EP3316876 - ARGININE SILICATE INOSITOL FOR IMPROVING COGNITIVE FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nutrition 21, LLC 500 Mamaroneck Ave. Suite 510 Harrison, NY 10528 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2020/10] | For all designated states Nutrition 21, LLC 1 Manhattanville Road Suite 104 Purchase, NY 10577 / US | ||
Former [2018/19] | For all designated states JDS Therapeutics, LLC 1 Manhattanville Road, Suite 104 Purchase, NY 10577 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOMOROWSKI, James, R. 83 Bunker Hill Drive Trumbull, CT 06611 / US | [2018/19] | Representative(s) | Hamer, Christopher K., et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/19] | Hamer, Christopher K., et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 16739338.8 | 29.06.2016 | [2018/19] | WO2016US40128 | Priority number, date | US201562187120P | 30.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562187120 P | [2018/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017004226 | Date: | 05.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3316876 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3316876 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/047, A61K31/198, A61K31/695, A61P25/28 | [2018/19] | CPC: |
A61K31/695 (EP,GB,US);
A61K31/047 (EP,GB,US);
A61B5/16 (GB);
A61B5/4088 (GB,US);
A61K31/198 (EP,GB,US);
A61K31/445 (EP,GB,US);
A61K33/24 (EP,GB,US);
A61K35/24 (GB);
A61K47/10 (US);
A61K9/0053 (GB,US);
A61K9/0095 (GB,US);
A61P25/28 (EP,GB);
A61K2300/00 (GB)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/047, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/695, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARGININ-SILICAT-INOSITOL ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER KOGNITIVEN FUNKTION | [2018/19] | English: | ARGININE SILICATE INOSITOL FOR IMPROVING COGNITIVE FUNCTION | [2018/19] | French: | ARGININE-SILICATE-INOSITOL POUR AMÉLIORATION DE LA FONCTION COGNITIVE | [2018/19] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/19] | 05.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 06.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20159628.5 / EP3721876 | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2016 | AL | 11.03.2020 | AT | 11.03.2020 | CY | 11.03.2020 | DK | 11.03.2020 | EE | 11.03.2020 | FI | 11.03.2020 | HR | 11.03.2020 | IT | 11.03.2020 | LT | 11.03.2020 | LV | 11.03.2020 | MC | 11.03.2020 | MK | 11.03.2020 | MT | 11.03.2020 | RO | 11.03.2020 | RS | 11.03.2020 | SE | 11.03.2020 | SI | 11.03.2020 | SM | 11.03.2020 | TR | 11.03.2020 | BG | 11.06.2020 | NO | 11.06.2020 | GR | 12.06.2020 | LU | 29.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | IS | 11.07.2020 | PT | 05.08.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 29.06.2016 | |
AT | 11.03.2020 | ||
CY | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
MT | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
TR | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
LU | 29.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
LU | 29.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
LU | 29.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | DK | 11.03.2020 | |
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | EE | 11.03.2020 | |
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
NO | 11.06.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5707970 (MCCARTY MARK F [US], et al) [X] 20 * claims 1,9 * [A] 1-19; | [XA]WO2004017913 (NUTRITION 21 INC [US]) [X] 20 * page 11, line 23; claims 19,,20 * * page 29, line 2 * [A] 1-19; | [A]WO2012173808 (ELAN PHARM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-20* example 1; claim 2 *; | [A] - CHERIAN LEELA ET AL, "L-arginine and free radical scavengers increase cerebral blood flow and brain tissue nitric oxide concentrations after controlled cortical impact injury in rats", JOURNAL OF NEUROTRAUMA, M.A. LIEBERT, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20030101), vol. 20, no. 1, doi:10.1089/08977150360517209, ISSN 0897-7151, pages 77 - 85, XP009106134 [A] 1-20 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/08977150360517209 | by applicant | - MARSH, D.W.; RICHARD, L.A.; VERRE, A.B.; MYERS, J., "Relationships Among Balance, Visual Search, and Lacrosse-Shot Accuracy", J OF STR & COND RES, (2010), vol. 24, no. 6, pages 1507 - 1514 |