EP3313921 - IMPROVED ONE PART MOISTURE CURABLE ADHESIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2018/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOUSE, Sarah E. 309 11th St. SW Albequerque, NM 87102 / US | 02 /
KUMAR, Bhawesh B-1470 2301 N. Brazosport Boulevard Freeport, TX 77541 / US | 03 /
JIALANELLA, Gary L. 1250 Harmon Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | [2018/18] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/18] | Raynor, John Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place GB-London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 16733846.6 | 22.06.2016 | [2018/18] | WO2016US38634 | Priority number, date | US201562184543P | 25.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562184543 P | [2018/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016209873 | Date: | 29.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3313921 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/00, C08G18/10, C08G18/42, C08G18/48, C09J175/06, C09J175/08 | [2018/18] | CPC: |
C09J175/08 (EP,CN,US);
C09J175/06 (CN);
C08G18/10 (CN,US);
C08G18/12 (EP,US);
C08G18/289 (EP,US);
C08G18/42 (CN);
C08G18/48 (CN,US);
C08G18/4812 (EP,US);
C08G18/4833 (US);
C08G18/5096 (US);
C09J11/06 (US);
C09J5/00 (US);
C08K3/04 (US);
C08K5/549 (US);
C09J2301/306 (US);
C09J2475/00 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/289 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/18] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE EINTEILIGE FEUCHTIGKEITSHÄRTENDE KLEBSTOFFE | [2018/18] | English: | IMPROVED ONE PART MOISTURE CURABLE ADHESIVES | [2018/18] | French: | ADHÉSIFS MONO-CONSTITUANT DURCISSABLES À L'HUMIDITÉ AMÉLIORÉS | [2018/18] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/18] | 16.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/04] | 18.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2011137047 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-20* example -; claim - *; | [XI]WO2014179091 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [X] 1,10-13,16-20 * example -; claim 1 * [I] 14,15 | by applicant | US3146250 | US3215718 | US3417121 | US3707521 | US3779794 | US4525511 | US4780520 | US4839453 | US5922809 | US5976305 | US6015475 | US2002100550 | US6512033 | US6613816 | US6709539 | US8729168 | - BILLMEYER, F.W. JR., Textbook of Polymer Science, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, (1984), page 199 |