EP3328323 - HOLDING DEVICE FOR A PROSTHETIC SOCKET AND SYSTEM CONSISTING OF A PROSTHETIC SOCKET AND A HOLDING DEVICE FOR A PROSTHETIC SOCKET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/23] | PROSTHESIS SHAFT RETAINING DEVICE AND SYSTEM COMPOSED OF PROSTHESIS SHAFT AND PROSTHESIS SHAFT RETAINING DEVICE | ||
[2018/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otto Bock Healthcare Products GmbH Brehmstrasse 16 1110 Wien / AT | [2018/27] |
Former [2018/23] | For all designated states Otto Bock Healthcare Products GmbH Kaiserstrasse 39 1070 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAGNER, Sonja Schulgasse 34/1/7 1180 Wien / AT | 02 /
FREY, Alice Dr. Fuchsgasse 4/4/8 2000 Stockerau / AT | 03 /
LUNZER, Walter Lerchenfelderstrasse 50/2/17 1080 Wien / AT | [2018/23] | Representative(s) | Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Frankfurter Straße 3 C 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/23] | Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theodor-Heuss-Straße 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 16742309.4 | 25.07.2016 | [2018/23] | WO2016EP67659 | Priority number, date | DE201510112406 | 29.07.2015 Original published format: DE102015112406 | [2018/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017017057 | Date: | 02.02.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3328323 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3328323 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/54, A61F2/78, A61F2/80 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
A61F2/78 (EP,RU,US);
A61F2/54 (EP,RU,US);
A61F2/80 (EP,US);
A61H3/008 (US);
A61F2002/5036 (US);
A61F2002/546 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/23] | A61F2/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROTHESENSCHAFTHALTEVORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM AUS PROTHESENSCHAFT UND PROTHESENSCHAFTHALTEVORRICHTUNG | [2018/23] | English: | HOLDING DEVICE FOR A PROSTHETIC SOCKET AND SYSTEM CONSISTING OF A PROSTHETIC SOCKET AND A HOLDING DEVICE FOR A PROSTHETIC SOCKET | [2018/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RETENUE D'EMBOÎTURE PROTHÉTIQUE ET SYSTÈME CONSTITUÉ D'UNE EMBOÎTURE PROTHÉTIQUE ET UN DISPOSITIF DE RETENUE D'EMBOÎTURE PROTHÉTIQUE | [2018/52] |
Former [2018/23] | PROSTHESIS SHAFT RETAINING DEVICE AND SYSTEM COMPOSED OF PROSTHESIS SHAFT AND PROSTHESIS SHAFT RETAINING DEVICE | ||
Former [2018/23] | DISPOSITIF DE MAINTIEN DE TIGE PROTHÉTIQUE, SYSTÈME CONSTITUÉ D'UNE TIGE PROTHÉTIQUE ET D'UN DISPOSITIF DE MAINTIEN DE TIGE PROTHÉTIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/23] | 26.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.07.2016 | AL | 29.05.2019 | CY | 29.05.2019 | CZ | 29.05.2019 | DK | 29.05.2019 | EE | 29.05.2019 | FI | 29.05.2019 | HR | 29.05.2019 | LT | 29.05.2019 | LV | 29.05.2019 | MC | 29.05.2019 | MK | 29.05.2019 | MT | 29.05.2019 | PL | 29.05.2019 | RO | 29.05.2019 | RS | 29.05.2019 | SI | 29.05.2019 | SK | 29.05.2019 | SM | 29.05.2019 | IE | 25.07.2019 | LU | 25.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | BG | 29.08.2019 | NO | 29.08.2019 | GR | 30.08.2019 | IS | 29.09.2019 | PT | 30.09.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 25.07.2016 | |
AL | 29.05.2019 | ||
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
MT | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
IE | 25.07.2019 | ||
LU | 25.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
IS | 29.09.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 25.07.2016 | |
AL | 29.05.2019 | ||
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
IE | 25.07.2019 | ||
LU | 25.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
IS | 29.09.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
IE | 25.07.2019 | ||
LU | 25.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
IS | 29.09.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
IE | 25.07.2019 | ||
LU | 25.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
IE | 25.07.2019 | ||
LU | 25.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
LU | 25.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 29.05.2019 | |
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 29.05.2019 | |
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1366453 (HENNING FREDERICK C); | [A]GB206333 (PETER MURRAY MCKAY); | [A]US1718095 (VRADENBURG WILBUR C); | [A]US2592842 (ALDERSON SAMUEL W); | [A]US3188655 (MARTIN COOPER CARL, et al); | [A]US4258441 (BELL JUDITH A) |