EP3325153 - SAMPLE ANALYSIS CARTRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/22] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ENHANCED DETECTION AND QUANTIFICATION OF ANALYTES | ||
[2019/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cue Health Inc. 4980 Carroll Canyon Rd., Ste. 100 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2020/31] |
Former [2018/37] | For all designated states Cue Health Inc. 11100 Roselle Street Suite A San Diego, CA 92121 / US | ||
Former [2018/22] | For all designated states CUE INC. 11100 Roselle Street San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHATTAK, Ayub c/o CUE Inc. 11100 Roselle Street San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
SEVER, Clinton c/o CUE Inc. 11100 Roselle Street San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
NELSON, Paul c/o CUE Inc. 11100 Roselle Street San Diego, California 92121 / US | 04 /
COOPER, Ryan c/o CUE Inc. 11100 Roselle Street San Diego, California 92121 / US | 05 /
CONGDON, Thomas c/o CUE Inc. 11100 Roselle Street San Diego, California 92121 / US | 06 /
DEMARTINO, Justin c/o CUE Inc. 11100 Roselle Street San Diego, California 92121 / US | 07 /
SHAPIRO, Raphael c/o CUE Inc. 11100 Roselle Street San Diego, California 92121 / US | 08 /
DUNCAN, Mark c/o CUE Inc. 11100 Roselle Street San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2018/22] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2018/22] | Application number, filing date | 16744639.2 | 16.07.2016 | [2018/22] | WO2016US42688 | Priority number, date | US201562194101P | 17.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562194101 P | [2018/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017015172 | Date: | 26.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3325153 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3325153 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, G01N35/00 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
B01L3/5027 (EP,AU,CN,US);
G01N35/0098 (AU,CN,KR,US);
G01N35/00029 (CN,KR);
B01L3/508 (CN,KR,US);
A61B10/0045 (US);
A61B10/02 (US);
B01L3/5023 (US);
B01L3/502715 (EP,AU,CN,KR,US);
B01L3/502723 (CN);
B01L3/502738 (EP,CN,US);
B01L3/5029 (EP,AU,CN,US);
B01L3/523 (EP,US);
B01L3/527 (US);
B01L7/52 (CN,KR);
B65D83/005 (US);
B65D83/04 (US);
B65D83/0817 (US);
B65D83/0858 (US);
C12Q1/6825 (CN,US);
F16K99/0032 (CN);
F16K99/0036 (CN);
G01N1/02 (CN);
G01N1/10 (CN);
G01N1/34 (CN);
G01N15/0618 (CN);
G01N21/78 (CN);
G01N27/28 (CN);
G01N27/30 (KR);
G01N27/3271 (CN);
G01N27/3272 (AU,CN);
G01N27/3273 (CN,US);
G01N33/54306 (CN);
G01N33/54326 (AU,CN,KR);
G01N33/54333 (CN);
G01N33/54366 (CN,US);
G01N33/54373 (CN,KR);
G01N33/5438 (CN);
G01N33/58 (CN);
G01N33/581 (CN);
G01N35/00871 (CN);
G01N35/08 (CN);
G01N35/10 (US);
G01N35/1095 (CN);
A61B5/157 (US);
B01L2200/025 (CN,US);
B01L2200/026 (CN);
B01L2200/027 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2200/028 (CN);
B01L2200/04 (CN);
B01L2200/0668 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2200/0684 (CN,US);
B01L2200/0689 (CN,US);
B01L2200/087 (CN);
B01L2200/10 (EP,AU,CN,US);
B01L2200/14 (US);
B01L2200/16 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2300/023 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2300/025 (CN);
B01L2300/04 (CN);
B01L2300/044 (CN);
B01L2300/047 (EP,US);
B01L2300/06 (CN);
B01L2300/0627 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2300/0645 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2300/0663 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0672 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0681 (CN);
B01L2300/069 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0809 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2300/0838 (CN);
B01L2300/0864 (CN);
B01L2300/0867 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2300/087 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2300/12 (CN);
B01L2300/161 (CN);
B01L2300/1805 (US);
B01L2300/1827 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2400/0406 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2400/0439 (CN);
B01L2400/0481 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0487 (CN);
B01L2400/0677 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2400/0683 (CN);
F16K2099/0084 (AU,CN);
G01N2001/027 (CN);
G01N2001/028 (CN);
G01N2035/00277 (CN);
G01N2035/00554 (CN);
G01N2035/00564 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KARTUSCHE ZUR PROBENANALYSE | [2019/42] | English: | SAMPLE ANALYSIS CARTRIDGE | [2019/42] | French: | CARTOUCHE POUR L'ANALYSE D'ÉCHANTILLONS | [2019/42] |
Former [2018/22] | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERWEITERTEN DETEKTION UND QUANTIFIZIERUNG VON ANALYTEN | ||
Former [2018/22] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ENHANCED DETECTION AND QUANTIFICATION OF ANALYTES | ||
Former [2018/22] | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LA DÉTECTION AMÉLIORÉE ET LA QUANTIFICATION DE SUBSTANCES À ANALYSER | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 12.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20163287.4 / EP3689466 | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.07.2016 | AL | 18.03.2020 | AT | 18.03.2020 | CY | 18.03.2020 | CZ | 18.03.2020 | DK | 18.03.2020 | EE | 18.03.2020 | ES | 18.03.2020 | FI | 18.03.2020 | HR | 18.03.2020 | IT | 18.03.2020 | LT | 18.03.2020 | LV | 18.03.2020 | MC | 18.03.2020 | MK | 18.03.2020 | MT | 18.03.2020 | PL | 18.03.2020 | RO | 18.03.2020 | RS | 18.03.2020 | SI | 18.03.2020 | SK | 18.03.2020 | SM | 18.03.2020 | TR | 18.03.2020 | BG | 18.06.2020 | NO | 18.06.2020 | GR | 19.06.2020 | LU | 16.07.2020 | IS | 18.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | PT | 12.08.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 16.07.2016 | |
AL | 18.03.2020 | ||
AT | 18.03.2020 | ||
CY | 18.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
MT | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
TR | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
LU | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 16.07.2016 | |
AT | 18.03.2020 | ||
CY | 18.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
MT | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
TR | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
LU | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
LU | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
LU | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/14] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
NO | 18.06.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2430032 (INVERNESS MEDICAL SWITZERLAND [CH]) [A] 1-12* page 16, line 4 - page 17, line 19; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP2179294 (ENIGMA DIAGNOSTICS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0033] - [0036]; figures 1-8 *; | [Y]US2013029324 (RAJAGOPAL RAJ [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0007] , [0182] - [0190] - [0265]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2013137591 (CLEMENS CHARLES E [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 97] , [ 214] , [ 215]; figure 3 *; | [Y]US2014336083 (KHATTAK AYUB [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0002] , [0006] , [0041]; figure 7 * |