EP3322308 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A RAW PIECE OF RECONSTITUTED MEAT AND A RAW PIECE OF RECONSTITUTED MEAT COMBINED ACCORDING TO THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hauf, Reiner Margaretenstraße 82 1050 Wien / AT | [2018/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/21] | Representative(s) | Goebel, Sebastian Bösherz Goebel Patentanwälte Rheinberger Weg 6 40670 Meerbusch / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/21] | Kreuzkamp, Markus Ludenberger Strasse 1a 40629 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 16736775.4 | 11.05.2016 | [2018/21] | WO2016DE100215 | Priority number, date | DE201510107344 | 11.05.2015 Original published format: DE102015107344 | [2018/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016180405 | Date: | 17.11.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3322308 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A23P20/20, A23L13/00, A23L13/40, A23L13/50, A23K10/20, A23K40/00 | [2018/21] | CPC: |
A23L13/52 (EP,US);
A23K10/20 (EP,US);
A23K20/10 (EP,US);
A23K20/105 (EP,US);
A23K20/147 (EP,US);
A23K40/20 (EP,US);
A23K50/40 (EP,US);
A23L13/03 (EP,US);
A23L13/40 (EP);
A23L13/424 (EP,US);
A23L13/428 (EP,US);
A23L13/65 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FORMFLEISCH-ROHLINGS UND VERFAHRENSGEMÄSS KOMBINIERTER FORMFLEISCH-FLEISCH-ROHLING | [2018/21] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A RAW PIECE OF RECONSTITUTED MEAT AND A RAW PIECE OF RECONSTITUTED MEAT COMBINED ACCORDING TO THE METHOD | [2018/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE ÉBAUCHE EN VIANDE RECONSTITUÉE ET ÉBAUCHE EN VIANDE RECONSTITUÉE ET VIANDE COMBINÉE CONFORMÉMENT AU PROCÉDÉ | [2018/21] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/21] | 13.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 29.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/39] | 23.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |