EP3316868 - PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATIONS COMPRISING TENOFOVIR AND EMTRICITABINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2022 | Opposition rejected | published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gilead Sciences, Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2018/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOZIARA, Joanna, M. c/o Gilead Sciences Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 02 /
MCCALLISTER, Scott c/o Gilead Sciences Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2018/19] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2018/19] | Application number, filing date | 16739625.8 | 29.06.2016 | [2018/19] | WO2016US40158 | Priority number, date | US201562187113P | 30.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562187113 P | US201662298373P | 22.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662298373 P | US201662301429P | 29.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662301429 P | US201662317286P | 01.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662317286 P | [2018/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017004244 | Date: | 05.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3316868 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3316868 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K9/24, A61K9/28, A61K31/513, A61K31/675, A61P31/18 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
A61K9/2054 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0053 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/513 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/675 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/2013 (KR,US);
A61K9/209 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/284 (KR,US);
A61K9/2866 (EP,US);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/513, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/675, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2018/19] | A61K9/20, A61K9/24, A61K31/513, A61K31/675 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/19] | Extension states | BA | 24.01.2018 | ME | 24.01.2018 | Validation states | MA | 24.01.2018 | MD | 24.01.2018 | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUBEREITUNGEN BEINHALTEND TENOFOVIR UND EMTRICITABINE | [2019/41] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATIONS COMPRISING TENOFOVIR AND EMTRICITABINE | [2018/19] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUE COMPRENANT TENOFOVIR ET EMTRICITABINE | [2019/41] |
Former [2018/19] | PHARMAZEUTISCHE FORMULIERUNGEN MIT TENOFOVIR UND EMTRICITABIN | ||
Former [2018/19] | FORMULATIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES COMPRENANT DU TÉNOFOVIR ET DE L'EMTRICITABINE | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/19] | 24.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19199257.7 / EP3607939 | EP22176524.1 / EP4070787 | EP22176537.3 / EP4070788 | EP23162978.3 / EP4233846 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.11.2020
23.11.2020
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd 124 Dvora HaNevi'a St. 6944020 Tel Aviv / IL Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.11.2020
23.11.2020
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd 124 Dvora HaNevi'a St. 6944020 Tel Aviv / IL Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2021/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.11.2020
23.11.2020
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd 5 Basel Street P.O. Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | 03.12.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.04.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.04.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.06.2022 | 13.05.2022 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 23.05.2022 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2022/39] | 14.06.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | 12.12.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 12.12.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.01.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2016 | AL | 19.02.2020 | CY | 19.02.2020 | DK | 19.02.2020 | EE | 19.02.2020 | FI | 19.02.2020 | HR | 19.02.2020 | LT | 19.02.2020 | LV | 19.02.2020 | MC | 19.02.2020 | MK | 19.02.2020 | MT | 19.02.2020 | RO | 19.02.2020 | RS | 19.02.2020 | SM | 19.02.2020 | BG | 19.05.2020 | IS | 19.06.2020 | LU | 29.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 29.06.2016 | |
CY | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
MT | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
LU | 29.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | DK | 19.02.2020 | |
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
LU | 29.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | DK | 19.02.2020 | |
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | DK | 19.02.2020 | |
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 19.02.2020 | |
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 19.02.2020 | |
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 19.02.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2013116720 (GILEAD SCIENCES INC [US]) [X] 1-10,12-39,42-49 * page 82, lines 13-15, paragraph 247; claims 1-32 * * page 62, lines 17-20 * * page 63, lines 1-5, paragraph 250 * [I] 11,40,41; | [XY]WO2015022351 (RATIOPHARM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-9,15-20,25-39,42-49 * page 20, lines 1-12 * [Y] 10-14,21-24,40,41; | [Y]WO2015085976 (ZENTIVA KS [CZ]) [Y] 10-14,21-24,40,41 * page 2, lines 22-33 *; | [XP]WO2015196116 (GILEAD SCIENCES INC [US]) [XP] 1-49* paragraph [0096] * | Opposition | US2007077295 | EP1583542 | WO2010091197 | WO2013116720 | EP2744810 | - GILEAD, "Gilead Submits New Drug Application to U.S. Food and Drug Administration for Fixed-Dose Combination of Emtricitabine/Tenofovir Alafenamide for HIV Treatment", Press Release, (20150407), pages 1 - 2, XP055757389 | - GILEAD, "European Medicines Agency Validates Gilead’s Marketing Application for Fixed-Dose Combination of Emtricitabine and Tenofovir Alafenamide for HIV Treatment", Press Release, (20150500), pages 1 - 2, XP055745982 | - Anonymous, "Truvada 200 mg/245 mg film/coated tablets", EMA Scientific Discussion, (20050000), pages 1 - 59, XP055757477 | - Anonymous, "Atripla 600 mg/200 mg/245 mg film coated tablets", EMA Scientific Discussion, (20070000), pages 1 - 85, XP055757489 | - "Tablet Formulation and Design", Garnet Peck E., George J. Baley, Vincent E. Mccurdy, And Gilbert S. Banker, Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms: Tablets, (19890000), vol. 1, pages 75 - 111, XP055757499 | - Anonymous, "History of Changes for Study: NCT02121795 Switch Study to Evaluate F/TAF in HIV-1 Positive Participants Who Are Virologically Suppressed on Regimens Containing FTC/TDF", Clinicaltrial.gov archive, (20150326), pages 1 - 7, XP055757508 | - Prasad Telaprolu; Venkata Anjaneyulu M; Nagarjuna Reddy Y, "A review on pharmaceutical excipients", International Journal of Research in Pharmaceutical and Nano Sciences, (20130000), vol. 2, no. 4, pages 423 - 431, XP055719927 |