EP3484805 - ELEVATOR ARRANGEMENT WITH LOW HEADROOM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONE Corporation Myllykatu 3 05830 Hyvinkää / FI | [2019/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAAPANIEMI, Markku Von Daehnin Katu 3 A 6 00790 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
RÄSÄNEN, Matti Helenenkatu 16-20 B 21 05800 Hyvinkää / FI | 03 /
MIKKONEN, Janne Pellonkulmantie 27 D 15 04430 Järvenpää / FI | 04 /
HÄIVÄLÄ, Markku Vallesmanninkatu 2 05830 Hyvinkää / FI | 05 /
SELIN, Kimmo Valkovuokontie 12 05810 Hyvinkää / FI | 06 /
PIRINEN, Antti Taivaanvuohentie 3 A7 00200 Helsinki / FI | 07 /
KATTAINEN, Ari Tiilitehtaantie 9 05830 Hyvinkää / FI | 08 /
KANTOLA, Jari Maitokalliontie 7 12630 Sajaniemi / FI | 09 /
AULANKO, Esko Käenkatu 6 C 33 04230 Kerava / FI | [2019/21] | Representative(s) | K & H Bonapat Patentanwälte Koch · von Behren & Partner mbB Donnersbergerstraße 22A 80634 München / DE | [2019/21] | Application number, filing date | 16745777.9 | 15.07.2016 | [2019/21] | WO2016FI50527 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018011461 | Date: | 18.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3484805 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B66B11/02 | [2019/21] | CPC: |
B66B11/0246 (EP,US);
B66B1/28 (US);
B66B1/3415 (US);
B66B5/005 (US);
B66B5/0081 (US);
B66B5/0087 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] | Title | German: | AUFZUGSANORDNUNG MIT GERINGER KOPFHÖHE | [2019/21] | English: | ELEVATOR ARRANGEMENT WITH LOW HEADROOM | [2019/21] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ASCENSEUR À HAUTEUR SOUS DALLE RÉDUITE | [2019/21] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/21] | 06.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/45] | 22.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH05330752 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 10 * figure 3 *; | [XYI]EP1174381 (SODIMAS [FR]) [X] 1,16 * figures 1, 2, 3 * [Y] 2,3,5-7,10,11,14,15 [I] 12,13; | [Y]JP2007001698 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 5-7 * paragraph [0015]; figures 3, 10 *; | [Y]EP1916214 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0021]; figures 12, 13 *; | [Y]JP2015027898 (TOSHIBA ELEVATOR CO LTD) [Y] 2,11 * figures 1, 2 *; | [Y]WO2015110696 (KONE CORP [FI]) [Y] 14,15* figure 4 * | by applicant | US2010200339 |