EP3234845 - MODEL ANTI-COLLUSION WATERMARK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | For all designated states Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc. 10202 W. Washington Boulevard Culver City, CA 90232 / US | [2021/30] |
Former [2017/43] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | ||
For all designated states Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc. 10202 W. Washington Boulevard Culver City, CA 90232 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIEHL, Eric 10202 West Washington Boulevard Culver City, CA 90232 / US | [2017/43] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/43] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 16740864.0 | 22.01.2016 | [2017/43] | WO2016US14595 | Priority number, date | US201562107230P | 23.01.2015 Original published format: US 201562107230 P | US201615003690 | 21.01.2016 Original published format: US201615003690 | [2017/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016118904 | Date: | 28.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3234845 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3234845 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.07.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/16, G06T1/00, G09C5/00, H04L9/32 | [2018/35] | CPC: |
G06T1/005 (EP,KR,US);
G06T1/0021 (KR,US);
G09C5/00 (EP,KR,US);
H04L9/32 (EP,KR,US);
G06T2201/0063 (EP,KR,US);
H04L2209/34 (EP,KR,US);
H04L2209/606 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/43] | G06F21/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODELL-ANTIKOLLUSIONSWASSERZEICHEN | [2017/43] | English: | MODEL ANTI-COLLUSION WATERMARK | [2017/43] | French: | FILIGRANE ANTI-COLLUSION MODÈLE | [2017/43] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/43] | 18.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.09.2023 | 20.09.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 03.04.2024 | [2024/44] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005044370 (OOSTVEEN JOB CORNELIS [NL], et al) [X] 1-11,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0038] * * figures 2-4 *; | [X]US7047413 (YACOBI YACOV [US], et al) [X] 1-11,15 * abstract * * column 6, line 1 - line 20 * * column 14, line 18 - line 52 * * figures 2,3 *; | [X]WO2009077944 (CIVOLUTION BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-11,15 * abstract * * page 1, line 27 - page 2, line 12 * * page 4, line 22 - line 32 * * page 5, line 7 - line 18 * * page 6, line 15 - line 33 * * figures 3,4,5 *; | [X]US2012163583 (NAKAGATA SHOHEI [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0079] *; | [X]US2013136296 (NAKAGATA SHOHEI [JP], et al) [X] 1-11,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0069] ** paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0081] *; | [X] - DITTMANN J, "COMBINING DIGITAL WATERMARKS AND COLLUSION SECURE FINGERPRINTS FOR CUSTOMER COPY MONITORING", IEE SEMINAR ON SECURE IMAGES AND IMAGE AUTHENTICATION, IEE, LONDON, GB, (20000410), pages 6/01 - 6/06, XP001151849 [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 2 * * page 4 * * page 6 * | [X] - JOHNSON A ET AL, TRANSFORM PERMUTED WATERMARKING FOR COPYRIGHT PROTECTION OF DIGITAL VIDEO, IEEE GLOBECOM 1998. GLOBECOM '98. THE BRIDGE TO GLOBAL INTEGRATION. SYDNEY, NOV. 8 - 12, 1998; [IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, PAGE(S) 684 - 689, (19980101), ISBN 978-0-7803-4985-8, XP000825846 [X] 1-11,15 * abstract * * page 685 * * page 686 * | International search | [Y]US2002114459 (BELENKO VYACHESLAV S [RU], et al) [Y] 5, 6, 13, 16 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0028], [0030]. *; | [XY]US2012163583 (NAKAGATA SHOHEI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4, 7-12, 14, 15, 17, 18 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0042], [0043], [0046], [0099], [0100]. * [Y] 5, 6, 13, 16; | [A]US2013011006 (PETROVIC RADE [US], et al) [A] 1-18* ; entire document. * |