EP3331862 - A PROCESS FOR PREPARATION OF SOLID IVABRADINE HYDROCHLORIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synthon B.V. Microweg 22 6545 CM Nijmegen / NL | [2020/27] |
Former [2018/24] | For all designated states Synthon BV Microweg 22 6545 CM Nijmegen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DYMACEK, Bohumil Synthon, s.r.o. Blansko Brnenska 32/c.p. 597 67817 Blansko / CZ | [N/P] |
Former [2018/24] | 01 /
DYMACEK, Bohumil Synthon s.r.o. Blansko Brnenska 32/c.p. 597 67817 Blansko / CZ | Representative(s) | Dobsík, Martin, et al Synthon B.V. Microweg 22 P.O. Box 7071 6503 GN Nijmegen / NL | [2018/24] | Application number, filing date | 16745772.0 | 03.08.2016 | [2018/24] | WO2016EP68577 | Priority number, date | EP20150179744 | 04.08.2015 Original published format: EP 15179744 | [2018/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017021466 | Date: | 09.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3331862 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07D223/16, A61K31/55 | [2018/24] | CPC: |
C07D223/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FESTEM IVABRADINHYDROCHLORID | [2018/24] | English: | A PROCESS FOR PREPARATION OF SOLID IVABRADINE HYDROCHLORIDE | [2018/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE CHLORHYDRATE D'IVABRIDINE | [2020/23] |
Former [2018/24] | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE CHLORHYDRATE D'IVABRADINE SOLIDE | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/24] | 04.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/15] | 23.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0534859 (ADIR [FR]) [AD] 1* example - *; | [A]WO2014114341 (SYNTHON BV [NL]) [A] 1 * example 5 *; | [A]WO2014188248 (LABORATORIO CHIMICO INT SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * example 2 * |