EP3248833 - SEAT COVER FOR AUTOMOBILE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.11.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Hausys, Ltd. One IFC Building 10 Gukjegeumyung-ro Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07326 / KR | [2017/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIN, Chul-Hee D-302 26 Bongwol-ro 27beon-gil Nam-gu Ulsan 44658 / KR | 02 /
JUNG, Yong-Bae B-407 26 Bongwol-ro 27beon-gil Nam-gu Ulsan 44658 / KR | 03 /
CHOI, Nam-Keun 102-1503 51-3 Jeomchon 5-gil Beomseo-eup Ulju-gun Ulsan 44925 / KR | [2017/48] | Representative(s) | Wynne-Jones IP Limited Southgate House Southgate Street Gloucester, Gloucestershire GL1 1UB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/48] | Wynne-Jones, Lainé and James LLP Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16740375.7 | 19.01.2016 | [2017/48] | WO2016KR00538 | Priority number, date | KR20150010804 | 22.01.2015 Original published format: KR 20150010804 | [2017/48] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016117902 | Date: | 28.07.2016 | Language: | KO | [2016/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3248833 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.07.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/58, B32B27/06, B32B27/12, B32B38/06, B32B5/02, B32B5/18, B32B5/20, B32B5/22, B32B5/24, B32B27/18, B32B27/30, B32B27/40, B32B3/02, B32B3/26, B32B3/30, D06Q1/00, D06N3/08 | [2018/05] | CPC: |
B32B3/02 (EP);
B60N2/5891 (KR,US);
B32B27/06 (EP,CN);
B32B27/065 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/12 (EP,CN,KR);
B32B27/18 (EP);
B32B27/304 (EP);
B32B27/40 (EP);
B32B3/263 (EP);
B32B3/30 (EP);
B32B38/06 (EP,CN,KR);
B32B5/02 (EP);
B32B5/18 (EP,US);
B32B5/20 (EP);
B32B5/22 (EP);
B32B5/24 (EP);
B60N2/58 (EP,CN);
B60N2/5816 (US);
D06N3/0011 (EP);
D06N3/0036 (EP);
D06N3/005 (EP);
D06N3/0077 (EP);
D06N3/0079 (EP);
D06N3/144 (EP);
D06N3/145 (EP);
B32B2250/03 (EP);
B32B2250/04 (EP);
B32B2255/00 (EP);
B32B2255/10 (EP);
B32B2255/26 (EP);
B32B2262/0261 (EP);
B32B2262/0276 (EP);
B32B2262/04 (EP);
B32B2262/062 (EP);
B32B2266/0214 (US);
B32B2266/0235 (EP);
B32B2266/0278 (EP);
B32B2266/0292 (EP);
B32B2266/06 (EP);
B32B2266/10 (US);
B32B2270/00 (EP);
B32B2305/022 (US);
B32B2305/18 (US);
B32B2305/20 (US);
B32B2307/54 (EP);
B32B2307/72 (US);
B32B2601/00 (EP,US);
B32B2605/003 (EP);
B32B5/245 (US);
D06N2201/042 (EP);
D06N2211/14 (EP);
D06N2211/263 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/48] | B60N2/58, B32B27/06, B32B27/12, B32B38/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/48] | Title | German: | SITZBEZUG FÜR AUTOMOBIL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2017/48] | English: | SEAT COVER FOR AUTOMOBILE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | [2017/48] | French: | HOUSSE DE SIÈGE POUR AUTOMOBILE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2017/48] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2017 | Translation filed | 20.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/48] | 20.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1424405 (KOEPP AG) [Y] 1-15 * page 4, lines 68-81 - page 3, lines 66-76; figure 2; examples 1-3; claims 1-2 *; | [X]US4210693 (MCCANN THOMAS J [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8,10,13 * column 6, lines 3-33 - column 17, lines 50-64; figure 2; claims 1-6; table 1 *; | [T]WO0105569 (WAVIN BV [NL], et al) [T] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]KR100415196B (LG CHEM. LTD.) [A] 3,8* pages 2-4; figure 1; claims 1-2 *; | [Y]EP2357276 (BENECKE KALIKO AG [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0020] , [0 25]; figure 1; claims 1, 11-13 * | International search | [XY]US4210693 (MCCANN THOMAS J [US], et al) [X] 1, 2, 4, 8-10, 14 , 16-18, 20-22 * See column 6, lines 3-33; column 17, lines 50-64; claims 1-6 and figure 2. * [Y] 3, 5-7, 11-13, 15, 19; | [Y]KR100415196B (LG CHEM. LTD.) [Y] 3, 5-7, 15 * See pages 2-4, claims 1, 2 and figure 1. *; | [Y]KR20140130138 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 11-13 * See paragraphs [0040]-[0046], [0057], [0085], [0086]. *; | [Y]KR20110095663 (ENVISTA INC [KR], et al) [Y] 19 * See paragraphs [0054]-[0068]. *; | [A]US2003170443 (KOBE JAMES J [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * See paragraphs [0052], [0053] and figure 2. * |