EP3347805 - DYNAMIC CONTROL SCHEMES FOR SIMULTANEOUSLY-ACTIVE APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2018/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORROMEO, Theodore John 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2018/29] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/29] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16738321.5 | 28.06.2016 | [2018/29] | WO2016US39770 | Priority number, date | US201514849901 | 10.09.2015 Original published format: US201514849901 | [2018/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017044176 | Date: | 16.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3347805 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0488, G06F3/0484 | [2018/29] | CPC: |
G06F3/0488 (EP,US);
G06F3/04812 (US);
G06F3/04842 (EP,US);
G06F9/451 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/29] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE STEUERSCHEMATA FÜR SIMULTAN-AKTIVE ANWENDUNGEN | [2018/29] | English: | DYNAMIC CONTROL SCHEMES FOR SIMULTANEOUSLY-ACTIVE APPLICATIONS | [2018/29] | French: | SCHÉMAS DE COMMANDE DYNAMIQUE POUR APPLICATIONS ACTIVES SIMULTANÉMENT | [2018/29] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/29] | 28.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/22] | 25.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1748354 (ADVANCED DIGITAL BROADCAST SA [CH]) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0026]; figure -; claim - *; | [X]EP2312427 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [X] 1-3,6-8,10-13,16-18,20-23,26-28,30 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0113] * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0119] * * paragraph [0121] - paragraph [0123] * * paragraph [0133] - paragraph [0134]; figures 5-13; claim - *; | [XI]US2014282272 (KIES JONATHAN K [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-16,18-26,28-30 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0080]; figure -; claim -; table - * [I] 7,17,27; | [A]CN102243889B (BEIJING SAMSUNG TELECOM R&D CT, et al) [A] 1-30* the whole document *; | [X]EP2854013 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-3,6-8,10-13,16-18,20-23,26-28,30 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0065]; figures 5-12; claim - * |