EP3319433 - HERBICIDAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING CINMETHYLIN AND SPECIFIC NON-ACCASE LIPID SYNTHESIS INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Agro B.V. Groningensingel 1 6835 EA Arnhem / NL | [2018/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAUS, Helmut 26 Davis Drive Research, Triangle Park 27709 / US | 02 /
SIEVERNICH, Bernd Bertolt-Brecht-Strasse 18a 67454 Hassloch / DE | 03 /
ETCHEVERRY, Mariano 19 Druzhby Narodiv boulevard Kiev 01042 / UA | 04 /
EVANS, Richard R 8412 Lakewood Drive Durham, Raleigh 27613 / US | 05 /
NIELSON, Ryan Louis Edelsteinstrasse 39 69198 Schriesheim / DE | 06 /
ZAGAR, Cyrill 2107 Breeze Road Wake, Raleigh 27608 / US | 07 /
LIEBL, Rex A 2111 Myrtle Avenue Durham, Raleigh 27608 / US | [2018/20] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2019/37] |
Former [2018/20] | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 16734709.5 | 06.07.2016 | [2018/20] | WO2016EP65972 | Priority number, date | US201562190775P | 10.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562190775 P | EP20150191714 | 27.10.2015 Original published format: EP 15191714 | [2018/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017009134 | Date: | 19.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3319433 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3319433 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/90, A01N47/12, A01P13/00 | [2018/20] | CPC: |
A01N43/90 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/90, A01N43/12, A01N47/12, A01N47/16, A01N47/18, A01N57/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERBIZIDZUSAMMENSETZUNG ENTHALTEND CINMETHYLIN UND SPEZIFISCHE NICHT-ACCASE-LIPIDSYNTHESE-INHIBITOREN | [2019/09] | English: | HERBICIDAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING CINMETHYLIN AND SPECIFIC NON-ACCASE LIPID SYNTHESIS INHIBITORS | [2018/20] | French: | COMPOSITION HERBICIDE COMPRENANT DE CINMÉTHYLINE ET DES INHIBITEURS DE LA SYNTHÈSE DE LIPIDES NON-ACCASE SPÉCIFIQUE | [2019/09] |
Former [2018/20] | HERBIZIDZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT CINMETHYLIN UND SPEZIFISCHEN NICHT-ACCASE-LIPIDSYNTHESE-INHIBITOREN | ||
Former [2018/20] | COMPOSITION HERBICIDE À BASE DE CINMÉTHYLINE ET D'INHIBITEURS SPÉCIFIQUES DE LA SYNTHÈSE DE LIPIDES N'IMPLIQUANT PAS L'ACCASE | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 14.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.07.2016 | AL | 11.09.2019 | CY | 11.09.2019 | EE | 11.09.2019 | FI | 11.09.2019 | HR | 11.09.2019 | IT | 11.09.2019 | MC | 11.09.2019 | MK | 11.09.2019 | MT | 11.09.2019 | RO | 11.09.2019 | RS | 11.09.2019 | SM | 11.09.2019 | BG | 11.12.2019 | NO | 11.12.2019 | GR | 12.12.2019 | IS | 12.01.2020 | PT | 13.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 06.07.2016 | |
AL | 11.09.2019 | ||
CY | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
MT | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | NO | 11.12.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]CN102461541 ; | [XAI]EP0326305 (SCHERING AG [DE]); | by applicant | EP0081893 | US4487945 | EP0326305 | EP0374753 | EP0392225 | EP0427529 | EP0451878 | WO9307278 | WO9534656 | WO0215701 | WO03018810 | WO03052073 | CN102461541 |