EP3253152 - TERMINAL DEVICE, INTEGRATED CIRCUIT AND COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 5908522 / JP | [2017/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI Shoichi c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 02 /
AIBA Tatsushi c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 03 /
YOKOMAKURA Kazunari c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 04 /
TAKAHASHI Hiroki c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8522 / JP | [2017/49] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2017/49] | Application number, filing date | 16743403.4 | 27.01.2016 | [2017/49] | WO2016JP52286 | Priority number, date | JP20150014737 | 28.01.2015 Original published format: JP 2015014737 | [2017/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016121800 | Date: | 04.08.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3253152 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3253152 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04W72/12, H04W74/08, H04W74/02 | [2018/44] | CPC: |
H04W74/02 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04L5/0053 (US);
H04W24/10 (US);
H04W72/04 (EP,US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/49] | H04W72/04, H04W72/12, H04W74/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG, INTEGRIERTER SCHALTKREIS UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2017/49] | English: | TERMINAL DEVICE, INTEGRATED CIRCUIT AND COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2017/49] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT TERMINAL, CIRCUIT INTÉGRÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION | [2017/49] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2017 | Translation filed | 27.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/49] | 29.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 28.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 08.06.2022 | AT | 08.06.2022 | CZ | 08.06.2022 | DK | 08.06.2022 | EE | 08.06.2022 | ES | 08.06.2022 | FI | 08.06.2022 | HR | 08.06.2022 | IT | 08.06.2022 | LT | 08.06.2022 | LV | 08.06.2022 | MC | 08.06.2022 | NL | 08.06.2022 | PL | 08.06.2022 | RO | 08.06.2022 | RS | 08.06.2022 | SE | 08.06.2022 | SI | 08.06.2022 | SK | 08.06.2022 | SM | 08.06.2022 | BG | 08.09.2022 | NO | 08.09.2022 | GR | 09.09.2022 | IS | 08.10.2022 | PT | 10.10.2022 | IE | 27.01.2023 | LU | 27.01.2023 | BE | 31.01.2023 | CH | 31.01.2023 | LI | 31.01.2023 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/11] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
IT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
IE | 27.01.2023 | ||
LU | 27.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
IE | 27.01.2023 | ||
LU | 27.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
LU | 27.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
LU | 27.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
LU | 27.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2530992 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0116] - paragraph [0119] * * paragraph [0122] - paragraph [0134] *; | [A]US2013235768 (EARNSHAW ANDREW MARK [CA], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0039] ** figure 6 *; | [Y] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Medium Access Control (MAC) protocol specification (Release 12)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.321, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20141231), vol. RAN WG2, no. V12.4.0, pages 1 - 60, XP050927382 [Y] 1-4 * section 5.4.4 * | [Y] - SAMSUNG, "Scheduling Request in SCG", vol. RAN WG2, no. Dresden, Germany; 20140818 - 20140822, (20140817), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-143136 SR IN DC, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20140817), XP050794259 [Y] 1-4 * section 2 * | International search | [A]WO2014098534 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-6 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2015/0334637 A1 entire text; all drawings & EP 2938011 A1 & CN 104871449 A *; | [A] - SAMSUNG, "Scheduling Request in SCG", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2 Meeting #87, R2-143136, (20140800), pages 1 - 2, XP050794259 [A] 1-6 | [A] - LG ELECTRONICS INC., "Contention Based SCell RACH", 3GPP TSG-RAN2 Meeting #75, R2-114424, (20110800), pages 1 - 3, XP050540100 [A] 1-6 | [A] - "Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E- UTRA); Medium Access Control (MAC) protocol specification (Release 12)", 3GPP TS 36.321 V12.4.0, (20141200), pages 9 - 10,28, XP055471999 [A] 1-6 |