EP3313834 - TBK/IKK INHIBITOR COMPOUNDS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2018/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHERER, Brian A. 57 Harris Road Nashua, New Hampshire 03062 / US | 02 /
KARRA, Srinivasa 58 Four Winds Drive Pembroke, Massachusetts 02359 / US | 03 /
XIAO, Yufang 11 Ames Avenue Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US | [2018/18] | Application number, filing date | 16738317.3 | 28.06.2016 | [2018/18] | WO2016US39734 | Priority number, date | US201562185788P | 29.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562185788 P | [2018/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017003995 | Date: | 05.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3313834 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/04, A61K31/4355, A61P9/00, A61P25/00, A61P35/00, A61P37/00 | [2018/18] | CPC: |
C07D491/048 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/4355 (KR);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP,KR);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP,KR);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP,KR);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/18] | Title | German: | TBK/IKK INHIBITOR COMPOUNDS UND USES THEREOF | [2018/18] | English: | TBK/IKK INHIBITOR COMPOUNDS AND USES THEREOF | [2018/18] | French: | COMPOSÉS INHIBITEURS DE TBK/IKK ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2018/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/18] | 18.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2012025187 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1 * claim 1 *; | [XI]WO2013117285 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-13,15-20 * claim 1 * [I] 1-20; | [A]WO2013124025 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-20* claim 1 * | by applicant | - WEINSTEIN-OPPENHEIMER ET AL., PHARMA. &. THERAP., (2000), vol. 88, pages 229 - 279 | - J.S. BOEHM ET AL., CELL, (2007), vol. 129, pages 1065 - 1079 | - S.F.EDDY ET AL., CANCER RES., (2005), vol. 65, no. 24, pages 11375 - 11383 | - C.KORHERR ET AL., PNAS, (2006), vol. 103, pages 4240 - 4245 | - Y.CHIEN ET AL., CELL, (2006), vol. 127, pages 157 - 170 | - D.A.BARBIE ET AL., NATURE LETTERS, (2009), pages 1 - 5 | - Handbook of Chemistry and Physics | - S. M. BERGE ET AL., J. PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 |