EP3285601 - METHOD FOR PREPARING FOOD PRODUCTS BY MEANS OF CO-EXTRUSION, VISCOUS GELLING SOLUTION AND SYSTEM FOR CO-EXTRUSION OF FOOD PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marel Further Processing B.V. Handelstraat 3 5831 AV Boxmeer / NL | [2023/09] |
Former [2018/09] | For all designated states Marel Townsend Further Processing B.V. Handelstraat 3 5831 AV Boxmeer / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEULENDIJKS, Johannes Martinus Kasteelhoeve 26 5754 HW Deurne / NL | 02 /
KOOLS, Johannes Marinus Quirinus Piushof 17 4731 HR Oudenbosch / NL | [2018/14] |
Former [2018/09] | 01 /
MEULENDIJKS, Johannes Martinus Atalanta 1 5754 GP Deurne / NL | ||
02 /
KOOLS, Johannes Marinus Quirinus Piushof 17 4731 HR Oudenbosch / NL | Representative(s) | Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [2018/09] | Application number, filing date | 16735728.4 | 20.04.2016 | [2018/09] | WO2016NL50278 | Priority number, date | NL20152014679 | 20.04.2015 Original published format: NL 2014679 | [2018/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016171553 | Date: | 27.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3285601 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A23L13/60, A23L29/256, A23L29/281, A23P30/25 | [2018/09] | CPC: |
A23L13/65 (EP,US);
A23L29/256 (EP,US);
A23L29/284 (EP,US);
A23P30/25 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON NAHRUNGSMITTELN MITTELS KOEXTRUSION, VISKOSE GELIERUNGSLÖSUNG UND SYSTEM ZUM KOEXTRUDIEREN VON NAHRUNGSMITTELN | [2018/09] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING FOOD PRODUCTS BY MEANS OF CO-EXTRUSION, VISCOUS GELLING SOLUTION AND SYSTEM FOR CO-EXTRUSION OF FOOD PRODUCTS | [2018/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES PAR CO-EXTRUSION, SOLUTION DE GÉLIFICATION VISQUEUSE ET SYSTÈME DE CO-EXTRUSION DE PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES | [2018/09] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/09] | 24.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2009317522 (NIELSEN HELGE HENRIK [DK], et al) [X] 1-4,8-10,16,17,20,24 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0004] - [0065] * [I] 3-7,11-15,18,19,21-23,25; | [XI]US2010034932 (SCHMIDT MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,8,10-12,16-18,20,24 * example . * * paragraphs [0002] , [0008] - [0034] * [I] 5-7,9,13-15,19,21-23,25; | [XI]NL2009121C (MAREL TOWNSEND FURTHER PROC BV) [X] 1-6,8,16,17,20,24 * page 1, lines 1-11 * * page 3, line 17 - page 15, line 20 * * example -; claim - * [I] 7,9-15,18,19,21-23,25; | [XI]US2015030733 (VAN DE NIEUWELAAR ADRIANUS JOSEPHES [NL], et al) [X] 1-4,8-10,12,16,17,20,24 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] - [0030] * * claim - * [I] 5-7,11,13-15,18,19,21-23,25; | [XP]WO2015142168 (MAREL TOWNSEND FURTHER PROC BV [NL]) [XP] 1-4,7-24 * page 1, line 1 - page 9, line 23 ** figure -; claim - * |