EP3265177 - FORMULATIONS OF HYDROPHILIC COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grey Pacific Labs, LLC 17707 S Santa Fe Ave Rancho Dominguez, CA 90221 / US | [2023/16] |
Former [2018/02] | For all designated states Bcs Business Consulting Services Pte Ltd 230 Orchard Rd. 10-230 Faber Hse 238854 / SG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURNISON, Chantal 10866 Wilshire Boulevard 4th Floor Los Angeles, CA 90024 / US | 02 /
METSELAAR, Josbert Maarten Cattenhagestraat 24 1411CT Naarden / NL | 03 /
STAHL, Christopher 10866 Wilshire Boulevard 4th Floor Los Angeles, CA 90024 / US | [2018/21] |
Former [2018/02] | 01 /
BURNISON, Chantal 10866 Wilshire Boulevard 4th Floor Los Angeles, CA 90024 / US | ||
02 /
METSELAAR, Josbert Maarten 10866 Wilshire Boulevard 4th Floor Sumatrastraat 32 Los Angeles, CA 90024 / US | |||
03 /
STAHL, Christopher 10866 Wilshire Boulevard 4th Floor Los Angeles, CA 90024 / US | Representative(s) | Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [2023/24] |
Former [2018/02] | Taruttis, Tilman KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rößler Heine PartG mbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 16740867.3 | 22.01.2016 | [2018/02] | WO2016US14600 | Priority number, date | US201562106612P | 22.01.2015 Original published format: US 201562106612 P | US201562106609P | 22.01.2015 Original published format: US 201562106609 P | [2018/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016118907 | Date: | 28.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3265177 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3265177 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.07.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61P17/02, A61P17/18, A61K31/353, A61K36/82, A61K47/14, A61K47/26, A61K47/22, A61K9/06, A61K9/10, A61K9/00, A61K47/06, A61K47/10 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
A61K47/22 (EP,US);
A61K31/353 (EP,US);
A61K36/82 (EP,US);
A61K47/06 (EP,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
A61K47/14 (US);
A61K47/26 (EP,US);
A61K47/46 (US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K9/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/1075 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/18 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/11] | A61P17/02, A61P17/18, A61K31/353, A61K36/82, A61K47/14, A61K47/26, A61K47/22, A61K9/06, A61K9/10 | ||
Former IPC [2018/02] | A61P17/02, A61P17/18, A61K31/353, A61K36/82 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FORMULIERUNGEN VON HYDROPHILEN VERBINDUNGEN | [2018/02] | English: | FORMULATIONS OF HYDROPHILIC COMPOUNDS | [2018/02] | French: | PRÉPARATIONS DE COMPOSÉS HYDROPHILES | [2018/02] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 27.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/02] | 28.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2018/02] | 27.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/02] | 27.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/21] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 27.10.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 27.10.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.12.2017 | Decision despatched | 27.10.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 27.10.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.12.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 27.10.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 27.10.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.12.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 27.10.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 27.10.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.12.2017 | Decision despatched | 27.10.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 27.10.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.12.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 27.10.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 27.10.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.12.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2022 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 14.06.2023 | ES | 14.06.2023 | HR | 14.06.2023 | MC | 14.06.2023 | PL | 14.06.2023 | RO | 14.06.2023 | RS | 14.06.2023 | SK | 14.06.2023 | SM | 14.06.2023 | NO | 14.09.2023 | GR | 15.09.2023 | IS | 14.10.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 14.06.2023 | |
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 14.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN101138550 (UNIV SHENYANG PHARMACEUTICAL [CN]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [Y]US2008274176 (JOHNSSON MARKUS [SE], et al) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0045] ** example 11 *; | [IY]US2012141446 (PATEL BHIKU [US]) [I] 1-5,7,11 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0035] , [0050] * [Y] 6; | [A] - STEPHEN HONG-WEI WU ET AL, "CHARACTERISTICS OF D-ALPHA-TOCOPHERYL PEG 1000 SUCCINATE FOR APPLICATIONS AS AN ABSORPTION ENHANCER IN DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEMS", PHARMACEUTICAL TECHNO, ADVANSTAR COMMUNICATIONS, EUGENE, OR, US, (19991001), vol. 23, no. 10, ISSN 0147-8087, XP009014624 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4855322 (KASHA WALTER J [US], et al) [Y] 2-25, 51-54* ; col 2 In 15-23, 60-67; col 3 In 12-13, 65-67; col 35 In 18-21; col 36 In 10-19; col 40 In 3-11 *; | [Y]US2005208138 (YANG DAVID J [US], et al) [Y] 15 * ; para [0169], [0258] *; | [Y]US2007160550 (CHARLES NEE NEWSHAM REBECCA L [GB], et al) [Y] 8-9, 19, 30-31, 39-40, 47- 50 * ; para [0004], [0018], [0022], [0030], [0034], [0040] *; | [Y]US2008274176 (JOHNSSON MARKUS [SE], et al) [Y] 1-18, 20-47, 51-54 * ; para [0017], [0021], [0023], [0026], [0035]-[0036], [0039], [0041], [0045], [0049]-[0051], [0062], [0069], [0080]-[0081], [0118], [0138]-[0140], [0142] *; | [Y]US2009297665 (BROMLEY PHILIP J [US]) [Y] 1-19, 21-54 * ; para [0016], [0020], [0024], [0033], [0036]-[0037], [0041], [0066]-[0067], [0081], [0176], [0191], [0194], [0227], [0294] -[0298], [0385] *; | [Y]US2012251596 (FRATTER ANDREA [IT]) [Y] 21 * ; para [0009]-[0010] *; | [Y]US2013045196 (SHI LEI [US], et al) [Y] 19-20, 40, 47 * ; para [0003], [0006], [0017]. [0044], [0106]-[0110], [0117] *; | [Y]US2014301958 (BOJANOWSKI KRZYSZTOF [US], et al) [Y] 10-11, 32-33 * ; para [0042], [0052] * | by applicant | US4689349 | US4855322 | CN101138550 | US2008274176 | US2012141446 | - GUO et al., "The Applications of Vitamin E TPGS in Drug Delivery", Eur. J. Pharmc. Sci., (20130000), vol. 49, doi:10.1016/j.ejps.2013.02.006, pages 175 - 186, XP028531143 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejps.2013.02.006 | - KATIYAR et al., "Green tea and skin", ArchDermatol, (20000000), pages 1362989 - 994 | - KATIYAR et al., "Polyphenolic antioxidant (-)- epigallocatechin-3-gallate from green tea reduces UVB—induced inflammatory responses and infiltration of leukocytes in human skin", Photochem Photobiol, vol. 69 |