EP3302465 - TRIAZOLES FOR THE TREATMENT OF DEMYELINATING DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vertex Pharmaceuticals Incorporated 50 Northern Avenue Boston, MA 02210 / US | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIES, Robert, J. 10 Pawnee Drive Arlington, MA 02474 / US | 02 /
CAO, Jingrong 32 Leonard Avenue Newton, MA 02465 / US | 03 /
COCKERILL, Meghan, Elise 530-A Seaview Ave. Staten Island, NY 10305 / US | 04 /
COLLIER, Philip, Noel 34 Garrison Road Hingham, MA 02043 / US | 05 /
DENINNO, Michael, Paul 9 Hermitage Drive Gales Ferry, CT 06335 / US | 06 /
DOYLE, Elisabeth 9 Jenkins Street Worcester, MA 01602 / US | 07 /
FRANTZ, James, Daniel 1010 Elm Street Belmont, MA 02478 / US | 08 /
GAO, Huai 82 Summer Street Unit No. 7 Arlington, MA 02474 / US | 09 /
GOLDMAN, Brian, Anthony 121 Stedman Street Brookline, MA 02446 / US | 10 /
GREY, Ronald, Lee 31 Tremont Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | 11 /
GRILLOT, Anne-laure 242 Woodland Road Milton, MA 02186 / US | 12 /
GU, Wenxin 2 Dunbar Way Concord, MA 01742 / US | 13 /
HENDERSON, James, A. 55 Newton Street Weston, MA 02493 / US | 14 /
KRAUSS, Raul Eduardo 18 Gate House Road Chestnut Hill, MA 02467 / US | 15 /
KOLPAK, Adrianne, Lynn 8 Hardy Avenue Watertown, MA 02472 / US | 16 /
LIAO, Yusheng 54 Spring Street Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US | 17 /
MAGAVI, Sanjay Shivayogi 612 Huron Avenue Cambridge, Massachusetts 02138 / US | 18 /
MALTAIS, Francois 24 Randolph Drive Tewksbury, MA 01876 / US | 19 /
MESSERSMITH, David 16 Herbert Street Somerville, MD 02144 / US | 20 /
PIERCE, Albert, Charles - deceased / US | 21 /
PEROLA, Emanuele 6 Lanark Road Unit 3 Brookline, Massachusetts 02445 / US | 22 /
RYU, Elizabeth Jin-Sun 71 Westland Avenue Newton, Massachusetts 02465 / US | 23 /
SYKEN, Joshua 18 Newbern Street Jamaica Plain, Massachusetts 02130 / US | 24 /
WANG, Jian 12 Sagamore Road Newton, MA 02461 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2018/15] | 01 /
DAVIES, Robert, J. 10 Pawnee Drive Arlington, MA 02474 / US | ||
02 /
CAO, Jingrong 32 Leonard Avenue Newton, MA 02465 / US | |||
03 /
COCKERILL, Meghan, Elise 19 Peverell Street Unit 3 Boston, MA 02125 / US | |||
04 /
COLLIER, Philip, Noel 10 Weathervane Court Hingham, MA 02043 / US | |||
05 /
DENINNO, Michael, Paul 9 Hermitage Drive Gales Ferry, CT 06335 / US | |||
06 /
DOYLE, Elisabeth 9 Jenkins Street Worcester, MA 01602 / US | |||
07 /
FRANTZ, James, Daniel 1010 Elm Street Belmont, MA 02478 / US | |||
08 /
GAO, Huai 82 Summer Street Unit No. 7 Arlington, MA 02474 / US | |||
09 /
GOLDMAN, Brian, Anthony 121 Stedman Street Brookline, MA 02446 / US | |||
10 /
GREY, Ronald, Lee 31 Tremont Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | |||
11 /
GRILLOT, Anne-laure 242 Woodland Road Milton, MA 02186 / US | |||
12 /
GU, Wenxin 2 Dunbar Way Concord, MA 01742 / US | |||
13 /
HENDERSON, James, A. 55 Newton Street Weston, MA 02493 / US | |||
14 /
KRAUSS, Raul Eduardo 18 Gate House Road Chestnut Hill, MA 02467 / US | |||
15 /
KOLPAK, Adrianne, Lynn 8 Hardy Avenue Watertown, MA 02472 / US | |||
16 /
LIAO, Yusheng 54 Spring Street Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US | |||
17 /
MAGAVI, Sanjay Shivayogi 612 Huron Avenue Cambridge, Massachusetts 02138 / US | |||
18 /
MALTAIS, Francois 24 Randolph Drive Tewksbury, MA 01876 / US | |||
19 /
MESSERSMITH, David 16 Herbert Street Somerville, MD 02144 / US | |||
20 /
PIERCE, Albert, Charles 295 Harvard Street Apt. 911 Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | |||
21 /
PEROLA, Emanuele 6 Lanark Road Unit 3 Brookline, Massachusetts 02445 / US | |||
22 /
RYU, Elizabeth Jin-Sun 71 Westland Avenue Newton, Massachusetts 02465 / US | |||
23 /
SYKEN, Joshua 18 Newbern Street Jamaica Plain, Massachusetts 02130 / US | |||
24 /
WANG, Jian 12 Sagamore Road Newton, MA 02461 / US | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2018/15] | Application number, filing date | 16738576.4 | 03.06.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016US35847 | Priority number, date | US201562171784P | 05.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562171784 P | US201662326471P | 22.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662326471 P | [2018/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016197009 | Date: | 08.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3302465 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4196, A61P25/28, C07D405/14, C07D401/04, C07D401/12, C07D403/04, C07D403/14, C07D405/12, C07D249/14 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
C07D249/14 (EP,US);
A61K31/4196 (EP,US);
A61K31/4439 (EP,US);
A61K31/454 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61K31/497 (EP,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Title | German: | TRIAZOLE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DEMYELINISIERENDEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2018/15] | English: | TRIAZOLES FOR THE TREATMENT OF DEMYELINATING DISEASES | [2018/15] | French: | TRIAZOLES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES LIÉES À LA DÉMYÉLINISATION | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 05.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/48] | 18.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2005013982 (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al) [I] 1-87 * page 76; examples I-105; claim 1 * * page 16, paragraph 56 *; | [A]EP1921073 (ESTEVE LABOR DR [ES]) [A] 1-87 * page 3, paragraph 11; claim 1 *; | [XP]WO2015094997 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) [XP] 1,2,13-15,25,54-56,58,59,61,87* page 50; example 2.14 * | by applicant | US5840299 | US5888507 | US2003114505 | US6602503 | US2004122236 | WO2004085648 | US6964945 | US2005256160 | WO2006002437 | WO2006017673 | US2006148830 | US2006194850 | WO2007008547 | WO2007025219 | WO2007056161 | WO2007064882 | WO2007098283 | WO2007133746 | WO2008013782 | WO2008014286 | WO2008086006 | US2008293764 | WO2009023854 | WO2009030771 | WO2009048605 | WO2009046841 | WO2009046842 | WO2009046804 | WO2009061500 | WO2009135590 | WO2010005570 | WO2010007729 | WO2010051031 | WO2010051030 | WO2010062904 | WO2010063352 | WO2010068775 | WO2010077883 | WO2010077882 | US2010249157 | WO2010112124 | WO2010112116 | WO2010115491 | WO2010141768 | WO2011006569 | WO2011017561 | WO2011017350 | WO2011041729 | WO2011041694 | WO2011041462 | WO2011041461 | WO2011053948 | WO2011080102 | WO2011116867 | WO2011133862 | WO2011141761 | WO2011159635 | WO2011159550 | WO2012005227 | WO2012024620 | WO2012028243 | WO2012062803 | WO2012062804 | WO2012078593 | WO2012078805 | WO2012097093 | WO2012109108 | WO2012140117 | WO2012166415 | WO2013037499 | WO2013040309 | WO2013054185 | WO2013056232 | WO2013063095 | WO2013061297 | WO2013070879 | WO2013080120 | WO2013102144 | WO2013173364 | WO2013186159 | WO2014018881 | WO2014018887 | WO2014018891 | WO2014025708 | WO2014025709 | WO2014048865 | WO2014058875 | WO2014081756 | WO2014081752 | WO2014097151 | WO2014106104 | WO2014110000 | WO2014123186 | WO2014133112 | WO2014139882 | WO2014143583 | WO2014139978 | WO2014152725 | WO2014165827 | WO2014168824 | US8894999 | WO2014197818 | WO2014202458 | WO2014202727 | WO2015001352 | WO2015000942 | WO2015008230 | WO2015008229 | US2015038585 | WO2015023691 | WO2015042053 | WO2015042052 | WO2015048301 | - J. OFNEUROIMMUNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 98, pages 69 - 76 | - MERRILL, J.E. ET AL., NEUROPATHOLOGY AND APPLIED NEUROBIOLOGY, (1999), vol. 25, pages 435 - 458 | - COMPSTON ET AL., THE LANCET, (2002), vol. 359, pages 1221 - 1231 | - D. KREMER ET AL., TRENDS IN NEUROSCIENCES, (2016), vol. 39, no. 4, pages 246 - 263 | - R. FRANKLIN ET AL., NATURE REVIEWS/NEUROSCIENCE, (2008), vol. 9, pages 839 - 855 | - STANGEL, M. ET AL., PROGRESS IN NEUROBIOLOGY, (2002), vol. 68, pages 361 - 376 | - MEI, F. ET AL., NATURE MEDICINE, (2014), vol. 20, no. 8, pages 954 - 961 | - "Periodic Table of the Elements, CAS version", Handbook of Chemistry and Physics, 75th ed., CRC PRESS | - S. L. HARBESON; R. D. TUNG, "Deuterium In Drug Discovery and Development", ANN. REP. MED. CHEM., (2011), vol. 46, pages 403 - 417 | - HANZLIK ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1990), vol. 55, pages 3992 - 3997 | - REIDER ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1987), vol. 52, pages 3326 - 3334 | - FOSTER, ADV. DRUG RES., (1985), vol. 14, pages 1 - 40 | - GILLETTE ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 33, no. 10, pages 2927 - 2937 | - JARMAN ET AL., CARCINOGENESIS, (1993), vol. 16, no. 4, pages 683 - 688 | - S. M. BERGE ET AL., J. PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - SANCHEZ-MADRID ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL, (1986), vol. 16, pages 1343 - 1349 | - HEMLER ET AL., J BIOL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 2, pages 11478 - 11485 | - ISSEKUTZ ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (1991), vol. 147, page 109 | - PULIDO ET AL., J BIOL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 266, pages 10241 - 10245 |