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2020 [2020/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [2019/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUGLER, Andrew 258 South Manning Boulevard Albany, NY 12208 / US | 02 /
WILLIAMS, II, John A. 35 Summers Drive Stevens, PA 17578 / US | [2019/02] | Representative(s) | Elzaburu S.L.P. Edificio Torre de Cristal Paseo de la Castellana 259 C, planta 28 28046 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2019/02] | Elzaburu S.L.P. Miguel Angel 21, 2nd floor 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 16733757.5 | 02.06.2016 | [2019/02] | WO2016US35471 | Priority number, date | US201662301162P | 29.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662301162 P | [2019/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017151170 | Date: | 08.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3422962 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/15, A61L31/00, A61B17/17, A61B50/30 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
A61B17/15 (EP,US);
A61B17/1764 (US);
A61B17/155 (EP,US);
A61B17/17 (EP,US);
B29C45/0001 (US);
B29C64/00 (EP,US);
B29C64/386 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0023 (US);
A61B2017/00526 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00853 (US);
A61B2017/00955 (US);
A61B2034/108 (EP,US);
A61L2400/10 (US);
B29K2105/16 (US);
B29L2031/7546 (US);
B33Y80/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] | Title | German: | ORTHOPÄDISCHES CHIRURGISCHES INSTRUMENT ZUR EINMALIGEN VERWENDUNG | [2019/02] | English: | SINGLE-USE ORTHOPEDIC SURGICAL INSTRUMENT | [2019/02] | French: | INSTRUMENT CHIRURGICAL ORTHOPÉDIQUE À USAGE UNIQUE | [2019/02] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 23.08.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/53] | 26.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0167970 (BIOACCESS INC [US], et al) [Y] 18-20 * page 23, lines 9-23; figures 7-10 *; | [Y]WO2007008667 (KYPHON INC [US], et al) [Y] 18-20* page 17, lines 11-32; figures 11,12 *; | [XYI]FR2910333 (SOLVAY ADVANCED POLYMERS LLC [US]) [X] 1-10,15-17 * page 2, lines 28-34; figure 2 * * page 4, lines 20-35 * * page 8, lines 25-34 * * page 9, line 26 - page 10, line 5 * * page 10, lines 25-33 * * page 15, lines 1-2 * [Y] 18-20 [I] 11-14; | [Y]US2011071572 (SIXTO ROBERT [US], et al) [Y] 18-20 * paragraphs [0077] - [0080]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2014095853 (MATERIALISE NV [BE]) [A] 1 * page 13, lines 17-29; figures 1-3 * * page 15, line 30 - page 16, line 7 * * page 16, line 18 - page 17, line 2 *; | [A]WO2014140808 (MATERIALISE NV [BE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0119] - [0121] - [0124] , [0135] , [0136]; figure 4a *; | [A]EP2856951 (MATERIALISE NV [BE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0058] , [0065] , [0069] - [0071]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2015112566 (CONFORMIS INC [US]) [A] 11-14 * paragraphs [0042] , [0048] , [0049]; figures 9,10a * |