EP3252016 - FERRITE PARTICLES FOR CATALYST CARRIER WHICH HAVE OUTER SHELL STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Powdertech Co., Ltd. 217, Toyofuta Kashiwa-shi, Chiba 277-8557 / JP | [2017/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGA, Koji c/o Powdertech Co. Ltd. 217 Toyofuta Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-8557 / JP | 02 /
SUGIURA, Takao c/o Powdertech Co. Ltd. 217 Toyofuta Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-8557 / JP | [2017/49] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2017/49] | Application number, filing date | 16743346.5 | 26.01.2016 | [2017/49] | WO2016JP52151 | Priority number, date | JP20150013794 | 28.01.2015 Original published format: JP 2015013794 | [2017/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016121743 | Date: | 04.08.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3252016 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3252016 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/889, B01J23/745, B01J23/00, B01J23/89, B01J35/00, B01J35/02, B01J37/00, G03G9/107, G03G9/113, C01G49/00, C01G23/047, B01J37/02, B01J37/16, B01J37/08, B01J35/10, B01J35/08 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
B01J23/8892 (EP,US);
B01J23/8906 (EP,KR,US);
B01J21/063 (KR);
B01J23/002 (EP,US);
B01J23/005 (EP,US);
B01J23/72 (KR);
B01J23/745 (EP,US);
B01J23/75 (KR);
B01J23/755 (KR);
B01J23/889 (US);
B01J23/89 (US);
B01J23/8913 (EP,US);
B01J23/892 (EP,US);
B01J23/8926 (EP,US);
B01J23/8986 (EP,US);
B01J35/19 (EP,US);
B01J35/23 (EP,US);
B01J35/31 (EP,US);
B01J35/397 (EP,US);
B01J35/40 (EP,KR,US);
C01G23/047 (EP,US);
C01G49/0072 (EP,US);
G03G9/1075 (EP,US);
G03G9/1085 (EP,US);
G03G9/113 (EP,US);
G03G9/1139 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00 (EP,US);
B01J35/30 (EP,US);
B01J35/33 (EP,US);
B01J35/39 (EP,US);
B01J35/51 (EP,US);
B01J35/612 (EP,US);
B01J37/0018 (EP,US);
B01J37/0036 (EP,US);
B01J37/0063 (EP,US);
B01J37/0211 (EP,US);
B01J37/088 (EP,US);
B01J37/16 (EP,US);
C01P2002/50 (EP,US);
C01P2002/52 (EP,US);
C01P2004/03 (EP,US);
C01P2004/84 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/17, B01J2523/22, B01J2523/24, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/72, B01J2523/842 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/18, B01J2523/22, B01J2523/24, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/72, B01J2523/842 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/19, B01J2523/22, B01J2523/24, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/72, B01J2523/842 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/22, B01J2523/24, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/72, B01J2523/821, B01J2523/842 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/22, B01J2523/24, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/72, B01J2523/822, B01J2523/842 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/22, B01J2523/24, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/72, B01J2523/824, B01J2523/842 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/22, B01J2523/24, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/72, B01J2523/828, B01J2523/842 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/22, B01J2523/24, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/72, B01J2523/842 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/22, B01J2523/24, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/72, B01J2523/842, B01J2523/845 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/22, B01J2523/24, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/72, B01J2523/842, B01J2523/847 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/22, B01J2523/24, B01J2523/72, B01J2523/842 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/22, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/72, B01J2523/842 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2018/32] | B01J23/889, B01J23/745, B01J23/00, C01G49/00, B01J23/89, B01J32/00, B01J35/00, B01J35/02, C01G23/047, // B01J35/08, B01J35/10, B01J37/08, B01J37/16, B01J37/00, B01J37/02, G03G9/083 | ||
Former IPC [2017/49] | C01G49/00, B01J23/889, B01J23/89, B01J32/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FERRITTEILCHEN FÜR KATALYSATORTRÄGER MIT AUSSENSCHALENSTRUKTUR | [2017/49] | English: | FERRITE PARTICLES FOR CATALYST CARRIER WHICH HAVE OUTER SHELL STRUCTURE | [2017/49] | French: | PARTICULES DE FERRITE POUR SUPPORT DE CATALYSEUR DOTÉES D'UNE STRUCTURE DE COQUILLE EXTERNE | [2017/49] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2017 | Translation filed | 26.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/49] | 08.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 12.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.03.2023 | CZ | 01.03.2023 | DK | 01.03.2023 | EE | 01.03.2023 | ES | 01.03.2023 | FI | 01.03.2023 | HR | 01.03.2023 | IT | 01.03.2023 | LT | 01.03.2023 | LV | 01.03.2023 | MC | 01.03.2023 | NL | 01.03.2023 | PL | 01.03.2023 | RO | 01.03.2023 | RS | 01.03.2023 | SE | 01.03.2023 | SI | 01.03.2023 | SK | 01.03.2023 | SM | 01.03.2023 | NO | 01.06.2023 | GR | 02.06.2023 | IS | 01.07.2023 | PT | 03.07.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
DK | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SI | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
DK | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SI | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
LT | 01.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US4201827 (HEITKAMP DIETER [DE]); | [XI]JP2000237542 (TOKIN CORP); | [XI]KR20120021570 (UNIV SOGANG IND UNIV COOP FOUN [KR]); | [XI]JP2014182304 (POWDERTECH CO LTD); | [E]EP3032335 (POWDERTECH CO LTD [JP]); | [E]EP3252536 (POWDERTECH CO LTD [JP]); | [E]EP3251735 (POWDERTECH CO LTD [JP]); | International search | [YA]JP2000237542 (TOKIN CORP); | [Y]JP2000355663 (NITTETSU MINING CO LTD, et al); | [YA]JP2004189513 (FDK CORP); | [Y]WO2005067985 (KAWAKAMI TOSHIO [JP]); | [A]JP2014182304 (POWDERTECH CO LTD) |