EP3322387 - BALLOON CATHETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JOTEC GmbH Lotzenäcker 23 72379 Hechingen / DE | [2018/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARTHOLD, Franz-Peter Binsenbolstr. 30 72336 Balingen / DE | [2018/21] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/21] | Application number, filing date | 16740989.5 | 13.07.2016 | [2018/21] | WO2016EP66581 | Priority number, date | DE20151008784 | 13.07.2015 Original published format: DE102015008784 | [2018/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017009356 | Date: | 19.01.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3322387 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3322387 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/958 | [2018/21] | CPC: |
A61F2/958 (EP,US);
A61M25/1011 (US);
A61F2/07 (US);
A61M2025/105 (US);
A61M25/104 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BALLONKATHETER | [2018/21] | English: | BALLOON CATHETER | [2018/21] | French: | CATHÉTER À BALLONNET | [2018/21] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/21] | 08.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5725535 (HEGDE ANANT V [US], et al) [Y] 2,6,7,11-13 * column 2, line 17 - column 5, line 20 * * figures 1-13 *; | [XYI]WO0027454 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US]) [X] 1,3-5,8,9 * figure 1 * * page 10, line 6 - line 38 * [Y] 2,6,7,11-13 [I] 10; | [X]US6527739 (BIGUS STEVE [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,8,9* column 2, line 51 - column 5, line 65; figures 1-7 * | Examination | DE3779539T |