EP3245879 - BEVERAGE CONTAINING FRUIT JUICE OF FLAVORFUL ACIDIC CITRUS FRUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Opposition rejected | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suntory Holdings Limited 1-40, Dojimahama 2-chome Kita-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8203 / JP | [2018/27] |
Former [2017/47] | For all designated states Suntory Beverage & Food Limited 1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ICHIMURA, Atsushi c/o Suntory Products Development Center 13-2 Imaikami-cho Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-0067 / JP | 02 /
MIYAO, Yuki c/o Suntory Products Development Center 13-2 Imaikami-cho Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-0067 / JP | 03 /
IBUSUKI, Daigo c/o Suntory Products Development Center 13-2 Imaikami-cho Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-0067 / JP | [2017/47] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2017/47] | Application number, filing date | 16737348.9 | 13.01.2016 | [2017/47] | WO2016JP50762 | Priority number, date | JP20150007118 | 16.01.2015 Original published format: JP 2015007118 | JP20150068126 | 30.03.2015 Original published format: JP 2015068126 | [2017/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016114277 | Date: | 21.07.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3245879 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3245879 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.07.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A23L2/02, A23L2/00, A23L2/06, C12G3/04, A23L2/52, A23L2/56, A23L2/68 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
A23L2/52 (EP,US);
A23L2/02 (US);
A23L2/00 (EP,US);
A23L2/06 (EP,US);
A23L2/56 (EP,US);
A23L2/68 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/47] | A23L2/02, A23L2/00, A23L2/06, C12G3/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GETRÄNK MIT FRUCHTSAFT VON SCHMACKHAFTEN SAUREN ZITRUSFRÜCHTEN | [2019/51] | English: | BEVERAGE CONTAINING FRUIT JUICE OF FLAVORFUL ACIDIC CITRUS FRUIT | [2017/47] | French: | BOISSON CONTENANT DU JUS DE FRUITS À BASE D'AGRUMES ACIDES SAVOUREUX | [2019/51] |
Former [2017/47] | GETRÄNK MIT FRUCHTSAFT VON AROMATISCHEN SAUREN ZITRUSFRÜCHTEN | ||
Former [2017/47] | BOISSON CONTENANT DU JUS DE FRUITS À BASE D'AGRUMES ACIDES PLEINS DE SAVEUR | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2017 | Translation filed | 02.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 02.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/47] | 02.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.09.2020
24.09.2020
ADMISSIBLE Hammer, Jens Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/44] | 08.10.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.02.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.01.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.02.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.02.2022 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 08.02.2024 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2024/18] | Appeal following opposition | 06.04.2022 | Appeal received No. T1183/22 | 06.04.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 17.06.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.02.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 26.03.2024 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 08.02.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 05.04.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 05.04.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.04.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 05.04.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 05.04.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.04.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.01.2016 | AL | 18.12.2019 | AT | 18.12.2019 | CY | 18.12.2019 | CZ | 18.12.2019 | DK | 18.12.2019 | EE | 18.12.2019 | FI | 18.12.2019 | HR | 18.12.2019 | IT | 18.12.2019 | LT | 18.12.2019 | LV | 18.12.2019 | MC | 18.12.2019 | MK | 18.12.2019 | MT | 18.12.2019 | NL | 18.12.2019 | PL | 18.12.2019 | RO | 18.12.2019 | RS | 18.12.2019 | SE | 18.12.2019 | SI | 18.12.2019 | SK | 18.12.2019 | SM | 18.12.2019 | TR | 18.12.2019 | IE | 13.01.2020 | LU | 13.01.2020 | BE | 31.01.2020 | CH | 31.01.2020 | LI | 31.01.2020 | BG | 18.03.2020 | NO | 18.03.2020 | GR | 19.03.2020 | IS | 18.04.2020 | PT | 13.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 13.01.2016 | |
AL | 18.12.2019 | ||
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CY | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
IT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
MT | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
TR | 18.12.2019 | ||
IE | 13.01.2020 | ||
LU | 13.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
IT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
IE | 13.01.2020 | ||
LU | 13.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
IE | 13.01.2020 | ||
LU | 13.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 13.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 13.01.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 13.01.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 18.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006105089 (CHU OSVALDO A [US], et al) [A] 1-6* claim 15 *; | [XI]US2010196554 (RIVERA TEODORO [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * claims 1, 28 * [I] 4; | [A]WO2014103596 (SUNTORY HOLDINGS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * claim 1 * | International search | [XY]JPH0576326 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD) [X] 1-6 * , example 5 (Family: none) * [Y] 1-6; | [A]US2010196554 (RIVERA TEODORO [US], et al) [A] 1-6* , claims & WO 2010/090971 A1 & EP 2393382 A1 claims *; | [XY]JP2014000055 (SUNTORY HOLDINGS LTD) [X] 1-3, 5, 6 * , example 8 (Family: none) * [Y] 1-6; | [XY]JP2014064488 (SUNTORY HOLDINGS LTD) [X] 1-3, 5, 6 * , example 1 (Family: none) * [Y] 1-6; | [Y]JP2014110765 (ITO EN LTD) [Y] 1-6 * , claims; paragraphs [0020], [0033], [0051]; examples (Family: none) *; | [PX]WO2015198871 (SUNTORY HOLDINGS LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-6 * , example JP 2016-7205 A *; | [XY] - "Grapefruit Squash", cookpad, (20070709), URL: http://cookpad.com/recipe/401440, (20160405), XP009504631 [X] 1-6 * , entire text * [Y] 1-6 | [YP] - "Sawayaka Orange Lemonade", cookpad, (20150518), URL: http://cookpad.com/recipe/3168867, (20160405), XP 055465344 [YP] 1-6 * , entire text * | [A] - "Non'aru Kibun | Examination | - PETERSON J J ET AL, "Flavanones in grapefruit, lemons, and limes: A compilation and review of the data from the analytical literature", JOURNAL OF FOOD COMPOSITION AND ANALYSIS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 19, doi:10.1016/J.JFCA.2005.12.009, ISSN 0889-1575, (20060801), pages S74 - S80, (20060801), XP024929689 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jfca.2005.12.009 | Opposition | JPH0576326 | US2006105089 | US2010196543 | WO2015198871 | - MARCIA SMART, "Citrusade with Lemon, Lime, and Grapefruit", myrecipes.com, (20100700), pages 1 - 2, URL: https://www.myrecipes.com/recipe/citrusade-with-lemon-lime-grapefruit, XP055771785 | - Yoshiaki MIYAKE, Kanefumi Yamamoto, Yasujiro Morimitsu And Toshihiko Osawa, "Characteristics of Antioxidative Flavonoid Glycosides in Lemon Fruit", Food Sci. Technol. Int., Tokyo, (19980000), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 48 - 53, XP055771788 | - Mark Berhow, Brent Tisserat, Katherine Kanes, Carl Vandercook, "Survey of Phenolic Compounds Produced in Citrus", AGR Technical Bulletin, (19981200), pages iii-iv, 1 - 154, XP055771796 | - Le Melange LLC, "A Handy Conversion Chart", (20110000), page 1pp, XP055771801 |