EP3325546 - POLYMERIC MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Victrex Manufacturing Limited Victrex Technology Centre Hillhouse International Thornton Cleveleys, Lancashire FY5 4QD / GB | [2018/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATTHEWS, Alice c/o Victrex Manufacturing Ltd Intellectual Property Department Victrex Technology Centre Hillhouse International Thornton Cleveleys Lancashire FY5 4QD / GB | 02 /
TOFT, Michael c/o Victrex Manufacturing Ltd Intellectual Property Department Victrex Technology Centre Hillhouse International Thornton Cleveleys Lancashire FY5 4QD / GB | 03 /
FLATH, Dianne c/o Victrex Manufacturing Ltd Intellectual Property Department Victrex Technology Centre Hillhouse International Thornton Cleveleys Lancashire FY5 4QD / GB | 04 /
MEAKIN, Craig c/o Intellectual Property Department Victrex Manufacturing Ltd Victrex Technology Centre Hillhouse International Thornton Cleveleys Lancashire FY5 4QD / GB | [2018/41] |
Former [2018/22] | 01 /
MATTHEWS, Alice c/o Victrex Manufacturing Ltd Intellectual Property Department Victrex Technology Centre Hillhouse International Thornton Cleveleys Lancashire FY5 4QD / GB | ||
02 /
TOFT, Michael c/o Victrex Manufacturing Ltd Intellectual Property Department Victrex Technology Centre Hillhouse International Thornton Cleveleys Lancashire FY5 4QD / GB | |||
03 /
FLATH, Dianne c/o Victrex Manufacturing Ltd Intellectual Property Department Victrex Technology Centre Hillhouse International Thornton Cleveleys Lancashire FY5 4QD / GB | |||
04 /
MEAKIN, Craig c/o Victrex Manufacturing Ltd Intellectual Property Department Victrex Technology Centre Hillhouse International Thornton Cleveleys Lancashire FY5 4QD / GB | Representative(s) | Wilkins, Georgina Mary Heather, et al Victrex Manufacturing Limited Intellectual Property Department Victrex Technology Centre Hillhouse International Thornton Cleveleys FY5 4QD / GB | [2018/22] | Application number, filing date | 16744482.7 | 22.07.2016 | [2018/22] | WO2016GB52225 | Priority number, date | GB20150013135 | 24.07.2015 Original published format: GB 201513135 | [2018/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017017419 | Date: | 02.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3325546 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/22, C08K3/30 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
C08K3/00 (GB);
C08G65/4012 (US);
C08J3/201 (US);
C08K3/30 (EP,US);
C08L71/12 (GB);
C08L81/02 (GB);
C08J2371/10 (US);
C08K2003/2237 (EP,US);
C08K2003/2241 (GB,US);
C08K2003/3036 (EP,GB,US);
C08K2003/3045 (EP,GB,US);
C08K2201/014 (GB);
C08L2205/025 (GB);
C08L2666/54 (GB);
C08L2666/66 (GB)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/22, C08L71/00 (US,EP);
C08K3/22, C08L71/00, C08L81/00 (US,EP);
C08K3/22, C08L71/00, C08L81/02 (US,EP);
C08K3/22, C08L71/00, C08L81/06 (US,EP);
C08K3/30, C08L71/00, C08L81/00 (EP,US);
C08K3/30, C08L71/00, C08L81/02 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] | Title | German: | POLYMERMATERIALIEN | [2018/22] | English: | POLYMERIC MATERIALS | [2018/22] | French: | MATÉRIAUX POLYMÈRES | [2018/22] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 05.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5872159 (COUGOULIC JEAN-PIERRE [FR]) [Y] 1-28 * claims 1-9 *; | [Y]WO2007107519 (SOLVAY ADVANCED POLYMERS LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1-28* claims 1-23 *; | [Y]WO2008003659 (SOLVAY ADVANCED POLYMERS LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1-28 * claims 1-19 *; | [Y]WO2010122326 (INVIBIO LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-28 * claims 1-23 *; | [Y]WO2013054114 (VICTREX MFG LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-28 * claims 1-19 *; | [Y]WO2014207458 (VICTREX MFG LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-28 * claims 1-24 * |