EP3468412 - APPLICATOR DEVICE FOR APPLYING A FLUID OR PASTY PRODUCT TO KERATIN FIBRES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société Industrielle de Matières Plastiques 4, rue Camille Decauville ZAC du Plessis-Saucourt 91250 Tigery / FR | [2019/17] |
Former [2019/16] | For all designated states Montaigu Developpement 62, rue de Montaigu 78240 Chambourcy / FR | ||
For all designated states Société Industrielle de Matières Plastiques 4, rue Camille Decauville ZAC du Plessis-Saucourt 91250 Tigery / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE BARDONNECHE, Eric 9 rue du Château d'eau 77540 Courpalay / FR | [2019/16] | Representative(s) | Gauchet, Fabien Roland Brandon IP 64, rue Tiquetonne 75002 Paris / FR | [2019/16] | Application number, filing date | 16735670.8 | 08.06.2016 | [2019/16] | WO2016FR51372 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017212123 | Date: | 14.12.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3468412 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3468412 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A46B9/02 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
A46B9/021 (EP,KR,US);
A45D40/264 (US);
A46B3/04 (US);
A46B9/028 (US);
A46B2200/1053 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | APPLIKATORVORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFTRAGEN EINES FLÜSSIGEN ODER PASTÖSEN PRODUKTS AUF KERATINFASERN | [2019/16] | English: | APPLICATOR DEVICE FOR APPLYING A FLUID OR PASTY PRODUCT TO KERATIN FIBRES | [2019/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF APPLICATEUR DE PRODUIT FLUIDE OU PATEUX SUR DES FIBRES KERATINIQUES | [2021/08] |
Former [2019/16] | DISPOSITIF APPLICATEUR DE PRODUIT FLUIDE OU PATEUX SUR DES FIBRES KERATINIQUES. | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/16] | 07.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.12.2018 | Observations by third parties | 04.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2019 | Observations by third parties | 12.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.02.2021 | 16.02.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.06.2016 | AL | 28.07.2021 | AT | 28.07.2021 | CY | 28.07.2021 | CZ | 28.07.2021 | DK | 28.07.2021 | EE | 28.07.2021 | ES | 28.07.2021 | FI | 28.07.2021 | HR | 28.07.2021 | LT | 28.07.2021 | LV | 28.07.2021 | MC | 28.07.2021 | MK | 28.07.2021 | NL | 28.07.2021 | PL | 28.07.2021 | RO | 28.07.2021 | RS | 28.07.2021 | SE | 28.07.2021 | SI | 28.07.2021 | SK | 28.07.2021 | SM | 28.07.2021 | BG | 28.10.2021 | NO | 28.10.2021 | GR | 29.10.2021 | IS | 28.11.2021 | PT | 29.11.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 08.06.2016 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 08.06.2016 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2014216497 (PIRES LEO CLIFFORD [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,12 * paragraphs [0062] - [0066] * * figures 1-5 * [Y] 5,9-11 [I] 8; | [X]US2016073767 (SANCHEZ MARCEL [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,7,9 * paragraph [0086] * * figures 16-19 *; | [X]FR3006566 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,5,12 * page 11, lines 19-26 * * figures 8B, 8C, 9A *; | [X]WO2015171167 (AA R & D LLC [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * page 4, line 16 - page 5, line 24 * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US4964429 (COLE RODNEY D [GB]) [X] 1,2 * column 6, lines 50-60 * * figures 5, 6 *; | [Y]WO2015110853 (MONTAIGU DEV [FR], et al) [Y] 5 * figures 1-5 *; | [Y]FR3028152 (OREAL [FR]) [Y] 9 * figures 2A, 2B *; | [Y]USD682556S (URESTI OSVALDO [FR], et al) [Y] 10,11 * figures 1-7 * | Examination | EP2198743 | WO2015092586 | WO2014207673 | USD682556S | by applicant | US5611361 | FR2810860 | WO2011045770 | EP1872682 | WO2009141098 | FR2969470 | FR2982466 | other | WO2015092586 | EP2198743 |