EP3252111 - A METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN OXIDIZED CARBON BLACK AQUEOUS DISPERSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/49] | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING AQUEOUS DISPERSION OF OXIDIZED CARBON BLACK, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING AQUEOUS DISPERSION OF OXIDIZED CARBON BLACK FOR INKJET INK | ||
[2019/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokai Carbon Co., Ltd. 2-3 Kita-Aoyama 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8636 / JP | [2017/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKODA, Takuya c/o TOKAI CARBON Co., Ltd. 2-3 Kita-Aoyama 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8636 / JP | 02 /
SATO, Yoshihiro c/o TOKAI CARBON Co., Ltd. 2-3 Kita-Aoyama 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8636 / JP | [2019/52] |
Former [2017/49] | 01 /
SAKODA, Takuya c/o TOKAI CARBON Co. Ltd. 2-3 Kita-Aoyama 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8636 / JP | ||
02 /
SATO, Yoshihiro c/o TOKAI CARBON Co. Ltd. 2-3 Kita-Aoyama 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8636 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2017/49] | Application number, filing date | 16743192.3 | 20.01.2016 | [2017/49] | WO2016JP51521 | Priority number, date | JP20150017015 | 30.01.2015 Original published format: JP 2015017015 | [2017/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016121588 | Date: | 04.08.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3252111 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3252111 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C09D17/00, B41J2/01, B41M5/00, C09D11/324, C09C1/56 | [2018/42] | CPC: |
C09C1/565 (EP,US);
C09C1/487 (KR);
B01D61/025 (KR);
B01D61/145 (KR);
B01D61/422 (KR);
B41J2/01 (US);
B41M5/00 (EP,US);
C09D11/324 (EP,KR,US);
C09D17/00 (EP,KR,US);
C09D17/005 (US);
C01P2004/51 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/49] | C09D17/00, B41J2/01, B41M5/00, C09C1/48, C09D11/324 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER WÄSSRIGEN DISPERSION VON OXIDIERTEM RUSS | [2019/52] | English: | A METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN OXIDIZED CARBON BLACK AQUEOUS DISPERSION | [2019/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE DISPERSION AQUEUSE DE NOIR DE CARBONE OXYDÉ | [2019/52] |
Former [2017/49] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER WÄSSRIGEN DISPERSION VON OXIDIERTEM RUSS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER WÄSSRIGEN DISPERSION VON OXIDIERTEM RUSS FÜR TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKTINTE | ||
Former [2017/49] | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING AQUEOUS DISPERSION OF OXIDIZED CARBON BLACK, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING AQUEOUS DISPERSION OF OXIDIZED CARBON BLACK FOR INKJET INK | ||
Former [2017/49] | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE DISPERSION AQUEUSE DE NOIR DE CARBONE OXYDÉ, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE DISPERSION AQUEUSE DE NOIR DE CARBONE OXYDÉ POUR ENCRE POUR JET D'ENCRE | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2017 | Translation filed | 03.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/49] | 03.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 14.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.01.2016 | AL | 25.12.2019 | AT | 25.12.2019 | CY | 25.12.2019 | CZ | 25.12.2019 | DK | 25.12.2019 | EE | 25.12.2019 | FI | 25.12.2019 | HR | 25.12.2019 | IT | 25.12.2019 | LT | 25.12.2019 | LV | 25.12.2019 | MC | 25.12.2019 | MK | 25.12.2019 | MT | 25.12.2019 | NL | 25.12.2019 | PL | 25.12.2019 | RO | 25.12.2019 | RS | 25.12.2019 | SE | 25.12.2019 | SI | 25.12.2019 | SK | 25.12.2019 | SM | 25.12.2019 | TR | 25.12.2019 | IE | 20.01.2020 | BE | 31.01.2020 | CH | 31.01.2020 | LI | 31.01.2020 | FR | 25.02.2020 | BG | 25.03.2020 | NO | 25.03.2020 | GR | 26.03.2020 | IS | 25.04.2020 | PT | 20.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 20.01.2016 | |
AL | 25.12.2019 | ||
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CY | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
MT | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
TR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IE | 20.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
FR | 25.02.2020 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
IE | 20.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
FR | 25.02.2020 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
IE | 20.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
FR | 25.02.2020 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 25.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1914276 (TOKAI CARBON KK [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0028] - [0035] - [0 37] - [0039]; example 1; claim 2 *; | [YA]EP1935947 (TOKAI CARBON KK [JP]) [Y] 11 * paragraph [0041] *[A] 1-10; | [A]EP2455430 (TOKAI CARBON KK [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0006] - [0009] - [0 71] - [0094] - [0134] - [0140] *; | [YA]EP2657305 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP]) [Y] 11 * paragraphs [0006] - [0009] * [A] 1-10 | International search | [A]JPH10219165 (TOYO INK MFG CO) [A] 1-11 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH10287836 (TOYO INK MFG CO) [A] 1-11 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH11166131 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [A] 1-11 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2002327144 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-11 * , entire text & US 2002/0088375 A1 entire text *; | [A]WO03033602 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * , entire text & US 2005/0124726 A1 entire text & EP 1443085 A1 & TW 243843 B & CN 1585804 A & JP 2008-69355 A *; | [A]JP2003183558 (BROTHER IND LTD) [A] 1-11 * , claims; paragraphs [0008], [0024]; examples & US 2003/0058318 A1 claims; paragraphs [0007], [0028]; examples *; | [A]JP2005113091 (CHUBU KIRESUTO KK, et al) [A] 1-11 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2010035871 (LION CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-11* , entire text & US 2011/0217229 A1 entire text & EP 2351798 A1 & CN 102165022 A & KR 10-2011-0066920 A & JP 5429942 B2 *; | [A]JP2011157425 (BROTHER IND LTD) [A] 1-11 * , entire text & US 2011/0187799 A1 entire text & EP 2354196 A1 & CN 102140270 A *; | [X]WO2012086789 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP], et al) [X] 1-4, 11 * , claims; paragraphs [0010] to [0011], [0024], [0033] to [0035], [0040] to [0041], [0052]; examples & US 2013/0338310 A1 claims; paragraphs [0019] to [0020], [0041], [0054] to [0056], [0063] to [0064], [0077]; examples & EP 2657305 A1 & CN 103228745 A & CA 2821898 A & SG 191329 A & KR 10-2013-010078 * |